Adoue v. UNUM Life Insurance Company of America

Plaintiff: Michael F. Adoue and Michael F Adoue
Defendant: UNUM Life Insurance Company of America
Case Number: 2:2019cv10500
Filed: May 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Nannette Jolivette Brown
Referring Judge: Greg Gerard Guidry
2 Judge: Karen Wells Roby
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE. Case transferred to Judge Greg Gerard Guidry. Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown no longer assigned to case. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 6/27/2019.(mmv)
May 24, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed; UNUM Life Insurance Company of America served on 5/20/2019, answer due 6/10/2019. (Toledano, Reagan)
May 17, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to UNUM Life Insurance Company of America. (mmv)
May 16, 2019 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown and Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby. (cc)
May 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against UNUM Life Insurance Company of America (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7649173) filed by Michael F. Adoue. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)Attorney Reagan Levert Toledano added to party Michael F. Adoue(pty:pla).(Toledano, Reagan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Adoue v. UNUM Life Insurance Company of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael F. Adoue
Represented By: Reagan Levert Toledano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael F Adoue
Represented By: James Frederick Willeford
Represented By: Reagan Levert Toledano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNUM Life Insurance Company of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?