Badgerow v. Walters, et al.

Plaintiff: Denise A Badgerow
Defendant: Thomas Meyer, Greg Walters and Ray Trosclair
Not Yet Classified: Anthony Trosclair and Gregory J. Walters
Case Number: 2:2019cv10353
Filed: May 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Jane Triche Milazzo
Referring Judge: Joseph C Wilkinson
2 Judge: Jay C Zainey
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 27, 2019 Filing 30 JUDGMENT entered in favor of Greg Walters, Ray Trosclair, Thomas Meyer against Denise A Badgerow. Signed by Judge Jay C. Zainey on June 26, 2019.(mp)
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER denying #15 Motion to Remand to State Court and granting #5 Motion to Confirm Arbitration Award. Signed by Judge Jay C. Zainey on June 26, 2019. (mp)
June 14, 2019 Filing 28 REPLY to Response to Motion filed by Thomas Meyer, Ray Trosclair, Greg Walters re #5 MOTION To Confirm Arbitration Award . (mp)
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting #21 Motion for Leave to File Reply. Signed by Judge Jay C. Zainey on June 14, 2019. (mp)
June 14, 2019 Filing 26 SUR REPLY to Response to Motion filed by Denise A Badgerow re #15 MOTION to Remand to State Court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)(mp)
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting #20 Motion for Leave to File Reply. Signed by Judge Jay C. Zainey on June 14, 2019. (mp) Modified text on 6/14/2019 (mp).
June 14, 2019 Filing 24 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Denise A Badgerow re #5 MOTION To Confirm Arbitration Award . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit)(mp)
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #17 Motion for Leave to File Memorandum in Opposition in Excess Pages. Signed by Judge Jay C. Zainey on June 14, 2019. (mp)
June 12, 2019 Filing 22 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #19 MOTION for Leave to File Sur Reply. This is a duplicate filing of document 20 and will be noted as such. No further action is necessary. (mp)
June 11, 2019 Filing 21 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Reply to Plaintiff's Opposition to Motion to Confirm Arbitration Award by Thomas Meyer, Ray Trosclair, Greg Walters. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Pleading Reply)(Masinter, Eve)
June 11, 2019 Filing 20 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Sur Reply by Denise A Badgerow. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Pleading, #3 Ex A, #4 Ex B, #5 Ex C, #6 Ex D, #7 Ex E, #8 Ex F, #9 Ex G)(Butler, Amanda) Modified text/event on 6/12/2019 (mp).
June 11, 2019 Filing 19 **DUPLICATE FILING - SEE REC. DOC. 20**: EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Sur Reply by Denise A Badgerow. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Pleading, #3 Ex A, #4 Ex B, #5 Ex C, #6 Ex D, #7 Ex E, #8 Ex F, #9 Ex G)(Butler, Amanda) Modified text on 6/12/2019 (mp).
June 7, 2019 Filing 18 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Thomas Meyer, Ray Trosclair, Greg Walters re #15 MOTION to Remand to State Court . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Masinter, Eve)
June 4, 2019 Filing 17 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Denise A Badgerow. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Pleading, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit, #15 Exhibit)(Butler, Amanda)
May 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER finding as moot the #11 Motion to Expedite Hearing relating to the Motion for Leave to file Memorandum in Excess of pages. Signed by Judge Jay C. Zainey on May 28, 2019. (mp)
May 29, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Denise A Badgerow. Motion(s) will be submitted on 6/12/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Notice of Submission)(mp)
May 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Leave to File Memorandum in Support of Motion to Remand in Excess of Page Limitation. Signed by Judge Jay C. Zainey on May 28, 2019. (mp)
May 28, 2019 Filing 13 ANSWER to #1 Complaint and Opposition to Action to Vacate by Thomas Meyer, Ray Trosclair, Greg Walters. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-E)(Masinter, Eve) Modified text/relation on 5/29/2019 (mp).
