Green et al v. Ruby Enterprises, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Shannon Showalter, Tiffany Burns, Shawna Lowney, Esau Rodriguez, Heidi Borras, Hailey Tilley, Perseus Williams, Vernada Vaughn, Tatyana Adams, Cierra Plaisance, Keshone Encalade, Christie Bonamour, Ashliy Medley, Candy Jackson, Jadon Polk, Renee Babin, Candas Green, Shandelle Morgan, Daniel Greenlee, Ayanna Overton, Quintin Griffin, Ronica Veals, Sonya Mickel, Kelly Dunn, Steven Treadway, Bridgette Wall, Jeremiah Willis, Earnestine Summers, Carrie Dixon, Casey Evans, Talor Rancifer, Courtney Wilson, Regine Prewitt, Deshannon Dotson, Daniel LeBouef, Brittney Caldwell, Brianeka Massey, Renata Hughes, Catina Anderson, Aubrey D. Warren, Sr., Latosha Harrison, Brandi Sellers, Kayla Casso, Liza Harness, Jaylon Clemons, Morgan Johnson Christian, Melinda Gonzales, Tomisha Wilford, Shanita Lawson, Earnest August, Marissa Jones and Jessica Kelly
Defendant: Ruba, LLC, Ruby XII, LLC, Ruby X, LLC, Ruby XIV, LLC, Ruba III, LLC, Ruby VII, LLC, Ruby VIII, LLC, Ruby I.X., LLC, Mohammed Esmail, Ruby Enterprises, LLC, Ruby IV, L.L.C., Ruby XI, LLC, Ruby Management, Inc., Ruby XV, LLC, Ruby V, LLC, Ruby VI, LLC and Nadia Esmail
Case Number: 2:2019cv11419
Filed: June 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Barry W Ashe
Referring Judge: Michael North
2 Judge: Wendy B Vitter
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 28, 2019 Filing 46 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs of Filing Consent Form. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Justin Taylor)(Williams, Christopher)
August 28, 2019 Filing 45 REPLY to Response to Motion filed by All Defendants re #36 MOTION to Consolidate Cases . (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Proposed Order)(Anderson, Michelle)
August 27, 2019 Filing 44 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs of Filing Consent Form. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Morgan Johnson Christian)(Williams, Christopher)
August 21, 2019 Filing 43 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by All Plaintiffs re #36 MOTION to Consolidate Cases . (Williams, Christopher)
August 17, 2019 Filing 42 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs of Filing Consent Forms. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit S. Treadway)(Williams, Christopher)
August 16, 2019 Filing 41 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs of Filing Consent Forms. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit L. Harrison)(Williams, Christopher)
August 13, 2019 Filing 40 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs of Filing Consent Forms. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B. Massey)(Williams, Christopher)
August 6, 2019 Filing 39 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs of Filing Consent Forms. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Aubrey Warren, Sr.)(Williams, Christopher)
August 1, 2019 Filing 38 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs of Filing Consent Forms. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Melinda Gonzales, #2 Exhibit Marissa Jones)(Williams, Christopher)
July 24, 2019 Filing 37 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs of Filing Consent Form. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Earnestine Summers)(Williams, Christopher)
July 22, 2019 Filing 36 MOTION to Consolidate Cases by Mohammed Esmail, Nadia Esmail, Ruba III, LLC, Ruba, LLC, Ruby Enterprises, LLC, Ruby I.X., LLC, Ruby IV, L.L.C., Ruby Management, Inc., Ruby V, LLC, Ruby VI, LLC, Ruby VII, LLC, Ruby VIII, LLC, Ruby X, LLC, Ruby XI, LLC, Ruby XII, LLC, Ruby XIV, LLC, Ruby XV, LLC. Motion(s) will be submitted on 8/29/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit 1-Declaration of Wm. Brian London, #3 Exhibit 2-Kidwell's Discovery to Defendants, #4 Notice of Submission)(Anderson, Michelle)
July 22, 2019 Filing 35 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Ruba III, LLC, Ruba, LLC, Ruby Enterprises, LLC, Ruby I.X., LLC, Ruby IV, L.L.C., Ruby Management, Inc., Ruby V, LLC, Ruby VI, LLC, Ruby VII, LLC, Ruby VIII, LLC, Ruby X, LLC, Ruby XI, LLC, Ruby XII, LLC, Ruby XIV, LLC, Ruby XV, LLC (Anderson, Michelle)
