Johnson v. Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Stanley Johnson
Defendant: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2019cv10660
Filed: May 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Ivan LR Lemelle
Referring Judge: Karen Wells Roby
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 29:1001
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 18, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Hearing. Scheduling Conference set for 7/30/2019 11:00 AM before case manager by telephone. All parties are to call into the conference call at the toll free number provided. By Clerk. (kac)
July 17, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company.Attorney Virginia N. Roddy added to party Metropolitan Life Insurance Company(pty:dft).(Roddy, Virginia)
July 1, 2019 Filing 5 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #1 Complaint. **Original Complaint filed was missing a page. Filing attorney's office contacted Clerk and provided the full complaint via email. Clerk replaced the incomplete Complaint with the complete version provided by filing attorney. No further action necessary.** (sbs)
May 24, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (jls)
May 24, 2019 Filing 3 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #1 Complaint. **Images filed sideways. Clerk has corrected and replaced images.** (jls)
May 24, 2019 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Ivan L.R. Lemelle and Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby. (gk)
May 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Metropolitan Life Insurance Company (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7663419) filed by Stanley Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)Attorney Stephen Patrick Skiles added to party Stanley Johnson(pty:selreq).(Skiles, Stephen) (Main Document 1 replaced on 5/24/2019) (jls). (Attachment 1 replaced on 5/24/2019) (jls). (Attachment 2 replaced on 5/24/2019) (jls). (Main Document 1 replaced on 7/1/2019) (sbs).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stanley Johnson
Represented By: Stephen Patrick Skiles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Virginia N. Roddy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?