Cormier v. Group Long Term Disability Plan for Hospital Service District No. 3 et al
Plaintiff: christine cormier
Defendant: Life Insurance Company of North America, Inc., Thibodaux Regional Medical Center, Life Insurance Company of North America and Group Long Term Disability Plan for Hospital Service District No. 3
Case Number: 2:2019cv11379
Filed: June 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Dana Douglas
Referring Judge: Eldon E Fallon
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 28:1391
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER GRANTING #2 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to William E. Parsons. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 7/1/2019. (Attachments: #1 PHV Notice) (jeg)
June 28, 2019 Filing 8 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #3 Request for Summons Issued, #4 Request for Summons Issued. Filing attorney did not properly format the pdf of Summons. The pdf should not have the pink header nor the 3 red buttons at the bottom. When using a FORM, fill in the applicable fields then click the red PRINT button at the bottom to print the document to pdf format. Clerk has taken corrective action. (clw)
June 28, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Group Long Term Disability Plan for Hospital Service District No. 3. (clw)
June 28, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Life Insurance Company of North America. (clw) (Main Document 6 replaced with stamped image on 7/30/2019) (sa).
June 27, 2019 Filing 5 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Eldon E. Fallon and Magistrate Judge Dana Douglas. (cc)
June 27, 2019 Filing 4 Request of Summons Issued as to Group Long Term Disability Plan for Hospital Service District No. 3 of the Parish of Lafourche of the State of Louisiana filed by Christine Cormier re #1 Complaint. (Wanko, D.) (Main Document 4 replaced on 6/28/2019) (clw). Modified text on 6/28/2019 (clw).
June 27, 2019 Filing 3 Request of Summons Issued as to Life Insurance Company of North America, Inc. filed by Christine Cormier re #1 Complaint. (Wanko, D.) (Main Document 3 replaced on 6/28/2019) (clw).
June 26, 2019 Filing 2 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice William E. Parsons (Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 053L-7728653) by Christine Cormier. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Affidavit, #3 Exhibit certificate of good standing)(Wanko, D.) Modified text on 6/28/2019 (clw).
June 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7728646) filed by Christine Cormier. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney D. Steven Wanko, Jr added to party Christine Cormier(pty:pla).(Wanko, D.) Modified text on 6/28/2019 (clw).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cormier v. Group Long Term Disability Plan for Hospital Service District No. 3 et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Life Insurance Company of North America, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thibodaux Regional Medical Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Life Insurance Company of North America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Group Long Term Disability Plan for Hospital Service District No. 3
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: christine cormier
Represented By: D. Steven Wanko, Jr
Represented By: William E. Parsons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?