Aviles v. Life Insurance Company of North America
Plaintiff: Gerald Aviles
Defendant: Life Insurance Company of North America
Case Number: 2:2019cv11220
Filed: June 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Greg Gerard Guidry
Referring Judge: Jane Triche Milazzo
2 Judge: Michael North
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 20:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE. Case transferred to Judge Greg Gerard Guidry. Judge Jane Triche Milazzo no longer assigned to case. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 07/02/2019.(am)
June 17, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Life Insurance Company of North America. (sa)
June 14, 2019 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Jane Triche Milazzo and Magistrate Judge Michael North. (gk)
June 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Life Insurance Company of North America (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7706144) filed by Gerald Aviles. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons) Attorney John Price McNamara added to party Gerald Aviles(pty:pla).(McNamara, John) Modified text on 6/17/2019 (sa).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Aviles v. Life Insurance Company of North America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gerald Aviles
Represented By: John Price McNamara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Life Insurance Company of North America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?