Thames v. Marquette Transportation Company Offshore, LLC
Plaintiff: Trent Thames
Defendant: Marquette Transportation Company Offshore, LLC and Marquette Transportation Co. Offshore, LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv11106
Filed: June 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Dana Douglas
Referring Judge: Martin LC Feldman
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 46:30104
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 7, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE - Scheduling Conference set for 8/29/2019 10:15 AM before case manager, by telephone. (cbs)
July 9, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, #5 First Amended Complaint, by Marquette Transportation Company Offshore, LLC. Attorney Justin Cole Warner added to party Marquette Transportation Company Offshore, LLC(pty:dft).(Warner, Justin) Modified text on 7/10/2019 (sa).
June 19, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Marquette Transportation Company Offshore, LLC. (clc)
June 18, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Submitted for Issuance (King, Rhett)
June 14, 2019 Filing 5 First AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Marquette Transportation Company Offshore, LLC filed by Trent Thames.(King, Rhett)
June 11, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE Regarding Local Civil Rule 54.7.(jls)
June 11, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Marquette Transportation Company Offshore, LLC. (jls)
June 10, 2019 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Martin L.C. Feldman and Magistrate Judge Dana Douglas. (cc)
June 10, 2019 Filing 1 SEAMAN COMPLAINT against Marquette Transportation Company Offshore, LLC (Prepayment of fee not required pursuant to 28 USC 1916) filed by Trent Thames. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney Rhett Emerson King added to party Trent Thames(pty:pla).(King, Rhett) Modified text on 6/11/2019 (jls).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thames v. Marquette Transportation Company Offshore, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trent Thames
Represented By: Rhett Emerson King
Represented By: Berney Leopold Strauss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marquette Transportation Company Offshore, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marquette Transportation Co. Offshore, LLC
Represented By: Justin Cole Warner
Represented By: Evans Martin McLeod
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?