May 28, 2019 Filing 12 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #10 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages in Support of Motion to Remand. For future filings, the title of the attached proposed order should not include the word 'Proposed' but only reflect 'Order' on the actual document. (mp)
May 24, 2019 Filing 11 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Expedite Motion for Leave to File Memo in Excess of Page limit by Denise A Badgerow. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Butler, Amanda)
May 24, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages in Support of Motion to Remand by Denise A Badgerow. Motion(s) will be submitted on 6/12/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Pleading, #3 Memorandum in Support, #4 Ex. A, #5 Ex. B, #6 Ex. C, #7 Ex. D, #8 Ex. E, #9 Ex. F, #10 Notice of Submission)(Butler, Amanda)
May 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Granting #6 Motion to Expedite as set out in document. Plaintiff shall file her motion to remand by Friday, 5/31/2019. The removing defendants will be allowed to file an opposition limited to seven (7) pages in length. The opposition shall be filed by Friday, 6/7/2019. Plaintiff's opposition to the motion to confirm remains due on 6/4/2019, in accordance with the noticed submission date. Signed by Judge Jay C. Zainey on 5/22/2019. (ajn)
May 21, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Compliance by Thomas Meyer, Ray Trosclair, Greg Walters re #1 Notice of Removal, of Compliance by Greg Walters, Thomas Meyer, Ray Trosclair of all Parties and Pleadings Pursuant to Local Rule 3.2. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Masinter, Eve) Modified text on 5/21/2019 (ajn).
May 20, 2019 Filing 7 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Denise A Badgerow re #6 MOTION to Expedite Consideration of Motion to Confirm Arbitration Award . (Butler, Amanda)
May 20, 2019 Filing 6 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Expedite Consideration of Motion to Confirm Arbitration Award by Thomas Meyer, Ray Trosclair, Greg Walters. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Masinter, Eve)
May 20, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION To Confirm Arbitration Award by Thomas Meyer, Ray Trosclair, Greg Walters. Motion(s) will be submitted on 6/12/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit, #3 Notice of Submission)(Masinter, Eve)
May 16, 2019 Filing 4 Directive of the Clerk regarding compliance with 28:1447(b) re: #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Ray Trosclair, Thomas Meyer, Greg Walters. (sa)
May 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE - IT IS ORDERED that this matter is hereby TRANSFERRED to Section "A", in accordance with Rule 3.1.1E. Case transferred to Judge Jay C. Zainey. Judge Jane Triche Milazzo no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo on 5/14/2019. (NEF: Section A) (sa)
May 13, 2019 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Jane Triche Milazzo and Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr. (ess)
May 13, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Civil District Court, case number 19-4752 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7639738) filed by Anthony Trosclair, Thomas Meyer, Gregory J. Walters. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Rule 3.1 Certificate)Attorney Eve B. Masinter added to party Thomas Meyer(pty:selreq), Attorney Eve B. Masinter added to party Anthony Trosclair(pty:selreq), Attorney Eve B. Masinter added to party Gregory J. Walters(pty:selreq).(Masinter, Eve)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Badgerow v. Walters, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Denise A Badgerow
Represented By: Stephanie Dovalina
Represented By: Amanda Jeanne Butler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Anthony Trosclair
Represented By: Eve B. Masinter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Gregory J. Walters
Represented By: Eve B. Masinter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Meyer
Represented By: Eve B. Masinter
Represented By: Matthew M. McCluer
Represented By: Claude F. Reynaud, Jr.
Represented By: Ernst Fredrick Preis, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greg Walters
Represented By: Eve B. Masinter
Represented By: Matthew M. McCluer
Represented By: Claude F. Reynaud, Jr.
Represented By: Ernst Fredrick Preis, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ray Trosclair
Represented By: Eve B. Masinter
Represented By: Matthew M. McCluer
Represented By: Claude F. Reynaud, Jr.
Represented By: Ernst Fredrick Preis, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?