Castillo v. E.M. Dimitri, D.O. Professional Medical Corporation
Plaintiff: Ruby Castillo
Defendant: E.M. Dimitri, D.O. Professional Medical Corporation and E.M. Dimitri D.O. Professional Medical Corporation
Case Number: 2:2019cv10888
Filed: June 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Nannette Jolivette Brown
Referring Judge: Greg Gerard Guidry
2 Judge: Joseph C Wilkinson
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29:2601
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 1, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by E.M. Dimitri D.O. Professional Medical Corporation. Attorney Stephen Mark Klyza added to party E.M. Dimitri D.O. Professional Medical Corporation(pty:dft).(Klyza, Stephen)
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE. Case transferred to Judge Greg Gerard Guidry. Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown no longer assigned to case. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 6/27/2019.(mmv)
June 13, 2019 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed; waiver sent to E.M. Dimitri, D.O. Professional Medical Corporation on 6/5/2019, answer due 8/5/2019. (Hilgendorf, Amanda)
June 5, 2019 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown and Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr. (gk)
June 5, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7686172) filed by Ruby Castillo. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) Attorney Amanda Geneva Hilgendorf added to party Ruby Castillo(pty:pla).(Hilgendorf, Amanda) Modified text on 6/5/2019 (mmv).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Castillo v. E.M. Dimitri, D.O. Professional Medical Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ruby Castillo
Represented By: Amanda Geneva Hilgendorf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E.M. Dimitri, D.O. Professional Medical Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E.M. Dimitri D.O. Professional Medical Corporation
Represented By: Stephen Mark Klyza
Represented By: Allison Ann Fish
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?