Galloway v. Staton et al
Plaintiff: Harry S. Galloway
Defendant: XYZ Insurance Company, Logan Stanton, Logan Staton and Unidentified Party
Case Number: 2:2019cv11568
Filed: July 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Susie Morgan
Referring Judge: Michael North
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 5, 2019 Filing 13 PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE NOTICE - Scheduling Conference set for 9/26/2019 at 11:00 AM before case manager by telephone. Signed by Clerk.(bwn)
September 3, 2019 Filing 12 MEMORANDUM in Support of Diversity Jurisdiction filed by Logan Staton . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Surprenant, Diana) Modified on 9/3/2019 to edit docket text (bwn).
August 2, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to #6 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim of Defendant by Harry S. Galloway.(Yazbeck, Timothy)
July 23, 2019 Filing 10 Notice of Compliance by Logan Staton re #1 Notice of Removal. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Surprenant, Diana) Modified text on 7/24/2019 (sbs).
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #7 Motion to Extend Deadline to Provide "Summary-Judgment Type Evidence" Regarding the Amount in Controversy and Leave to Conduct Jurisdictional Discovery and #8 Motion for Expedited Consideration. Staton is allowed to conduct limited jurisdictional discovery solely related to the amount in controversy. FURTHER ORDERED that Staton must provide "summary-judgment type evidence" demonstrating the amount in controversy in this case exceeds $75,000 by no later than Tuesday, 9/3/2019 at 5:00 p.m. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan on 7/19/2019. (sbs)
July 17, 2019 Filing 8 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Expedited Consideration of #7 MOTION to Extend Deadline to Provide "Summary-Judgment Type Evidence" Regarding the Amount in Controversy and Leave to Conduct Jurisdictional Discovery by Logan Staton. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Surprenant, Diana) Modified text on 7/18/2019 (sbs).
July 17, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Extend Deadline to Provide "Summary-Judgment Type Evidence" Regarding the Amount in Controversy and Leave to Conduct Jurisdictional Discovery by Logan Staton. Motion(s) will be submitted on 8/7/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Notice of Submission)(Surprenant, Diana) Modified text on 7/18/2019 (sbs).
July 15, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal with Jury Demand, COUNTERCLAIM with Jury Demand against Harry S. Galloway by Logan Staton.(Surprenant, Diana) Modified text on 7/16/2019 (sbs).
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER re #1 Notice of Removal - IT IS ORDERED that Defendant provide "summary-judgment type evidence" demonstrating the amount in controversy in this case exceeds $75,000 by Monday, July 22, 2019. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan.(bwn)
July 9, 2019 Filing 4 DIRECTIVE by the Clerk re #1 Notice of Removal. (clw)
July 9, 2019 Filing 3 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #1 Notice of Removal. Filing filing attorney entered the Civil Cover Sheet as the Main Document and the Notice of Removal as an attachment. The Notice of Removal should be the Main Document and the Civil Cover Sheet should be an attachment. Clerk took corrective action by replacing the images. No further action necessary. (clw)
July 8, 2019 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Susie Morgan and Magistrate Judge Michael North. (ess)
July 8, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Orleans Parish Civil District Court, case number 2019-04456 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7743199) filed by Logan Stanton. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Ex. 1 Cert of State Court Record, #3 Exhibit Ex 2 Notice of Filing of NOR)Attorney Diana Cole Surprenant added to party Logan Stanton(pty:dft).(Surprenant, Diana) (Main Document 1 replaced on 7/9/2019) (clw). (Attachment 1 replaced on 7/9/2019) (clw). Modified text on 7/9/2019 (clw).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Galloway v. Staton et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XYZ Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Logan Stanton
Represented By: Diana Cole Surprenant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Logan Staton
Represented By: Diana Cole Surprenant
Represented By: Mark Raymond Beebe
Represented By: Adrienne C. May
Represented By: Ronald J. Sholes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unidentified Party
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harry S. Galloway
Represented By: Philip Jeremy Kaplan
Represented By: Randall A. Smith
Represented By: Timothy Thomas Yazbeck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?