Gamble v. Renaissance Group et al

Plaintiff: Cameron C Gamble and Cameron Gamble
Defendant: Renaissance Group, Renaissance Inc, Mr. Charlie Lusco, Jonas Robertson, Renaissance Group, Inc., Peter Traigle, Richard Hoffman, Lane Franks and Charlie Lusco
Case Number: 2:2019cv10661
Filed: May 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Michael North
Referring Judge: Wendy B Vitter
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 18, 2019 Filing 38 MOTION to Dismiss by Renaissance Group, Renaissance Group, Inc., Renaissance Inc, Jonas Robertson. Motion(s) will be submitted on 8/13/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Notice of Submission)Attorney Joseph B. Landry, Jr added to party Renaissance Group(pty:dft), Attorney Joseph B. Landry, Jr added to party Renaissance Group, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Joseph B. Landry, Jr added to party Renaissance Inc(pty:dft), Attorney Joseph B. Landry, Jr added to party Jonas Robertson(pty:dft).(Landry, Joseph)
July 18, 2019 Filing 37 AMENDED Notice of Removal from 21st JDC, Tangipahoa Parish, case number 2019-1190 D per Order of the Court Rec. Doc. No. 27 filed by Charlie Lusco.(Jarrott, Colleen) Modified text/event on 7/19/2019 (jeg).
July 17, 2019 Filing 36 Summons Issued as to Richard Hoffman, Peter Traigle. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(jeg)
July 17, 2019 Filing 35 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #33 Request for Summons Issued, #34 Request for Summons Issued. **Filing attorney did not properly format the pdf of the Summons. The pdf should not have the purple boxes nor the 3 red buttons at the bottom. When using a FORM, fill in the applicable fields then click the red PRINT button at the bottom to print the document to pdf format. Clerk has taken corrective action. No further action necessary.** (Attachments: #1 Summons) (jeg)
July 16, 2019 Filing 34 Request of Summons Issued as to Peter Traigle filed by Cameron Gamble re #1 Notice of Removal. (Morrow, P.) (Main Document 34 replaced on 7/17/2019) (jeg).
July 16, 2019 Filing 33 Request of Summons Issued as to Richard Hoffman filed by Cameron Gamble re #1 Notice of Removal. (Morrow, P.) (Main Document 33 replaced on 7/17/2019) (jeg).
July 15, 2019 Filing 32 MOTION to Strike #25 Response/Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, (Strike Exhibits to Plaintiff's Opposition) by Charlie Lusco. Motion(s) will be submitted on 7/30/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Notice of Submission)(Jarrott, Colleen)
July 15, 2019 Filing 31 AFFIDAVIT of Service by P. Craig Morrow of Petition and Discovery served on Lane Franks on April 25, 2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Morrow, P.)
July 12, 2019 Filing 30 **DEFICIENT** EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Strike Exhibits Attached to Plaintiff's Opposition to Lusco's Motion to Dismiss by Charlie Lusco. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Order)(Jarrott, Colleen) Modified on 7/15/2019 (jeg).
July 12, 2019 Filing 29 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Reply In Support of Lusco's Motion to Dismiss by Charlie Lusco. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading, #2 Proposed Order)(Jarrott, Colleen) Modified text on 7/15/2019 (jeg).
July 11, 2019 Filing 28 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum by Cameron Gamble. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Pleading Plaintiff's Reply Memorandum to Lusco's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand, #3 Exhibit 1 to proposed Reply Memorandum, #4 Exhibit 2 to proposed Reply Memorandum, #5 Exhibit 3 to proposed Reply Memorandum)(Ryan, James)
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER: ORDERED that removing defendant, Charlie Lusco, shall have seven (7) days from the date of this Order to file a comprehensive amended notice of removal without further leave of Court properly setting forth the citizenship particulars required to establish that the Court has diversity jurisdiction over this case. Signed by Judge Wendy B Vitter on 7/9/2019.(jeg)
July 8, 2019 Filing 26 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Charlie Lusco re #13 MOTION to Remand to State Court . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Jarrott, Colleen)
July 8, 2019 Filing 25 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Cameron Gamble re #12 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim or, in the alternative, Motion for More Definite Statement . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit #1, #2 Exhibit #2, #3 Exhibit #3, #4 Exhibit #4, #5 Exhibit #5, #6 Exhibit #6, #7 Exhibit #7, #8 Exhibit #8)(Morrow, P.)
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER DENYING AS MOOT #18 Motion to Expedite Consideration of Motion to Continue. Signed by Judge Wendy B Vitter on 7/1/2019. (jeg)
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER GRANTING #17 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #17 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Notice of Removal. Defendant Jonas Robertson is granted an additional 21 days from the date of this Order to file a response in this matter. Signed by Judge Wendy B Vitter on 6/27/2019. (jeg)
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER GRANTING #21 Motion to Supplement Plaintiff's Motion to Continue. The clerk's office is instructed to supplement the record with R. Doc. 21-1. Signed by Judge Wendy B Vitter on 6/27/2019. (jeg)
June 26, 2019 Filing 21 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Supplement Plaintiff's Motion to Continue [Doc. 16] by Cameron Gamble. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading- Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order)(Ryan, James) Modified text on 6/27/2019 (jeg).
