In the Matter of Madere & Sons Marine Rental, LLC

Plaintiff: Madere & Sons Marine Rental, LLC
Claimant: R & R Boats, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv10610
Filed: May 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Mary Ann Vial Lemmon
Referring Judge: Joseph C Wilkinson
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 46:30504
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 16, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE - A Scheduling Conference is set for 8/8/2019 10:00 AM before case manager by telephone. By Clerk.(sbs)
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Entry of Default as to all parties yet to file a claim in the limitation proceeding by Madere & Sons Marine Rental, LLC. Signed by Deputy Clerk. (sbs)
July 9, 2019 Filing 5 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Default by Madere & Sons Marine Rental, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Publication, #2 Proposed Order)(Davis, Adam) Modified text on 7/11/2019 (sbs).
June 26, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER and CLAIM to #1 Complaint, by R & R Boats, Inc..Attorney Rufus C. Harris, III added to party R & R Boats, Inc.(pty:selreq).(Harris, Rufus)
May 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER DIRECTING THE ISSUANCE OF NOTICE TO CLAIMANTS AND RESTRAINING PROSECUTION OF CLAIMS. Signed by Judge Mary Ann Vial Lemmon on 5/22/2019. (Attachments: #1 Notice to Claimants)(ajn)
May 21, 2019 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Mary Ann Vial Lemmon and Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr. (cc)
May 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Madere & Sons Marine Rental, LLC (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7657263) filed by Madere & Sons Marine Rental, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Verification, #2 Proposed Order Directing Issuance of Notice, #3 Proposed Notice to Claimants, #4 Proposed Letter of Undertaking, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney Thomas Kent Ledyard Morrison added to party Madere & Sons Marine Rental, LLC(pty:pla).(Morrison, Thomas) (Attachment 5 replaced on 5/21/2019) (ajn).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In the Matter of Madere & Sons Marine Rental, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Madere & Sons Marine Rental, LLC
Represented By: Adam N. Davis
Represented By: Thomas Kent Ledyard Morrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: R & R Boats, Inc.
Represented By: Alfred Jackson Rufty, III
Represented By: Rufus C. Harris, III
Represented By: Cindy Galpin Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?