Robinson v. New Orleans College Preparatory Academies
Plaintiff: Dionne Robinson
Defendant: New Orleans Preparatory Academies and New Orleans College Preparatory Academies
Case Number: 2:2019cv10963
Filed: June 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Lance M Africk
Referring Judge: Joseph C Wilkinson
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29:2609
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 21, 2019 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed; waiver sent to New Orleans College Preparatory Academies on 6/11/2019, answer due 8/12/2019. (King, Danatus)
June 10, 2019 Filing 4 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #3 Summons Issued. **Clerk erroneously issued summons. Complaint states 'Waiver of Service Requested'. Disregard summons issued. Clerk has modified the docket text for the Complaint to note Waiver. No further action necessary.** (sbs)
June 10, 2019 Filing 3 **FILED IN ERROR** Summons Issued as to New Orleans College Preparatory Academies. (sbs) Modified text on 6/10/2019 (sbs).
June 7, 2019 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Lance M Africk and Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr. (cc)
June 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against New Orleans College Preparatory Academies (Filing fee $400 receipt number 053L-7692432) filed by Dionne Robinson. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) Attorney Danatus Norman King added to party Dionne Robinson(pty:pla).(King, Danatus) (WAIVER OF SUMMONS). Modified text on 6/10/2019 (sbs).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Robinson v. New Orleans College Preparatory Academies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dionne Robinson
Represented By: Danatus Norman King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New Orleans Preparatory Academies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New Orleans College Preparatory Academies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?