Wigginton v. Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Melissa Wigginton
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 2:2019cv11418
Filed: June 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Nannette Jolivette Brown
Referring Judge: Karen Wells Roby
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Social Security Response Order that Plaintiff's BRIEF is due within 40 days after the defendant has filed his answer, and Defendant's REPLY BRIEF is due within 45 days after the plaintiffs brief is filed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby on 8/13/2019.(caa)
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE. Case transferred to Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown and Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby. Judge Greg Gerard Guidry, Magistrate Judge Michael North no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Greg Gerard Guidry on 7/2/2019.(mm)
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER GRANTING #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael North on 7/2/19. (Attachments: #1 Pauper Letter) (clc)
July 1, 2019 Filing 6 Notice of Related Case(s) by Melissa Wigginton of related case(s) 2:15-cv-06694-NJB. (Spurlock, Paul)
July 1, 2019 Filing 5 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis . Filing attorney should have changed 'N' to 'Y' at the question 'Is this motion to be decided by the Magistrate Judge Y/N?'. This motion will be decided by the magistrate judge. Clerk took corrective action. (clw)
July 1, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(clw)
July 1, 2019 Filing 3 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Greg Gerard Guidry and Magistrate Judge Michael North. (cc)
June 28, 2019 Filing 2 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Melissa Wigginton. MOTION referred to Magistrate North. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Application, #2 Proposed Order)(Spurlock, Paul) Modified on 7/1/2019 (clw).
June 28, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration (In Forma Pauperis status requested) filed by Melissa Wigginton. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Commissioner of Social Security, #3 Summons Attorney General, #4 Summons U.S. Attorney)Attorney Paul Brian Spurlock added to party Melissa Wigginton(pty:pla).(Spurlock, Paul)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wigginton v. Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melissa Wigginton
Represented By: Paul Brian Spurlock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?