R. Christopher Goodwin & Associates, Inc. v. Search, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: R. Christopher Goodwin & Associates, Inc.
Defendant: Search, Inc., Charlotte Donald Pevny and Charlotte D. Pevny
Case Number: 2:2019cv11290
Filed: June 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Joseph C Wilkinson
Referring Judge: Jay C Zainey
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 18, 2019 Filing 6 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #4 Waiver of Service Executed, #5 Waiver of Service Executed. **Filing attorney entered incorrect date for the date waiver sent to parties; waiver sent to Search Inc. and Charlotte D. Pevny on 6/20/2019, answers due 8/19/2019. No further action is necessary.** (ajn)
July 9, 2019 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed; waiver sent to Charlotte D. Pevny on 6/20/2019, answer due 8/19/2019. (Hensgens, Scott) Modified text on 7/10/2019 to correct dates (ajn).
July 9, 2019 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed; waiver sent to Search, Inc. on 6/20/2019, answer due 8/19/2019. (Hensgens, Scott) Modified text on 7/10/2019 to correct dates (ajn).
June 21, 2019 Filing 3 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #1 Complaint. Filing attorney did not properly format the pdf of the Civil Cover Sheet. The pdf should not have the purple boxes nor the 3 red buttons at the bottom. When using a FORM, fill in the applicable fields then click the red PRINT button at the bottom to print the document to pdf format. Clerk has taken corrective action. (mp)
June 20, 2019 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Jay C. Zainey and Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr. (gk)
June 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7717045) filed by R. Christopher Goodwin & Associates, Inc. SERVICE BY WAIVER. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney Benjamin Thomas Sanders added to party R. Christopher Goodwin & Associates, Inc.(pty:pla).(Sanders, Benjamin) (Attachment 1 replaced on 6/21/2019) (mp). (Additional attachment(s) added and text modified on 6/21/2019: #2 AO Form) (mp).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: R. Christopher Goodwin & Associates, Inc. v. Search, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Search, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charlotte Donald Pevny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charlotte D. Pevny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: R. Christopher Goodwin & Associates, Inc.
Represented By: Benjamin Thomas Sanders
Represented By: Jeffery Patrick Brothers
Represented By: David L. Colvin
Represented By: Matthew Remy Fransen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?