Aucoin v. Physicians Group Laboratories, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Callie D. Aucoin
Defendant: Christopher Cedotal and Physicians Group Laboratories, LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv10932
Filed: June 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Dana Douglas
Referring Judge: Jay C Zainey
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 5, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Hearing. Scheduling Conference set for 8/19/2019 10:30 AM before case manager by telephone. By Clerk. (jrc)
August 2, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Christopher Cedotal, Physicians Group Laboratories, LLC.Attorney Michael C. Mims added to party Christopher Cedotal(pty:dft), Attorney Michael C. Mims added to party Physicians Group Laboratories, LLC(pty:dft).(Mims, Michael)
June 7, 2019 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed; waiver sent to Physicians Group Laboratories, LLC on 6/7/2019, answer due 8/6/2019. (Bullman, James)
June 7, 2019 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed; waiver sent to Christopher Cedotal on 6/7/2019, answer due 8/6/2019. (Bullman, James)
June 7, 2019 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Jay C. Zainey and Magistrate Judge Dana Douglas. (cc)
June 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Christopher Cedotal, Physicians Group Laboratories, LLC (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7691210) filed by Callie Aucoin. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons PGl, #3 Summons Cedotal)Attorney James R. Bullman added to party Callie Aucoin(pty:pla).(Bullman, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Aucoin v. Physicians Group Laboratories, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Callie D. Aucoin
Represented By: James R. Bullman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Cedotal
Represented By: Michael C. Mims
Represented By: Brittanie DeLane Wagnon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Physicians Group Laboratories, LLC
Represented By: Michael C. Mims
Represented By: Brittanie DeLane Wagnon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?