Daniels et al v. Risk Placement Services et al

Plaintiff: Ian Daniels, Brett Daniels Trust and Brett Daniels 2010 Guarantor Trust
Defendant: Arthur J. Gallagher Risk Service Company, LLC, Arthur J. Gallager Risk Management Service, Inc., Risk Placement Services, Risk Placement Services, Inc., Scottsdale Insurance Company, Arthur J. Gallagher Service Company, LLC and Arthur J. Gallagher Risk and Management Services, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv10632
Filed: May 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Barry W Ashe
Referring Judge: Janis van Meerveld
2 Judge: Karen Wells Roby
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 19, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal, by Arthur J. Gallager Risk and Management Service, Inc., Risk Placement Services, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Roselli, Alexandra) Modified text on 6/20/2019 (sa).
June 14, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal,, with Jury Demand by Scottsdale Insurance Company.(Hanna, Mark)
May 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. IT IS ORDERED that Defendants Risk Placement Services, Inc., Arthur J. Gallagher Risk Management Service, Inc., and Arthur J. Gallagher Risk Service Company, LLC are granted an extension to file responsive pleadings for a period of 21 days from the time the pleading would otherwise be due, pursuant to Local Rule 7.8. Signed by Judge Barry W Ashe on 5/29/2019. (sa)
May 28, 2019 Filing 8 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer and Responsive Pleadings by Arthur J. Gallager Risk Management Service, Inc., Arthur J. Gallagher Risk Service Company, LLC, Risk Placement Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Roselli, Alexandra)
May 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. IT IS ORDERED that defendant, Scottsdale Insurance Company, is granted an extension of of twenty-one (21) days from the date of the Order within which to file responsive pleadings. Signed by Judge Barry W Ashe on 5/24/2019. (sa)
May 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby. Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld no longer assigned to case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld on 5/24/2019. (NEF: Judge Roby)(ajn)
May 23, 2019 Filing 5 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Plaintiffs' Petition by Scottsdale Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Mark Emerson Hanna added to party Scottsdale Insurance Company(pty:dft).(Hanna, Mark)
May 23, 2019 Filing 4 Directive of the Clerk regarding compliance with 28:1447(b) #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Arthur J. Gallagher Risk Service Company, LLC, Arthur J. Gallager Risk Management Service, Inc., Risk Placement Services, Inc. Issued by Clerk.(sa)
May 22, 2019 Filing 3 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Barry W Ashe and Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld. (ess)
May 22, 2019 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet Submitted (Griffin, Chaseray) (Main Document 2 flattened & replaced on 5/23/2019) (sa).
May 22, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Civil District Court New Orleans, case number 2019-03649 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7660171) filed by Arthur J. Gallagher Risk Service Company, LLC, Arthur J. Gallager Risk Management Service, Inc., Risk Placement Services. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C) Attorney Chaseray Levonn Griffin added to party Arthur J. Gallager Risk Management Service, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Chaseray Levonn Griffin added to party Arthur J. Gallagher Risk Service Company, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Chaseray Levonn Griffin added to party Risk Placement Services(pty:dft).(Griffin, Chaseray) Modified text on 5/23/2019 (sa).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Daniels et al v. Risk Placement Services et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arthur J. Gallagher Risk Service Company, LLC
Represented By: Chaseray Levonn Griffin
Represented By: Alexandra Grace Roselli
Represented By: Christopher A. D'Amour
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arthur J. Gallager Risk Management Service, Inc.
Represented By: Chaseray Levonn Griffin
Represented By: Alexandra Grace Roselli
Represented By: Christopher A. D'Amour
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Risk Placement Services
Represented By: Chaseray Levonn Griffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Risk Placement Services, Inc.
Represented By: Chaseray Levonn Griffin
Represented By: Alexandra Grace Roselli
Represented By: Christopher A. D'Amour
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scottsdale Insurance Company
Represented By: Trevor Matthew Cutaiar
Represented By: Mark Emerson Hanna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arthur J. Gallagher Service Company, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arthur J. Gallagher Risk and Management Services, Inc.
Represented By: Chaseray Levonn Griffin
Represented By: Alexandra Grace Roselli
Represented By: Christopher A. D'Amour
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ian Daniels
Represented By: Jacob D. Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brett Daniels Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brett Daniels 2010 Guarantor Trust
Represented By: Jacob D. Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?