Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company v. Electrolux Home Products, Inc.
Plaintiff: Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company
Defendant: Electrolux Home Products, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv10883
Filed: June 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Eldon E Fallon
Referring Judge: Janis van Meerveld
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 25, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed; Electrolux Home Products, Inc. served on 7/18/2019, answer due 8/8/2019. (Miller, Eric)
June 6, 2019 Filing 5 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #3 Summons Submitted for Issuance, #4 Summons Issued. **Filing attorney incorrectly uploaded page 1 of summons. Clerk took corrective action by attaching page 2 of form when issuing summons. Please upload complete forms on future pleadings.** (jeg)
June 6, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Electrolux Home Products, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Page 2 of Summons)(jeg)
June 5, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Submitted for Issuance (Miller, Eric)
June 5, 2019 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Eldon E. Fallon and Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld. (gk)
June 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against Electrolux Home Products, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7685330) filed by Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney Eric J. Miller added to party Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company(pty:pla).(Miller, Eric)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company v. Electrolux Home Products, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Electrolux Home Products, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company
Represented By: Eric J. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?