Archer Daniels Midland Company, et al v. American Liberty M/T

Plaintiff: Archer Daniels Midland Company, American River Transportation Company, LLC and ADM International SARL
Defendant: American Liberty M/T
Intervenor Plaintiff: African Griffon Shipping Co. Ltd., Kevin Wright and Port of South Louisiana
Consolidated Petitioner: Crowley Global Ship Management, Inc.
Intervenor Defendant: American Petroleum Tankers X LLC, Crowley Marine Services, Inc., Kinder Morgan, Inc., American Petroleum Tankers LLC and American Petroleum Tankers X
Case Number: 2:2019cv10525
Filed: May 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Karen Wells Roby
Referring Judge: Sarah S Vance
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1333
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 10, 2019 Filing 31 Return of Service of Vessel Arrest Warrant served on Master of M/T American Liberty on 5/20/2019(Reference: 19-10525)(mm)
June 10, 2019 Filing 30 Return of Service Unexecuted of 1st Amended Complaint and Verification on Master of M/T American Liberty on 5/30/2019(Reference: 19-10525)(mm)
June 10, 2019 Filing 29 Return of Service of Release of Vessel on Master of M/T American Liberty on 5/23/2019.(mm) (Reference: 19-10525)
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER: It has been brought to the Court's attention that Civil Action No. 19-10925, In the Matter of the Complaint of the Owners of the M/T American Liberty, is related to the above case, Accordingly; IT IS ORDERED that the above matters are hereby consolidated. Pursuant to the Court's directive, all pleadings hereafter filed in this consolidated proceeding shall bear the caption of the lead consolidated case together with the docket number of all cases within the consolidation to which the document applies or the notation "ALL CASES" if it applies to all cases. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance on 6/10/2019.(mm)
June 5, 2019 Filing 27 Summons Issued as to American Petroleum Tankers X LLC, Crowley Marine Services, Inc., Kinder Morgan, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(mm)
June 5, 2019 Filing 26 Verified Complaint in Intervention filed by Kevin Wright.(mm) (Attachments #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons) (mm).
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting #24 Unopposed Motion for Leave to Intervene. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance on 6/5/2019. (mm)
June 4, 2019 Filing 24 EXPARTE/CONSENT Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Intervene by Kevin Wright. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Pleading, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons) Attorney Charles Arlen Braud, II added to party Kevin Wright(pty:intvp).(Braud, Charles) Modified text on 6/4/2019 (mm).
June 4, 2019 Filing 23 Verified Complaint in Intervention filed by Port of South Louisiana. (Attachments: #1 Verification)(mm)
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #19 Motion for Leave to Intervene. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance on 6/4/2019. (mm)
June 3, 2019 Filing 21 Verified Statement of Right or Interest by American Petroleum Tankers X . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Swaim, Frederick) Modified text on 6/4/2019 (mm).
June 3, 2019 Filing 20 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #19 MOTION for Leave to Intervene. **Filing attorney should have attached the Complaint in Intervention as a separate attachment to the Motion for Leave and selected the category Proposed Pleading. Clerk took corrective action.** (mm)
June 3, 2019 Filing 19 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to Intervene by Port of South Louisiana. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Attorney Lena Dawn Giangrosso added to party The Port of South Louisiana(pty:intvp).(Giangrosso, Lena) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/3/2019: #2 Proposed Pleading, #3 Verification) (mm). Modified text on 6/3/2019 (mm).
May 23, 2019 Filing 18 First Supplemental and AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Archer Daniels Midland Company, American River Transportation Company, LLC, ADM International SARL. (Attachments: #1 Verification)(mm)
May 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #16 Motion to Substitute First Supplemental and AMENDED COMPLAINT. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that leave is granted to allow the withdrawal of Record Document 15, and to substitute the correct First Supplemental and Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance on 5/23/2019. (mm)
May 22, 2019 Filing 16 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Substitute Correct Document by American River Transportation Company, LLC, Archer Daniels Midland Company, ADM International SARL. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Pleading-Complaint, #3 Proposed Pleading-Verification, #4 Proposed Order)Attorney David M. Flotte added to party ADM International SARL(pty:pla).(Flotte, David) Modified text on 5/22/2019 (mm).
May 22, 2019 Filing 15 **WITHDRAWN PER ORDER AT REC. DOC. 17** First Supplemental and AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Archer Daniels Midland Company, American River Transportation Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Verification)(Flotte, David) Modified text on 5/22/2019 (mm).