July 22, 2019 Filing 34 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Mohammed Esmail, Nadia Esmail, Ruba III, LLC, Ruba, LLC, Ruby Enterprises, LLC, Ruby I.X., LLC, Ruby IV, L.L.C., Ruby Management, Inc., Ruby V, LLC, Ruby VI, LLC, Ruby VII, LLC, Ruby VIII, LLC, Ruby X, LLC, Ruby XI, LLC, Ruby XII, LLC, Ruby XIV, LLC, Ruby XV, LLC.Attorney Michelle I. Anderson added to party Mohammed Esmail(pty:dft), Attorney Michelle I. Anderson added to party Nadia Esmail(pty:dft), Attorney Michelle I. Anderson added to party Ruba III, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Michelle I. Anderson added to party Ruba, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Michelle I. Anderson added to party Ruby Enterprises, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Michelle I. Anderson added to party Ruby I.X., LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Michelle I. Anderson added to party Ruby IV, L.L.C.(pty:dft), Attorney Michelle I. Anderson added to party Ruby Management, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Michelle I. Anderson added to party Ruby V, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Michelle I. Anderson added to party Ruby VI, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Michelle I. Anderson added to party Ruby VII, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Michelle I. Anderson added to party Ruby VIII, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Michelle I. Anderson added to party Ruby X, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Michelle I. Anderson added to party Ruby XI, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Michelle I. Anderson added to party Ruby XII, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Michelle I. Anderson added to party Ruby XIV, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Michelle I. Anderson added to party Ruby XV, LLC(pty:dft).(Anderson, Michelle) Modified text on 7/23/2019 (clw).
July 19, 2019 Filing 33 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs of Filing Consent Forms. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Jeremiah Willis, #2 Exhibit Renata Hughes)(Williams, Christopher)
July 17, 2019 Filing 32 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs of Filing Consent Forms. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B. Sellers, #2 Exhibit C. Evans, #3 Exhibit L. Harness)(Williams, Christopher)
July 16, 2019 Filing 31 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs of Filing Consent Forms. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B. Wall Consent, #2 Exhibit K. Casso Consent)(Williams, Christopher)
July 9, 2019 Filing 30 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs of Filing Consent Forms. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Shanita Lawson)(Williams, Christopher)
July 8, 2019 Filing 29 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs of Filing Consent Forms. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit J. Kelly, #2 Exhibit J. Clemons, #3 Exhibit T. Rancifer, #4 Exhibit T. Wilford)(Williams, Christopher)
July 7, 2019 Filing 28 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs of Filing Consent Forms. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit R. Prewitt)(Williams, Christopher)
July 6, 2019 Filing 27 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs of Filing Consent Forms. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B. Caldwell, #2 Exhibit C. Dixon, #3 Exhibit C. Wilson, #4 Exhibit D. Lebouef, #5 Exhibit E. August)(Williams, Christopher)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE. Case transferred to Judge Barry W Ashe. Judge Wendy B Vitter no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Wendy B Vitter on 7/3/2019. (NEF: Section D and Section M)(jeg)
July 3, 2019 Filing 25 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs of Filing Consent Forms. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Latonya Simon, #2 Exhibit Miyiesha Henderson)(Williams, Christopher)
July 3, 2019 Filing 24 SUMMONS Returned Executed; Ruby XV, LLC served on 7/1/2019, answer due 7/22/2019. (Williams, Christopher)
July 3, 2019 Filing 23 SUMMONS Returned Executed; Ruby XIV, LLC served on 7/1/2019, answer due 7/22/2019. (Williams, Christopher)
July 3, 2019 Filing 22 SUMMONS Returned Executed; Ruby XII, LLC served on 7/1/2019, answer due 7/22/2019. (Williams, Christopher)
July 3, 2019 Filing 21 SUMMONS Returned Executed; Ruby XI, LLC served on 7/1/2019, answer due 7/22/2019. (Williams, Christopher)
July 3, 2019 Filing 20 SUMMONS Returned Executed; Ruby X, LLC served on 7/1/2019, answer due 7/22/2019. (Williams, Christopher)
July 3, 2019 Filing 19 SUMMONS Returned Executed; Ruby VIII, LLC served on 7/1/2019, answer due 7/22/2019. (Williams, Christopher)
July 3, 2019 Filing 18 SUMMONS Returned Executed; Ruby VII, LLC served on 7/1/2019, answer due 7/22/2019. (Williams, Christopher)
July 3, 2019 Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed; Ruby VI, LLC served on 7/1/2019, answer due 7/22/2019. (Williams, Christopher)
July 3, 2019 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed; Ruby V, LLC served on 7/1/2019, answer due 7/22/2019. (Williams, Christopher)
July 3, 2019 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed; Ruby Management, Inc. served on 7/1/2019, answer due 7/22/2019. (Williams, Christopher)
