1312-1314 Antonine, LLC v. New Orleans City

Plaintiff: 1312-1314 Antonine, LLC
Defendant: City of New Orleans and New Orleans City
Case Number: 2:2019cv10695
Filed: May 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Greg Gerard Guidry
Referring Judge: Jane Triche Milazzo
2 Judge: Michael North
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE. Case transferred to Judge Greg Gerard Guidry. Judge Jane Triche Milazzo no longer assigned to case. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 07/02/2019.(am)
June 19, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , MOTION to Dismiss Case for failure to join necessary party by New Orleans City. Motion(s) will be submitted on 7/31/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Notice of Submission, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C)Attorney Tanya L. Irvin added to party New Orleans City(pty:dft).(Irvin, Tanya)
May 30, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed; (Person, Eric)
May 29, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed; New Orleans City served on 5/29/2019, answer due 6/19/2019. (Person, Eric)
May 28, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to New Orleans City. (sbs)
May 24, 2019 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Jane Triche Milazzo and Magistrate Judge Michael North. (gk)
May 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against New Orleans City (Filing fee $400 receipt number 053L-7666043) filed by 1312-1314 Antonine, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) Attorney Eric Oliver Person added to party 1312-1314 Antonine, LLC(pty:pla).(Person, Eric) (Attachment 1 and 2 replaced on 5/28/2019) (sbs). Modified text on 5/28/2019 (sbs).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: 1312-1314 Antonine, LLC v. New Orleans City
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 1312-1314 Antonine, LLC
Represented By: Eric Oliver Person
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of New Orleans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New Orleans City
Represented By: Shawn Lindsay
Represented By: Churita H. Hansell
Represented By: Donesia Diane Turner
Represented By: Corwin St. Raymond
Represented By: Sunni Jones LeBeouf
Represented By: Tanya L. Irvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?