World War II Theatre, Inc v. Desimone Consulting Engineering Group, LLC, et al
Plaintiff: World War II Theatre, Inc
Defendant: Evanston Insurance Company, Desimone Consulting Engineering Group, LLC, Markel Insurance Company, William R O'Donnell and Markel Specialty Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2019cv11187
Filed: June 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Carl Barbier
Referring Judge: Michael North
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 12, 2019 Filing 16 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Evanston Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Markel Corporation for Evanston Insurance Company (Rice, Kathleen)
July 12, 2019 Filing 15 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by World War II Theatre, Inc identifying Corporate Parent World War II Theatre, Inc for World War II Theatre, Inc (Holtzman, Shannon)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. My son-in-law, T. Patrick O'Leary, is a partner of the Frilot, L.L.C. firm, which represents a defendant in this matter. Accordingly, I am required to recuse myself from this matter. Judicial Conference of the United States, Committee on Codes of Conduct, Advisory Opinion No. 58 (Aug. 9, 1978, revised July 10, 1998) (citing Canon 3C(1)(d)(ii) and (iii)). The Clerk of Court is directed to reallot this matter to another Magistrate Judge Division of this court. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Michael North. Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr no longer assigned to case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr on 7/3/2019.(mmv) (NEF: J. Barbier, MJ North, Case Mgr)
July 1, 2019 Filing 13 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal,, by Evanston Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Rice, Kathleen)
June 27, 2019 Filing 12 Notice of Compliance by Desimone Consulting Engineering Group, LLC re #1 Notice of Removal. (Attachments: #1 State Court Pleadings Petition, #2 Summons, #3 State Court Pleadings Notice of Removal, #4 Summons Served, #5 Affidavit Long Arm)(Long, Charles) Modified on 6/28/2019 (clw).
June 24, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal by Desimone Consulting Engineering Group, LLC. and William R. O'Donnell (Long, Charles) Modified filers and text on 6/25/2019 (cg).
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER denying #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr. (caa)
June 20, 2019 Filing 9 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #8 Objections. Filing attorney selected incorrect event. Correct event is RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Motion. Clerk took corrective action. (clw)
June 20, 2019 Filing 8 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition by World War II Theatre, Inc re #6 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer Pursuant to Local Rule 7.8 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Holtzman, Shannon) Modified text/event on 6/20/2019 (clw).
June 20, 2019 Filing 7 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Filing attorney selected incorrect event. Correct event is MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer. Clerk took corrective action. Also, filing attorney incorrectly changed 'N' to 'Y' at the question 'Is this motion to be decided by the Magistrate Judge Y/N?'. This motion will be decided by the district judge. Clerk took corrective action. (clw)
June 19, 2019 Filing 6 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer #1 Removal by Desimone Consulting Engineering Group, LLC. Motion(s) referred to Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Long, Charles) Modified text/event on 6/20/2019 (clw). Modified on 6/20/2019 (gec). (NEF: JCW)
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. The undersigned United States Magistrate Judge recuses herself from further participation in this case pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 455(a). The Clerk of Court is ORDERED to reallot the above-captioned case to a Magistrate Judge of this Court other than Division 3. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr. Magistrate Judge Dana Douglas no longer assigned to case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dana Douglas on 6/14/2019.(cg)
June 13, 2019 Filing 4 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #1 Notice of Removal. **Filing attorney did not select Evanston Insurance Company, Markel Specialty Insurance Company, William R O'Donnell, Markel Insurance Company as filers. Clerk added filers.** (mm)
June 13, 2019 Filing 3 Directive of the Clerk regarding compliance with 28:1447(b) re: #1 Notice of Removal filed by Desimone Consulting Engineering Group, LLC, Evanston Insurance Company, Markel Specialty Insurance Company, William R O'Donnell, Markel Insurance Company. By the Clerk. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier.(mm)
June 13, 2019 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Carl Barbier and Magistrate Judge Dana Douglas. (cc)
June 12, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Civil District Court, Orleans Parish, case number 19-04312 C-10 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7703588) filed by Desimone Consulting Engineering Group, LLC., William R O'Donnell, Markel Specialty Insurance Company, Markel Insurance Company, Evanston Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 State Court Pleading)Attorney Charles Belsome Long added to party Desimone Consulting Engineering Group, LLC(pty:dft).(Long, Charles) Modified filers/text on 6/13/2019 (mm).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: World War II Theatre, Inc v. Desimone Consulting Engineering Group, LLC, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Evanston Insurance Company
Represented By: Danica Benbow Denny
Represented By: Lauren A. Guichard
Represented By: Kathleen Pontier Rice
Represented By: Patrick J. McShane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Desimone Consulting Engineering Group, LLC
Represented By: Charles Belsome Long
Represented By: John M. Futrell
Represented By: Karl Howard Schmid
Represented By: Sidney W. Degan, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Markel Insurance Company
Represented By: Charles Belsome Long
Represented By: Danica Benbow Denny
Represented By: John M. Futrell
Represented By: Kathleen Pontier Rice
Represented By: Sidney W. Degan, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William R O'Donnell
Represented By: Charles Belsome Long
Represented By: John M. Futrell
Represented By: Karl Howard Schmid
Represented By: Sidney W. Degan, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Markel Specialty Insurance Company
Represented By: Charles Belsome Long
Represented By: Danica Benbow Denny
Represented By: John M. Futrell
Represented By: Kathleen Pontier Rice
Represented By: Sidney W. Degan, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: World War II Theatre, Inc
Represented By: Mark R. Deethardt
Represented By: Sherman Gene Fendler
Represented By: Shannon Skelton Holtzman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?