May 21, 2019 Filing 14 Intervenor COMPLAINT filed by African Griffon Shipping Co. Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Verification)(mm) (Withhold Service)
May 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Leave to Intervene. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance on 5/21/2019. (mm)
May 20, 2019 Filing 12 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to Intervene by African Griffon Shipping Co. Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Pleading) Attorney G. Beauregard Gelpi added to party African Griffon Shipping Co. Ltd.(pty:intv).(Gelpi, G.) Modified text on 5/21/2019 (mm).
May 20, 2019 Filing 11 WARRANT of Arrest of vessel issued regarding the M/T American Liberty. (2cc: USM) (am)
May 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER GRANTING #6 Motion to Appoint Substitute Custodian, as set forth in document. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance on 05/20/2019. (3cc: USM) (am)
May 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER GRANTING #3 Motion to Permit Movement of Vessel After Seizure, as set forth in document. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance on 05/20/2019. (3cc: USM) (am)
May 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER GRANTING #2 Motion for Issuance of Warrant of Arrest of M/T American Liberty, as set forth in document. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance on 05/20/2019. (3cc: USM) (am)
May 20, 2019 Filing 7 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #6 MOTION to Appoint Substitute Custodian, #3 MOTION to Permit Vessel Movement and Cargo Operations within the District, #2 MOTION Authorizing Issuance of Process and Maritime Arrest. **1. Attachments had duplicate descriptions. For attachments, select either a category OR enter a description, but not both since this results in duplicate docket text. Clerk took corrective action. 2. Document does not contain Section and Magistrate Judge. All future pleadings must reflect Section R and Magistrate 4.** (mm)
May 20, 2019 Filing 6 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appoint Substitute Custodian by American River Transportation Company, LLC, Archer Daniels Midland Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Frey, Kevin)
May 20, 2019 Filing 5 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #1 Complaint. **1. Filing attorney did not properly format the pdf of the civil cover sheet. The pdf should not have the blue boxes nor the 3 red buttons at the bottom. When using a FORM, fill in the applicable fields then click the red PRINT button at the bottom to print the document to pdf format. Clerk has taken corrective action. 2. Attachments had duplicate descriptions. For attachments, select either a category OR enter a description, but not both since this results in duplicate docket text. Clerk took corrective action.** (mm)
May 20, 2019 Filing 4 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Sarah S. Vance and Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby. (ess)
May 20, 2019 Filing 3 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Permit Vessel Movement and Cargo Operations within the District by American River Transportation Company, LLC, Archer Daniels Midland Company . (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Frey, Kevin) Modified text on 5/20/2019 (mm).
May 20, 2019 Filing 2 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION Authorizing Issuance of Process and Maritime Arrest by American River Transportation Company, LLC, Archer Daniels Midland Company . (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Frey, Kevin) Modified text on 5/20/2019 (mm).
May 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against American Liberty M/T (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7652719) filed by Archer Daniels Midland Company, American River Transportation Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Verification, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) Attorney Kevin M. Frey added to party American River Transportation Company, LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Kevin M. Frey added to party Archer Daniels Midland Company (pty:pla).(Frey, Kevin) Modified text on 5/20/2019 (mm). (Attachment 2 replaced on 5/20/2019) (mm).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Archer Daniels Midland Company, et al v. American Liberty M/T
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Archer Daniels Midland Company
Represented By: David M. Flotte
Represented By: Marcelle P. Mouledoux
Represented By: Kevin M. Frey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American River Transportation Company, LLC
Represented By: David M. Flotte
Represented By: Marcelle P. Mouledoux
Represented By: Kevin M. Frey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ADM International SARL
Represented By: David M. Flotte
Represented By: Marcelle P. Mouledoux
Represented By: Kevin M. Frey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Liberty M/T
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: African Griffon Shipping Co. Ltd.
Represented By: G. Beauregard Gelpi
Represented By: Michael H. Bagot, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Kevin Wright
Represented By: Michelle O. Gallagher
Represented By: Charles Arlen Braud, II
Represented By: Steven Dewayne Jackson, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Port of South Louisiana
Represented By: Lena Dawn Giangrosso
Represented By: Henry St. Paul Provosty
Represented By: Zachary Paul Fickes
Represented By: Eric R.G. Belin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated petitioner: Crowley Global Ship Management, Inc.
Represented By: Jason P. Waguespack
Represented By: Frederick William Swaim, III
Represented By: Andrew Vincent Waters
Represented By: Emmitt L. DuBose, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: American Petroleum Tankers X LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: Crowley Marine Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: Kinder Morgan, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: American Petroleum Tankers LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: American Petroleum Tankers X
Represented By: Jason P. Waguespack
Represented By: Frederick William Swaim, III
Represented By: Andrew Vincent Waters
Represented By: Emmitt L. DuBose, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?