Hoffpauir v. GEICO Casualty Company
Plaintiff: Sarah Hoffpauir and Sarah E. Hoffpauir
Defendant: GEICO Casualty Company
Case Number: 2:2019cv10955
Filed: June 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Jane Triche Milazzo
Referring Judge: Michael North
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 21, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Compliance by GEICO Casualty Company as to #1 Notice of Removal (Attachments: #1 State Court Pleadings Exhibit 1 in globo)(Cronin, Stephen) Modified text/event on 6/24/2019 (sa).
June 10, 2019 Filing 3 Directive of the Clerk regarding compliance with 28:1447(b) re: #1 Notice of Removal, filed by GEICO Casualty Company. Issued by Clerk. (sa)
June 7, 2019 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Jane Triche Milazzo and Magistrate Judge Michael North. (cc)
June 7, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Civil District Court, case number 2018-12662 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7692289) filed by GEICO Casualty Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Original Petition, #3 Exhibit Tender Demand Letter, #4 Exhibit Dismissal, #5 Exhibit Amended Petition, #6 Certificate of Service)Attorney Stephen Dale Cronin added to party GEICO Casualty Company(pty:dft).(Cronin, Stephen) (Attachments 1-5 reduced legal pages, flattened images & replaced on 6/10/2019) (sa).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hoffpauir v. GEICO Casualty Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sarah Hoffpauir
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sarah E. Hoffpauir
Represented By: Salvador I. Bivalacqua
Represented By: Stephanie Moore Hartman
Represented By: Scott Michael Galante
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GEICO Casualty Company
Represented By: Stephen Dale Cronin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?