July 3, 2019 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed; Ruby I.X., LLC served on 7/1/2019, answer due 7/22/2019. (Williams, Christopher)
July 3, 2019 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed; Ruby IV, L.L.C. served on 7/1/2019, answer due 7/22/2019. (Williams, Christopher)
July 3, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed; Ruba III, LLC served on 7/1/2019, answer due 7/22/2019. (Williams, Christopher)
July 3, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed; Ruby Enterprises, LLC served on 7/1/2019, answer due 7/22/2019. (Williams, Christopher)
July 3, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed; Ruba, LLC served on 7/1/2019, answer due 7/22/2019. (Williams, Christopher)
July 3, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed; Nadia Esmail served on 7/1/2019, answer due 7/22/2019. (Williams, Christopher)
July 3, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed; Mohammed Esmail served on 7/1/2019, answer due 7/22/2019. (Williams, Christopher)
July 3, 2019 Filing 7 OBJECTIONS by All Plaintiffs Pursuant to Local Rule 7.8 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit E-mail Correspondence)(Williams, Christopher)
July 2, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs of Filing Consent Forms. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Catina Anderson, #2 Exhibit Deshannon Dotson)(Williams, Christopher)
July 1, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Mohammed Esmail, Nadia Esmail, Ruba III, LLC, Ruba, LLC, Ruby Enterprises, LLC, Ruby I.X., LLC, Ruby IV, L.L.C., Ruby Management, Inc., Ruby V, LLC, Ruby VI, LLC, Ruby VII, LLC, Ruby VIII, LLC, Ruby X, LLC, Ruby XI, LLC, Ruby XII, LLC, Ruby XIV, LLC, Ruby XV, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons, #10 Summons, #11 Summons, #12 Summons, #13 Summons, #14 Summons, #15 Summons, #16 Summons)(pp)
July 1, 2019 Filing 4 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #1 Complaint **1. Filing attorney incorrectly uploaded complaint with "et al" in caption. Attorney subsequently provided corrected complaint listing all parties on case caption. 2. Filing attorney uploaded summons as one PDF. Please not that summons must be uploaded individually as separate attachments (one summons per attachment). Please follow this requirement on future pleadings.** (jeg)
July 1, 2019 Filing 3 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Wendy B Vitter and Magistrate Judge Michael North. (ess)
June 30, 2019 Filing 2 Notice of Related Case(s) by All Plaintiffs of related case(s) 18-2052. (Williams, Christopher)
June 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7733725) filed by Sonya Mickel, Cierra Plaisance, Renee Babin, Candas Green, Ronica Veals, Quintin Griffin, Keshone Encalade, Shawna Lowney, Vernada Vaughn, Hailey Tilley, Heidi Borras, Tatyana Adams, Kelly Dunn, Tiffany Burns, Ayanna Overton, Christie Bonamour, Esau Rodriguez, Jadon Polk, Perseus Williams, Daniel Greenlee, Shannon Showalter, Shandelle Morgan, Ashliy Medley. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Consent Forms, #2 Exhibit Email Correspondence re: Defendants' FLSA violations, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons Summons (Combined for all 17 Defendants))Attorney Christopher L. Williams added to party Tatyana Adams(pty:pla), Attorney Christopher L. Williams added to party Renee Babin(pty:pla), Attorney Christopher L. Williams added to party Christie Bonamour(pty:pla), Attorney Christopher L. Williams added to party Heidi Borras(pty:pla), Attorney Christopher L. Williams added to party Tiffany Burns(pty:pla), Attorney Christopher L. Williams added to party Kelly Dunn(pty:pla), Attorney Christopher L. Williams added to party Keshone Encalade(pty:pla), Attorney Christopher L. Williams added to party Candas Green(pty:pla), Attorney Christopher L. Williams added to party Daniel Greenlee(pty:pla), Attorney Christopher L. Williams added to party Quintin Griffin(pty:pla), Attorney Christopher L. Williams added to party Shawna Lowney(pty:pla), Attorney Christopher L. Williams added to party Ashliy Medley(pty:pla), Attorney Christopher L. Williams added to party Sonya Mickel(pty:pla), Attorney Christopher L. Williams added to party Shandelle Morgan(pty:pla), Attorney Christopher L. Williams added to party Ayanna Overton(pty:pla), Attorney Christopher L. Williams added to party Cierra Plaisance(pty:pla), Attorney Christopher L. Williams added to party Jadon Polk(pty:pla), Attorney Christopher L. Williams added to party Esau Rodriguez(pty:pla), Attorney Christopher L. Williams added to party Shannon Showalter(pty:pla), Attorney Christopher L. Williams added to party Hailey Tilley(pty:pla), Attorney Christopher L. Williams added to party Vernada Vaughn(pty:pla), Attorney Christopher L. Williams added to party Ronica Veals(pty:pla), Attorney Christopher L. Williams added to party Perseus Williams(pty:pla).(Williams, Christopher) (Main Document 1 replaced on 7/1/2019) (jeg).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Green et al v. Ruby Enterprises, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shannon Showalter
