Vincent v. McNeil & Meyers Receivables Management Group, LLC
Plaintiff: Donna Vincent
Defendant: McNeil & Meyers Receivables Management Group, LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv11298
Filed: June 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Nannette Jolivette Brown
Referring Judge: Joseph C Wilkinson
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 14, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by McNeil & Meyers Receivables Management Group, LLC.(Barber, Jacqueline)
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER GRANTING #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. McNeil & Meyers Receivables Management Group, LLC has until and through 8/14/2019, in which to respond to the Complaint. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 7/30/2019. (jls)
July 26, 2019 Filing 7 **DEFICIENT** MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice of James Sellers (Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 053L-7775941) by Donna Vincent. Motion(s) referred to Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr. Motion(s) will be submitted on 7/26/2019. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Good Standing Certificate)(Butler, Dorothy) Modified on 7/29/2019 (jls).
July 26, 2019 Filing 6 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint, by McNeil & Meyers Receivables Management Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Jacqueline Claire Barber added to party McNeil & Meyers Receivables Management Group, LLC (pty:dft).(Barber, Jacqueline)
July 8, 2019 Filing 5 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #4 Summons Returned Executed. Clerk reorganized document to place pages in correct order. No further action is needed. (clw)
July 8, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed; McNeil & Meyers Receivables Management Group, LLC served on 7/3/2019, answer due 7/24/2019. (Butler, Dorothy) (Main Document 4 replaced on 7/8/2019) (clw).
June 21, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to McNeil & Meyers Receivables Management Group, LLC. (mm)
June 21, 2019 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown and Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr. (gk)
June 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against McNeil & Meyers Receivables Management Group, LLC (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7718075) filed by Donna Vincent. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)Attorney Dorothy Kathleen Butler added to party Donna Vincent(pty:pla).(Butler, Dorothy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vincent v. McNeil & Meyers Receivables Management Group, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McNeil & Meyers Receivables Management Group, LLC
Represented By: Jacqueline Claire Barber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donna Vincent
Represented By: Dorothy Kathleen Butler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?