REC Marine Logistics, LLC v. Richard
Plaintiff: REC Marine Logistics, LLC
3Rd Party Plaintiff: DeQuincy R. Richard
3Rd Party Defendant: Gulf Offshore Logistics, L.L.C. and Offshore Transport Services, L.L.C.
Case Number: 2:2019cv11149
Filed: June 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Lance M Africk
Referring Judge: Dana Douglas
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Eric Jonathan Rhine. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk on 8/8/19. (Attachments: #1 Notice) (ko)
August 8, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Gulf Offshore Logistics, L.L.C., Offshore Transport Services, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(mp)
August 8, 2019 Filing 6 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Eric J Rhine) (Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 053L-7796202) by DeQuincy R. Richard. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Affidavit, #3 Efiling Registration, #4 Proposed Order)(Koch, Robert)
August 8, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Submitted for Issuance (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Koch, Robert)
August 8, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand , THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Offshore Transport Services, L.L.C., Gulf Offshore Logistics, L.L.C., COUNTERCLAIM with Jury Demand against REC Marine Logistics, LLC by DeQuincy R. Richard.Attorney Robert Joshua Koch, Jr added to party DeQuincy R. Richard(pty:dft).(Koch, Robert)
June 17, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to DeQuincy R. Richard. (sbs)
June 14, 2019 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Lance M Africk and Magistrate Judge Dana Douglas. (gk)
June 14, 2019 Filing fee received: $400 - Receipt #LAE056399 (gk)
June 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against DeQuincy R. Richard (Filing fee $47 receipt number 053L-7700032) filed by REC Marine Logistics, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) Attorney Fred E. Salley added to party REC Marine Logistics, LLC(pty:pla).(Salley, Fred) Modified text on 6/17/2019 (sbs).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: REC Marine Logistics, LLC v. Richard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: DeQuincy R. Richard
Represented By: Eric Jonathan Rhine
Represented By: Katherine Wiarda Lynch
Represented By: Robert Joshua Koch, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: REC Marine Logistics, LLC
Represented By: Fred E. Salley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Gulf Offshore Logistics, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Offshore Transport Services, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?