Represented By: Charles J. Stiegler
Represented By: Christopher L. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tiffany Burns
Represented By: Charles J. Stiegler
Represented By: Christopher L. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shawna Lowney
Represented By: Charles J. Stiegler
Represented By: Christopher L. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Esau Rodriguez
Represented By: Charles J. Stiegler
Represented By: Christopher L. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heidi Borras
Represented By: Charles J. Stiegler
Represented By: Christopher L. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hailey Tilley
Represented By: Charles J. Stiegler
Represented By: Christopher L. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Perseus Williams
Represented By: Charles J. Stiegler
Represented By: Christopher L. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vernada Vaughn
Represented By: Charles J. Stiegler
Represented By: Christopher L. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tatyana Adams
Represented By: Charles J. Stiegler
Represented By: Christopher L. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cierra Plaisance
Represented By: Charles J. Stiegler
Represented By: Christopher L. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keshone Encalade
Represented By: Charles J. Stiegler
Represented By: Christopher L. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christie Bonamour
Represented By: Charles J. Stiegler
Represented By: Christopher L. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ashliy Medley
Represented By: Charles J. Stiegler
Represented By: Christopher L. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Candy Jackson
Represented By: Charles J. Stiegler
Represented By: Christopher L. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jadon Polk
Represented By: Charles J. Stiegler
Represented By: Christopher L. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Renee Babin
Represented By: Charles J. Stiegler
Represented By: Christopher L. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Candas Green
Represented By: Charles J. Stiegler
Represented By: Christopher L. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shandelle Morgan
Represented By: Charles J. Stiegler
Represented By: Christopher L. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Greenlee
Represented By: Charles J. Stiegler
Represented By: Christopher L. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ayanna Overton
Represented By: Charles J. Stiegler
Represented By: Christopher L. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Quintin Griffin
Represented By: Charles J. Stiegler
Represented By: Christopher L. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronica Veals
Represented By: Charles J. Stiegler
Represented By: Christopher L. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sonya Mickel
Represented By: Charles J. Stiegler
Represented By: Christopher L. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelly Dunn
Represented By: Charles J. Stiegler
Represented By: Christopher L. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Treadway
Represented By: Charles J. Stiegler
Represented By: Christopher L. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bridgette Wall
Represented By: Charles J. Stiegler
Represented By: Christopher L. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeremiah Willis
Represented By: Charles J. Stiegler
Represented By: Christopher L. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Earnestine Summers
Represented By: Charles J. Stiegler
Represented By: Christopher L. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carrie Dixon
Represented By: Charles J. Stiegler
Represented By: Christopher L. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Casey Evans
Represented By: Charles J. Stiegler
Represented By: Christopher L. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Talor Rancifer
Represented By: Charles J. Stiegler
Represented By: Christopher L. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Courtney Wilson
Represented By: Charles J. Stiegler
Represented By: Christopher L. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Regine Prewitt
Represented By: Charles J. Stiegler
Represented By: Christopher L. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deshannon Dotson
Represented By: Charles J. Stiegler
