Dat's Cajun Seafood vs. United States of America
Plaintiff: Dat's Cajun Seafood
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 2:2019cv10698
Filed: May 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Greg Gerard Guidry
Referring Judge: Janis van Meerveld
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 07:2023
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE - Case transferred to Judge Greg Gerard Guidry. Judge Barry W Ashe no longer assigned to case. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 6/27/2019.(sa)
June 19, 2019 Filing 8 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #7 Certificate of Service. Filing attorney selected incorrect event. Correct event is "SUMMONS Returned Executed as to USA or Agency of USA" which automatically sets the answer deadlines. Clerk took corrective action to update service information: United States of America served on 6/7/2019, answer due 8/6/2019. (sa)
June 18, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to USA or Agency of USA; United States of America served on 6/7/2019, answer due 8/6/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proof of Service)(Trieu, Connie) Modified text/event on 6/19/2019 (sa).
May 29, 2019 Filing 6 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #4 Second MOTION to Amend/Correct add the necessary order. Filing attorney filed a Proposed Order to be attached to their previously filed #2 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. The filing should have been docketed under the event "Amendment/Supplement to Document." The Proposed Order has now been attached to Rec. Doc. #2 . No further action necessary. (sa)
May 29, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to United States of America. (sa)
May 28, 2019 Filing fee received from Connie Trieu: $ 400 Receipt No 053L-7666551 (ess)
May 28, 2019 Filing 4 Amendment to #2 Motion add the necessary order by Dat's Cajun Seafood. (Trieu, Connie) Modified on 5/29/2019 (sa).
May 28, 2019 Filing 3 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Barry W Ashe and Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld. (ess)
May 28, 2019 Filing 2 EXPARTE MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and expedited hearing by Dat's Cajun Seafood. Attorney Connie P. Trieu added to party Dat's Cajun Seafood(pty:pla).(Trieu, Connie) (Additional attachment(s) added from Doc. 4 on 5/29/2019: #1 Proposed Order) (sa). Modified on 5/29/2019 (sa).
May 28, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against United States of America (Fee previously paid) filed by Dat's Cajun Seafood. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Summons) Attorney Connie P. Trieu added to party Dat's Cajun Seafood(pty:plaintiff).(Trieu, Connie) Modified text on 5/29/2019 (sa).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dat's Cajun Seafood vs. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dat's Cajun Seafood
Represented By: Connie P. Trieu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?