Ancira v New Orleans City

Plaintiff: Robert Ancira
Defendant: New Orleans City
Case Number: 2:2019cv10490
Filed: May 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Dana Douglas
Referring Judge: Greg Gerard Guidry
2 Judge: Sarah S Vance
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the following Section R cases are hereby reallotted to Judge Greg Guidry, Section T of this Court, effective as of the date of this Order. Case transferred to Judge Greg Gerard Guidry. Judge Sarah S. Vance no longer assigned to case. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 6/27/2019.(cg)
June 19, 2019 Filing 9 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #8 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. **Filing attorney selected unnecessary additional events - MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and MOTION to Dismiss Case. Clerk took corrective action by removing the events.** (mm)
June 19, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by New Orleans City. Motion(s) will be submitted on 7/31/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Notice of Submission, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C)Attorney Tanya L. Irvin added to party New Orleans City(pty:dft).(Irvin, Tanya) Modified text on 6/19/2019 (mm).
May 30, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed; New Orleans City served on 5/29/2019, answer due 6/19/2019. (Person, Eric) Modified text/updated answer due date on 5/30/2019 (mm).
May 30, 2019 Filing 6 DEFICIENT: SUMMONS Returned Executed; (Person, Eric) Modified text on 5/30/2019 (mm).
May 29, 2019 Filing 5 DEFICIENT: SUMMONS Returned Executed; New Orleans City served on 5/29/2019, answer due 6/19/2019. (Person, Eric) Modified text on 5/29/2019 (mm).
May 16, 2019 Filing 4 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #1 Complaint. **Filing attorney did not properly format the pdf of the civil cover sheet and the summons. The pdf's should not have the blue boxes nor the 3 red buttons at the bottom. When using a FORM, fill in the applicable fields then click the red PRINT button at the bottom to print the document to pdf format. Clerk has taken corrective action.** (mm)
May 16, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to New Orleans City. (mm)
May 16, 2019 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Sarah S. Vance and Magistrate Judge Dana Douglas. (cc)
May 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against New Orleans City (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7647931) filed by Robert Ancira. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons) Attorney Eric Oliver Person added to party Robert Ancira(pty:pla). (Person, Eric) (Attachment 1 replaced on 5/16/2019) (mm). (Attachment 2 replaced on 5/16/2019) (mm). Modified text on 5/16/2019 (mm).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ancira v New Orleans City
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New Orleans City
Represented By: Shawn Lindsay
Represented By: Churita H. Hansell
Represented By: Donesia Diane Turner
Represented By: Corwin St. Raymond
Represented By: Sunni Jones LeBeouf
Represented By: Tanya L. Irvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Ancira
Represented By: Eric Oliver Person
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?