SAPS, LLC v. EZCare Clinic, Inc.
Plaintiff: SAPS, LLC
Defendant: EZCare Clinic, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv11229
Filed: June 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Carl Barbier
Referring Judge: Janis van Meerveld
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 30, 2019 Filing 11 REPLY to Response to Motion filed by EZCare Clinic, Inc. re #7 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction . (ko)
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Leave to File Reply. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 7/30/19. (ko)
July 30, 2019 Filing 9 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum in Support of Defendant's Motion to Dismiss by EZCare Clinic, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading, #2 Proposed Order)(Sahuc, Richard)
July 23, 2019 Filing 8 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by SAPS, LLC re #7 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Proposed Order)(Latino, Dominick)
July 12, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by EZCare Clinic, Inc.. Motion(s) will be submitted on 7/31/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Declaration of Vasili Razhnou, #3 Proposed Order, #4 Notice of Submission)(Sahuc, Richard)
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant is granted an additional twenty-one (21) days from the date on which responsive pleadings would otherwise be due to file said pleadings. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 6/21/2019. (cg)
June 20, 2019 Filing 5 Notice of Compliance with Clerk's Directive Re: Removal by EZCare Clinic, Inc. re #3 Order. (Attachments: #1 State Court Pleadings)(Sahuc, Richard)
June 20, 2019 Filing 4 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Notice of Removal, by EZCare Clinic, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Sahuc, Richard)
June 17, 2019 Filing 3 Directive by the Clerk re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by EZCare Clinic, Inc. (clw)
June 17, 2019 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Carl Barbier and Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld. (cc)
June 14, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 22nd Judicial District Court, St. Tammany Parish, case number 2019-12533 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7707084) filed by EZCare Clinic, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Petition, #2 Exhibit B - Notice of Lawsuit, #3 Exhibit C - State Court Notice of Removal, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney Richard Thomas Sahuc added to party EZCare Clinic, Inc.(pty:dft).(Sahuc, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SAPS, LLC v. EZCare Clinic, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SAPS, LLC
Represented By: Dominick Joseph Latino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EZCare Clinic, Inc.
Represented By: Richard Thomas Sahuc
Represented By: Gregory D. Latham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?