Marquette Transportation Company Gulf-Inland, LLC v. Navigation Maritime Bulgarea, et al
Plaintiff: Marquette Transportation Company Gulf-Inland, LLC
Defendant: Navigation Maritime Bulgarea
3Rd Party Plaintiff: Balkan Navigation Ltd.
3Rd Party Defendant: Kieffer E Bailey M/V
Case Number: 2:2019cv10927
Filed: June 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Nannette Jolivette Brown
Referring Judge: Joseph C Wilkinson
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 2, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Navigation Maritime Bulgarea.Attorney Timothy David DePaula added to party Navigation Maritime Bulgarea(pty:dft).(DePaula, Timothy)
June 24, 2019 Filing 11 WARRANT of Arrest of Vessel issued. (mmv)(3cc: USM)
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #8 Motion to Permit Movement of Vessel. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown. (jrc)
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Warrant of Arrest of Vessel. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown. (jrc)
June 21, 2019 Filing 8 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION To Permit Vessel Movement by Balkan Navigation Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(DePaula, Timothy)
June 21, 2019 Filing 7 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Issuance of Warrant of Arrest by Balkan Navigation Ltd (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(DePaula, Timothy) Modified text on 6/21/2019 (mm).
June 21, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, Third Party Complaint against Kieffer E. Bailey, Counterclaim against Marquette Transportation Company Gulf-Inland, LLC by Balkan Navigation Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Verification) Attorney Timothy David DePaula added to party Balkan Navigation Ltd.(pty:dft).(DePaula, Timothy) Modified text on 6/21/2019 (mm).
June 7, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Balkan Navigation Ltd., Navigation Maritime Bulgarea. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(mm)
June 7, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Submitted for Issuance (Davis, Adam)
June 7, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Submitted for Issuance (Davis, Adam)
June 7, 2019 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown and Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr. (cc)
June 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against Balkan Navigation Ltd., Navigation Maritime Bulgarea (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7690654) filed by Marquette Transportation Company Gulf-Inland, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) Attorney Adam N. Davis added to party Marquette Transportation Company Gulf-Inland, LLC(pty:pla).(Davis, Adam)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Marquette Transportation Company Gulf-Inland, LLC v. Navigation Maritime Bulgarea, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: Balkan Navigation Ltd.
Represented By: Robert Hugh Murphy
Represented By: Timothy David DePaula
Represented By: Peter Brooks Sloss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marquette Transportation Company Gulf-Inland, LLC
Represented By: Adam N. Davis
Represented By: Justin Cole Warner
Represented By: Evans Martin McLeod
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Navigation Maritime Bulgarea
Represented By: Timothy David DePaula
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Kieffer E Bailey M/V
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?