Lindley v. Puccino's, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Kirby Lindley
Defendant: Puccino's, Inc. and Pro Signs & Graphics LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv11414
Filed: June 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Mary Ann Vial Lemmon
Referring Judge: Michael North
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1051
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 26, 2019 Filing 26 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition by Kirby Lindley re #19 MOTION to Dismiss, #23 MOTION to Dismiss Case. (Shelby, Patrick) Modified text on 8/26/2019 (sbs).
August 23, 2019 Filing 25 MOTION to Dismiss #24 First Amended Complaint by Puccino's, Inc. Motion(s) will be submitted on 9/18/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Notice of Submission)(Douglas, Donald) Modified text on 8/23/2019 (sbs).
August 22, 2019 Filing 24 First AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants filed by Kirby Lindley. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Infringing Materials, #2 Exhibit 2 - Lindley Image, #3 Exhibit 3 - Pro Signs Demand Letter, #4 Exhibit 4 - Puccino's Demand Letter)(Shelby, Patrick)
August 20, 2019 Filing 23 MOTION to Dismiss Case by Pro Signs & Graphics LLC. Motion(s) will be submitted on 9/4/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Notice of Submission)(Kramer, Andrew)
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER - Considering the submissions of the parties in compliance with the Court's Order, the status conference set for August 21, 2019 is CANCELLED. Signed by Judge Mary Ann Vial Lemmon on 8/19/2019.(sbs)
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #20 MOTION to Continue Status Conference filed by Pro Signs & Graphics LLC. Status Conference reset for 8/21/2019 at 3:00 PM before Judge Mary Ann Vial Lemmon. Signed by Judge Mary Ann Vial Lemmon on 8/13/2019.(sbs)
August 12, 2019 Filing 20 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Continue Status Conference by Pro Signs & Graphics LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Kramer, Andrew) Modified text on 8/13/2019 (sbs).
August 12, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION to Dismiss by Puccino's, Inc. Motion(s) will be submitted on 9/4/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Notice of Submission)(Douglas, Donald)
July 29, 2019 Filing 18 Declaration of Truong ("Chris") Nguyen by Pro Signs & Graphics LLC (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Kramer, Andrew) Modified text on 7/30/2019 (sbs).
July 29, 2019 Filing 17 Submission of Written Certified Report by Puccino's, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Statement Written Report)(Harvey, Robert) Modified text on 7/30/2019 (sbs).
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #15 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint, filed by Puccino's Inc. Puccino's, Inc., has an additional twenty-one (21) days to respond to the original complaint. Signed by Judge Mary Ann Vial Lemmon on 7/29/2019. (sbs)
July 26, 2019 Filing 15 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint, by Puccino's, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Order)(Douglas, Donald) Modified text on 7/29/2019 (sbs).
July 26, 2019 Filing 14 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Entry of Default as to Puccino's Inc. by Kirby Lindley. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit A - Affidavit in Support)(Shelby, Patrick)
July 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint as to Pro Signs & Graphics LLC answer due 8/14/2019. Signed by Judge Mary Ann Vial Lemmon on 7/25/2019. (sbs)
July 24, 2019 Filing 12 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint, by Pro Signs & Graphics LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Andrew Lewis Kramer added to party Pro Signs & Graphics LLC(pty:dft).(Kramer, Andrew)
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER denying #2 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and, MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. A Status Conference will be held on Thursday, 8/15/2019 at 3:00 p.m. Signed by Judge Mary Ann Vial Lemmon on 7/19/2019. (sbs) Modified text on 7/22/2019 (sbs).
July 18, 2019 Filing 10 REPLY in Support of #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, filed by Kirby Lindley. (Shelby, Patrick) Modified text on 7/19/2019 (sbs).
July 11, 2019 Filing 9 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Puccino's, Inc. re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and, MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Harvey, Robert)
July 3, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed; Pro Signs & Graphics LLC served on 7/3/2019, answer due 7/24/2019. (Shelby, Patrick)
July 2, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed; Puccino's, Inc. served on 7/2/2019, answer due 7/23/2019. (Shelby, Patrick)
July 2, 2019 Filing 6 Certificate of Service by Patrick M. Shelby re #5 Order. (Shelby, Patrick) Modified text on 7/3/2019 (sbs).
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Kirby Lindley - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that counsel for defendants shall file any opposition to the motions within 10 days of entry of this order. Signed by Judge Mary Ann Vial Lemmon.(bwn)
June 28, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Pro Signs & Graphics LLC, Puccino's, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(sa)
June 28, 2019 Filing 3 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Mary Ann Vial Lemmon and Magistrate Judge Michael North. (ess)
June 28, 2019 Filing 2 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and, MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Kirby Lindley. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Certification, #3 Exhibit 1 - Pro Signs 5.30 Email, #4 Exhibit 2 - Advertisement Screenshot, #5 Proposed Order)(Shelby, Patrick)
June 28, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against Pro Signs & Graphics LLC, Puccino's, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7733094) filed by Kirby Lindley. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1 - Advertisement, #3 Exhibit 2 - Lindley Photo, #4 Exhibit 3 - Pro Signs Demand Letter, #5 Exhibit 4 - Puccino's Demand Letter, #6 Summons Puccino's Agent, #7 Summons Puccino's Agent 2, #8 Summons Pro Signs Agent)Attorney Patrick M. Shelby added to party Kirby Lindley(pty:pla).(Shelby, Patrick) (Attachment 6-8 flattened & replaced images on 6/28/2019) Modified on 6/28/2019 (sa).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lindley v. Puccino's, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kirby Lindley
Represented By: Patrick M. Shelby
Represented By: Amelia Lynn Bueche
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Puccino's, Inc.
Represented By: Robert G. Harvey, Sr.
Represented By: Donald C. Douglas, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pro Signs & Graphics LLC
Represented By: Andrew Lewis Kramer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?