Dixon v. Ally Financial Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Landry Dixon
Defendant: Ally Financial Corporation, Jeffery J Brown, Ms Samantha, Frank W Hobbs and Jennifer LaClair
Case Number: 2:2019cv11344
Filed: June 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Greg Gerard Guidry
Referring Judge: Michael North
Nature of Suit: Truth in Lending
Cause of Action: 00:0000
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that the #4 Motion to Reconsider is denied as MOOT. Signed by Judge Greg Gerard Guidry on 08/21/2019. (am)
August 15, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Ally Financial Corporation, Jeffery J Brown, Frank W Hobbs, Jennifer LaClair, Ms Samantha. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(mm) (2 CC: USPS to Landry Dixon)
August 13, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Reconsider by Landry Dixon. Motion(s) will be submitted on 9/4/2019. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Submission, #2 Proposed Order)(mm)
August 9, 2019 Filing 6 Request of Summons Issued as to Ally Financial Corporation, Jeffery J Brown, Frank W Hobbs, Jennifer LaClair, Ms Samantha filed by Landry Dixon re #5 Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(mm)
August 9, 2019 Filing 5 COMPLAINT against Ally Financial Corporation, Jeffery J Brown, Frank W Hobbs, Jennifer LaClair, Ms Samantha (Filing fee $ 400) filed by Landry Dixon. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits P-1 to P-5, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(mm)
July 30, 2019 Filing fee received from Landry Dixon: Receipt LAE057103 $ 400 (cc)
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER: Plaintiff having failed to correct the deficiencies identified in the Clerks Offices Notice of Deficient Filing dated 6/25/2019 #2 , the Clerk is directed to mark this matter administratively closed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael North on 7/24/2019.(caa)
June 25, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF DEFICIENT ProSe COMPLAINT: re #1 Complaint. Please see attached letter for steps needed to remedy deficiency. Deficiency remedy due by 7/16/2019. (mm)
June 24, 2019 Filing 1 DEFICIENT: COMPLAINT against Ally Financial Corporation, Jeffery J Brown, Frank W Hobbs, Jennifer LaClair, Ms Samantha filed by Landry Dixon. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits P-1 to P-5, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(mm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dixon v. Ally Financial Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ally Financial Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffery J Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ms Samantha
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frank W Hobbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer LaClair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Landry Dixon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?