June 24, 2019 Filing 20 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #18 MOTION to Expedite consideration of Motion to Continue [Doc.16]. **1. Filing attorney should have selected 'Yes' at the question 'Is this an Exparte/Consent Motion Y/N?'. Exparte/Consent Motions are not set for submission. Clerk modified docket text to reflect 'Exparte' and remove submission date. No further action necessary. 2. Filing attorney did not include a proposed order. Proposed Order subsequently provided to Clerk and has now been attached to the motion. No further action necessary.** (jeg)
June 24, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE regarding oral argument re #13 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Cameron Gamble. By Clerk.(mmv)
June 21, 2019 Filing 18 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Expedite consideration of Motion to Continue [Doc.16] by Cameron Gamble. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Notice of Submission)(Ryan, James) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/24/2019: #3 Proposed Order) (jeg). Modified text on 6/24/2019 (jeg).
June 21, 2019 Filing 16 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Continue Motion to Dismiss [Doc. 12] by Cameron Gamble. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Order)(Ryan, James) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/27/2019: #3 Exhibit A- consent, per order, rec doc 22) (jeg).
June 21, 2019 Filing 15 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #12 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim or, in the alternative, Motion for More Definite Statement. **Filing attorney should have selected 'No' at the question 'Is this an Exparte/Consent Motion Y/N? Motions that are set for hearing are not Exparte. Clerk has removed 'Exparte' and added Submission Date. No further action necessary.** (jeg)
June 20, 2019 Filing 17 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Notice of Removal, by Jonas Robertson. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(jeg)
June 20, 2019 Filing 14 Request/Statement of Oral Argument by Cameron Gamble regarding #13 MOTION to Remand to State Court (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Ryan, James)
June 20, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Cameron Gamble. Motion(s) will be submitted on 7/16/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Notice of Submission)(Ryan, James)
June 20, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim or, in the alternative, Motion for More Definite Statement by Charlie Lusco. Motion(s) will be submitted on 7/16/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Proposed Order, #4 Notice of Submission)(Chester, Matthew) Modified text/submission date on 6/21/2019 (jeg).
June 10, 2019 Filing 11 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #10 Notice (Other). **Filing attorney selected incorrect event. Correct event is Notice of Compliance. Clerk took corrective action by changing the event. No further action necessary.** (jeg)
June 7, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Compliance pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1447(b) re #4 Directive of the Court. by Charlie Lusco (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Chester, Matthew) Modified text on 6/10/2019 (jeg).
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE. Case transferred to Judge Wendy B Vitter. Judge Susie Morgan no longer assigned to case. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 6/3/2019.(sbs)
May 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Notice of Removal. Defendant Jonas Robertson is granted an additional 21 days to file a response in this matter. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan on 5/29/2019. (sbs)
May 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Notice of Removal, as to Charlie Lusco answer due 6/20/2019. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan on 5/29/2019. (sbs)
May 29, 2019 Filing 6 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Notice of Removal, by Jonas Robertson. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(sbs)
May 29, 2019 Filing 5 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Plead Pursuant to Local Rule 7.8 and FRCP 6(b)(1)(A), and Request for Expedited Consideration re #1 Notice of Removal, by Charlie Lusco. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Jarrott, Colleen) Modified text on 5/29/2019 (sbs).
May 24, 2019 Filing 4 Directive of the Clerk regarding compliance with 28:1447(b) re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Charlie Lusco. By the Clerk.(sbs)
May 24, 2019 Filing 3 Amendment State Court Pleadings to #1 Notice of Removal by Charlie Lusco. (Jarrott, Colleen) Modified text on 5/24/2019 (sbs).
May 24, 2019 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Susie Morgan and Magistrate Judge Michael North. (gk)
May 23, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 21st JDC, Tangipahoa Parish, case number 2019-1190 D (Filing fee $400 receipt number 053L-7663515) filed by Charlie Lusco. (Attachments: #1 State Court Pleadings, #2 State Court Pleadings, #3 State Court Pleadings, #4 State Court Pleadings, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney Colleen Carr Jarrott added to party Charlie Lusco(pty:dft).(Jarrott, Colleen) Modified text on 5/24/2019 (sbs).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gamble v. Renaissance Group et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Renaissance Group
Represented By: Joseph B. Landry, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Renaissance Inc
Represented By: Joseph B. Landry, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr. Charlie Lusco
Represented By: Colleen Carr Jarrott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonas Robertson
Represented By: Joseph B. Landry, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Renaissance Group, Inc.
Represented By: Joseph B. Landry, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter Traigle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Hoffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lane Franks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charlie Lusco
Represented By: Colleen Carr Jarrott
Represented By: Matthew S Chester
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cameron C Gamble
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cameron Gamble
Represented By: P. Craig Morrow, Jr.
Represented By: Joseph Thomas Anderson
Represented By: James P. Ryan
Represented By: Bradley A. Stevens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?