Wild et al v. St. Tammany Parish Hospital Service District No. 1
Plaintiff: Jean Wild and Gary Wild
Defendant: St. Tammany Parish Hospital Service District No. 1
Case Number: 2:2019cv10931
Filed: June 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Lance M Africk
Referring Judge: Dana Douglas
2 Judge: Greg Gerard Guidry
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 42:1395dd
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 19, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by St. Tammany Parish Hospital Service District No. 1.(Belsome, Bradley)
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint, as to St. Tammany Parish Hospital Service District No. 1 answer due 7/19/2019. Signed by Judge Greg Gerard Guidry on 7/10/2019. (blg)
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE. Case transferred to Judge Greg Gerard Guidry. Judge Lance M Africk no longer assigned to case. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 6/27/2019.(blg)
June 26, 2019 Filing 7 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint, by St. Tammany Parish Hospital Service District No. 1. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Bradley Russell Belsome added to party St. Tammany Parish Hospital Service District No. 1(pty:dft).(Belsome, Bradley)
June 11, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed; St. Tammany Parish Hospital Service District No. 1 served on 6/7/2019, answer due 6/28/2019. (Wagar, Nelson) Modified text on 6/11/2019 (sbs).
June 7, 2019 Filing 5 **DEFICIENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed; St. Tammany Parish Hospital Service District No. 1 served on 6/7/2019, answer due 6/28/2019. (Wagar, Nelson) Modified text on 6/10/2019 (sbs).
June 7, 2019 Filing 4 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #1 Complaint. **Filing attorney did not properly format the pdf of Summons. The pdf should not have the 3 red buttons at the bottom. When using a FORM, fill in the applicable fields then click the red PRINT button at the bottom to print the document to pdf format. Clerk has taken corrective action.** (sbs)
June 7, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to St. Tammany Parish Hospital Service District No. 1. (sbs)
June 7, 2019 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Lance M Africk and Magistrate Judge Dana Douglas. (cc)
June 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against St. Tammany Parish Hospital Service District No. 1.(Filing fee $400 receipt number 053L-7691141) filed by Jean Wild, Gary Wild. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)Attorney Nelson W. Wagar, III added to party Gary Wild(pty:pla), Attorney Nelson W. Wagar, III added to party Jean Wild(pty:pla).(Wagar, Nelson) (Attachment 2 replaced on 6/7/2019) (sbs). Modified text on 6/7/2019 (sbs).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wild et al v. St. Tammany Parish Hospital Service District No. 1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jean Wild
Represented By: Sarah W. Hickman
Represented By: Nelson W. Wagar, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Wild
Represented By: Sarah W. Hickman
Represented By: Nelson W. Wagar, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: St. Tammany Parish Hospital Service District No. 1
Represented By: Brodie G. Glenn
Represented By: Bradley Russell Belsome
Represented By: Crystal E. Domreis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?