Thompson v. Travelers Indemnity Company et al
Plaintiff: Danielle Thompson
Defendant: Mosquito Control Services, LLC, Progressive Security Insurance Company, Endurance American Specialty Insurance Company, Travelers Indemnity Company, Brandon L Druilhet and Anthony P Sciambra
Not Yet Classified: Brandon Druilhet
Case Number: 2:2019cv11221
Filed: June 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Janis van Meerveld
Referring Judge: Karen Wells Roby
2 Judge: Sarah S Vance
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: As stated herein, IT IS ORDERED that this action be and is hereby dismissed with prejudice as to The Travelers Indemnity Company and to Mosquito Control Services, LLC and Anthony P. Sciambra (only as to any applicable insurance coverage afforded to them by the insurance policy issued to Mosquito Control Services, LLC by The Travelers IndemnityCompany). Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance on 8/8/2019. (Attachments: #1 Partial Dismissal Letter)(mm)
August 6, 2019 Filing 12 Request for Notice by Progressive Security Insurance Company (Giordano, Charles) Modified text on 8/6/2019 (mm).
August 6, 2019 Filing 11 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Progressive Security Insurance Company (Giordano, Charles)
August 6, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Progressive Security Insurance Company. Attorney Charles V. Giordano added to party Progressive Security Insurance Company(pty:dft).(Giordano, Charles)
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that Defendants' #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance on 7/23/2019.(mm)
July 22, 2019 Filing 8 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint by Mosquito Control Services, LLC, Anthony P Sciambra, Travelers Indemnity Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Attorney Rebecca Goforth Bush added to party Mosquito Control Services, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Rebecca Goforth Bush added to party Anthony P Sciambra(pty:dft), Attorney Rebecca Goforth Bush added to party Travelers Indemnity Company(pty:dft).(Bush, Rebecca)
June 20, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Brandon L Druilhet, Endurance American Specialty Insurance Company, Mosquito Control Services, LLC, Progressive Security Insurance Company, Travelers Indemnity Company. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(mm)
June 19, 2019 Filing 6 Request of Summons Issued as to Brandon L Druilhet, Endurance American Specialty Insurance Company, Mosquito Control Services, LLC, Progressive Security Insurance Company, Travelers Indemnity Company filed by Danielle Thompson re #1 Complaint. (Kane, Christopher)
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #2 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Matthew Gregory Garmon. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance on 6/17/2019. (mm)
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby. Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld no longer assigned to case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld on 6/17/2019.(ajn)
June 14, 2019 Filing 3 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Sarah S. Vance and Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld. (gk)
June 14, 2019 Filing 2 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Matthew G. Garmon (Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 053L-7706246) by Danielle Thompson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Proposed Order)(Kane, Christopher)
June 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against Brandon Druilhet, Endurance American Specialty Insurance Company, Mosquito Control Services, LLC, Progressive Security Insurance Company, Travelers Indemnity Company (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7706179) filed by Danielle Thompson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney Christopher J. Kane added to party Danielle Thompson(pty:selreq).(Kane, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thompson v. Travelers Indemnity Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mosquito Control Services, LLC
Represented By: Rebecca Goforth Bush
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Progressive Security Insurance Company
Represented By: Jairo F. Sanchez
Represented By: Dianna Duffy Willem
Represented By: Charles V. Giordano
Represented By: Michael E. Escudier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endurance American Specialty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travelers Indemnity Company
Represented By: Rebecca Goforth Bush
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brandon L Druilhet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony P Sciambra
Represented By: Rebecca Goforth Bush
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Danielle Thompson
Represented By: Christopher J. Kane
Represented By: Matthew Gregory Garmon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Brandon Druilhet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?