Castellanos et al v. Adams et al
Plaintiff: Carlos Castellanos, Rene Rodriguez, Marlene Suyapa Castellanos Delgado, Marlene Castellano Delgado and Carlos Castellano
Defendant: John W Adams, III and Enterprise Restoration Services, LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv10424
Filed: May 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Greg Gerard Guidry
Referring Judge: Joseph C Wilkinson
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. IT IS ORDERED that the following Section "A" cases are hereby reallotted to Judge Greg Guidry, Section "T" of this Court, effective as of the date of this Order. Case reassigned to Judge Greg Gerard Guidry. Judge Jay C. Zainey no longer assigned to case. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on June 27, 2019.(mp) (Main Document 5 replaced on 6/27/2019) (lag).
May 17, 2019 Filing 4 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #1 Complaint. ***Page 2 of both Summons was not provided. For future filings, page 2 should be attached to page 1 of summons. Clerk has attached 2nd page of summons. Please use both pages when filing of return of service of summons. Also, summons did not have the name and address of the filing attorney. Clerk took corrective action.*** (ajn)
May 17, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to John W Adams, III and Enterprise Restoration Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(ajn)
May 17, 2019 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Jay C. Zainey and Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr. (ess)
May 16, 2019 Filing fee paid from All Plaintiffs re #1 Complaint, (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7649106) (Mondino, Gabriel)
May 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Credit Card not accepted or unavailable - payment of filing fee due within 2 business days) filed by Marlene Suyapa Castellanos Delgado. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)Attorney Gabriel Omar Mondino added to party Marlene Suyapa Castellanos Delgado(pty:pla).(Mondino, Gabriel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Castellanos et al v. Adams et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlos Castellanos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rene Rodriguez
Represented By: Gabriel Omar Mondino
Represented By: George M. McGregor, Jr.
Represented By: Cesar Roberto Burgos
Represented By: Robert J. Daigre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marlene Suyapa Castellanos Delgado
Represented By: Gabriel Omar Mondino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marlene Castellano Delgado
Represented By: Gabriel Omar Mondino
Represented By: George M. McGregor, Jr.
Represented By: Cesar Roberto Burgos
Represented By: Robert J. Daigre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlos Castellano
Represented By: Gabriel Omar Mondino
Represented By: George M. McGregor, Jr.
Represented By: Cesar Roberto Burgos
Represented By: Robert J. Daigre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John W Adams, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Enterprise Restoration Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?