United States of America v. Two Pit Bull-Type Dogs
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Two Pit Bull-Type Dogs
Case Number: 2:2019cv11589
Filed: July 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Dana Douglas
Referring Judge: Jane Triche Milazzo
Nature of Suit: Forfeit/Penalty: Other
Cause of Action: 00:0000
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Entry of Default as to the Two Pit Bull-Type Dogs. Signed by clerk. (Copy mailed to B. Butler) (ecm)
August 29, 2019 Filing 5 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Entry of Default by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(Redmann, Michael)
July 19, 2019 Filing 4 WARRANT Returned Executed on 7/9/2019. (ecm)
July 9, 2019 Filing 3 WARRANT of Arrest in rem issued. (3cc: USM) (ecm)
July 9, 2019 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Jane Triche Milazzo and Magistrate Judge Dana Douglas. (cc)
July 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Two Pit Bull-Type Dogs (Filed on behalf of USA - Filing Fee not required) filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Request for Issuance of Warrant of Arrest in Rem, #3 US Marshals Form 285)Attorney Michael B. Redmann added to party United States of America(pty:pla).(Redmann, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Two Pit Bull-Type Dogs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Two Pit Bull-Type Dogs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Michael B. Redmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?