Represented By: Christopher L. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel LeBouef
Represented By: Charles J. Stiegler
Represented By: Christopher L. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brittney Caldwell
Represented By: Charles J. Stiegler
Represented By: Christopher L. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brianeka Massey
Represented By: Charles J. Stiegler
Represented By: Christopher L. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Renata Hughes
Represented By: Charles J. Stiegler
Represented By: Christopher L. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Catina Anderson
Represented By: Charles J. Stiegler
Represented By: Christopher L. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aubrey D. Warren, Sr.
Represented By: Charles J. Stiegler
Represented By: Christopher L. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Latosha Harrison
Represented By: Charles J. Stiegler
Represented By: Christopher L. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandi Sellers
Represented By: Charles J. Stiegler
Represented By: Christopher L. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kayla Casso
Represented By: Charles J. Stiegler
Represented By: Christopher L. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Liza Harness
Represented By: Charles J. Stiegler
Represented By: Christopher L. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jaylon Clemons
Represented By: Charles J. Stiegler
Represented By: Christopher L. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Morgan Johnson Christian
Represented By: Charles J. Stiegler
Represented By: Christopher L. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melinda Gonzales
Represented By: Charles J. Stiegler
Represented By: Christopher L. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tomisha Wilford
Represented By: Charles J. Stiegler
Represented By: Christopher L. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shanita Lawson
Represented By: Charles J. Stiegler
Represented By: Christopher L. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Earnest August
Represented By: Charles J. Stiegler
Represented By: Christopher L. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marissa Jones
Represented By: Charles J. Stiegler
Represented By: Christopher L. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica Kelly
Represented By: Charles J. Stiegler
Represented By: Christopher L. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ruba, LLC
Represented By: Michelle I. Anderson
Represented By: Walter W. Christy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ruby XII, LLC
Represented By: Michelle I. Anderson
Represented By: Walter W. Christy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ruby X, LLC
Represented By: Michelle I. Anderson
Represented By: Walter W. Christy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ruby XIV, LLC
Represented By: Michelle I. Anderson
Represented By: Walter W. Christy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ruba III, LLC
Represented By: Michelle I. Anderson
Represented By: Walter W. Christy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ruby VII, LLC
Represented By: Michelle I. Anderson
Represented By: Walter W. Christy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ruby VIII, LLC
Represented By: Michelle I. Anderson
Represented By: Walter W. Christy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ruby I.X., LLC
Represented By: Michelle I. Anderson
Represented By: Walter W. Christy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mohammed Esmail
Represented By: Michelle I. Anderson
Represented By: Walter W. Christy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ruby Enterprises, LLC
Represented By: Michelle I. Anderson
Represented By: Walter W. Christy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ruby IV, L.L.C.
Represented By: Michelle I. Anderson
Represented By: Walter W. Christy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ruby XI, LLC
Represented By: Michelle I. Anderson
Represented By: Walter W. Christy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ruby Management, Inc.
Represented By: Michelle I. Anderson
Represented By: Walter W. Christy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ruby XV, LLC
Represented By: Michelle I. Anderson
Represented By: Walter W. Christy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ruby V, LLC
Represented By: Michelle I. Anderson
Represented By: Walter W. Christy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ruby VI, LLC
Represented By: Michelle I. Anderson
Represented By: Walter W. Christy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nadia Esmail
Represented By: Michelle I. Anderson
Represented By: Walter W. Christy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?