MK Electric Man, L.L.C. v. Maillot et al

Plaintiff: MK Electric Man, L.L.C.
Defendant: Enterprise Restoration Services, LLC
3Rd Party Defendant: John W Adams, III, Trey Adams, BrownGreer PLC and Unidentified Parties
3Rd Party Plaintiff: Georges H. Maillot and Janice Brewster Maillot
Case Number: 2:2019cv10676
Filed: May 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Eldon E Fallon
Referring Judge: Joseph C Wilkinson
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 31, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint by BrownGreer PLC.(Woody, Jacob)
May 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE. Case transferred to Judge Eldon E. Fallon and Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr. Judge Jane Triche Milazzo, Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo on 5/29/2019. (NEF: Section L and Magistrate 2)(jeg)
May 28, 2019 Filing 4 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #1 Notice of Removal. **Exhibits on incorrect sized paper. All papers drafted filed in this court shall be on 8-1/2" by 11" paper. Clerk has reduced images. No further action needed.** (sbs)
May 28, 2019 Filing 3 Directive of the Clerk regarding compliance with 28:1447(b) re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by BrownGreer PLC. By the Clerk.(sbs)
May 24, 2019 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Jane Triche Milazzo and Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld. (ess)
May 24, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand from 22nd JDC, St. Tammany Parish, case number 2019-10723 J (Filing fee $400 receipt number 053L-7664662) filed by BrownGreer PLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Complaint, #3 Exhibit, #4 State Court Pleadings)Attorney Jacob S. Woody added to party BrownGreer PLC(pty:3pd).(Woody, Jacob) Modified text on 5/28/2019 (sbs). (Attachment 1 replaced on 5/28/2019) (sbs). (Attachment 4 replaced on 5/28/2019) (sbs).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MK Electric Man, L.L.C. v. Maillot et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: John W Adams, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Trey Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: BrownGreer PLC
Represented By: Jacob S. Woody
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Unidentified Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: Georges H. Maillot
Represented By: Judith Brewster Otero
Represented By: Willard O. Lape, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: Janice Brewster Maillot
Represented By: Judith Brewster Otero
Represented By: Willard O. Lape, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MK Electric Man, L.L.C.
Represented By: Ewell C Potts, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Enterprise Restoration Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?