Muro v. Board of Supervisors of Louisiana State University and Agricultural and Mechanical College
Plaintiff: Cynthia Goldin Muro
Defendant: Board of Supervisors of Louisiana State University and Agricultural and Mechanical College
Case Number: 2:2019cv10812
Filed: May 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Karen Wells Roby
Referring Judge: Sarah S Vance
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 8/22/2019 10:45 AM before case manager by telephone. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance on 7/26/19.(jjs)
July 24, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed; Board of Supervisors of Louisiana State University and Agricultural and Mechanical College served on 7/11/2019, answer due 8/1/2019 (Murphy, Kerry) Modified text/answer due date on 7/25/2019 (mm).
July 24, 2019 Filing 10 DEFICIENT: SUMMONS Returned Executed; Board of Supervisors of Louisiana State University and Agricultural and Mechanical College served on 7/11/2019, answer due 8/22/2019. (Murphy, Kerry) Modified text on 7/24/2019 (mm).
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Plead re #1 Complaint as to Board of Supervisors of Louisiana State University and Agricultural and Mechanical College; answer due 8/22/2019. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance on 7/19/2019. (mm)
July 18, 2019 Filing 8 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Plead re #1 Complaint by Board of Supervisors of Louisiana State University and Agricultural and Mechanical College. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Attorney Craig R. Watson added to party Board of Supervisors of Louisiana State University and Agricultural and Mechanical College(pty:dft).(Watson, Craig) Modified text on 7/18/2019 (mm).
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Adria Lynn Silva. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance on 7/10/2019. (Attachments: #1 PHV Notice) (mm)
July 9, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Board of Supervisors of Louisiana State University and Agricultural and Mechanical College. (mm)
July 9, 2019 Filing 5 Request of Summons Issued as to Board of Supervisors of Louisiana State University and Agricultural and Mechanical College filed by Cynthia Goldin Muro re #1 Complaint. (Murphy, Kerry)
July 9, 2019 Filing 4 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Adria L. Silva (Fee previously paid) by Cynthia Goldin Muro. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C)(Murphy, Kerry) Modified text on 7/9/2019 (mm).
June 10, 2019 Filing 3 DEFICIENT: EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filed on Behalf of Attorney Adria L. Silva (Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 053L-7696051) by Cynthia Goldin Muro. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit A- Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Exhibit B-Declaration of Adria L. Silva, #4 Exhibit C-ECF Attorney Registration Form)(Murphy, Kerry) Modified text on 6/10/2019 (mm).
May 30, 2019 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Sarah S. Vance and Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby. (gk)
May 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against Board of Supervisors of Louisiana State University and Agricultural and Mechanical College (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7674680) filed by Cynthia Goldin Muro. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney Kerry Ann Murphy added to party Cynthia Goldin Muro(pty:pla).(Murphy, Kerry) (WITHHOLD SERVICE)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Muro v. Board of Supervisors of Louisiana State University and Agricultural and Mechanical College
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Board of Supervisors of Louisiana State University and Agricultural and Mechanical College
Represented By: Craig R. Watson
Represented By: Guice Anthony Giambrone, III
Represented By: Amanda M. Plaiscia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cynthia Goldin Muro
Represented By: Kerry Ann Murphy
Represented By: Catherine Elena Lasky
Represented By: Adria Lynn Silva
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?