Faulkin v. Millennia Housing Management, Ltd. LLC et al
Plaintiff: Gabrielle Faulkin
Defendant: GMF-Preservation of Affordability Corp. and Millennia Housing Management, Ltd. LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv11656
Filed: July 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Michael North
Referring Judge: Jay C Zainey
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accommodations
Cause of Action: 42:3601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 23, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed; GMF-Preservation of Affordability Corp. served on 8/15/2019, answer due 9/5/2019. (Bizer, Andrew)
August 23, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed; Millennia Housing Management, Ltd. LLC served on 7/23/2019, answer due 8/13/2019. (Bizer, Andrew)
July 15, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to GMF-Preservation of Affordability Corp., Millennia Housing Management, Ltd. LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(ajn)
July 15, 2019 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Jay C. Zainey and Magistrate Judge Michael North. (cc)
July 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against GMF-Preservation of Affordability Corp., Millennia Housing Management, Ltd. LLC (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7751380) filed by Gabrielle Faulkin. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)Attorney Emily A. Westermeier added to party Gabrielle Faulkin(pty:pla).(Westermeier, Emily)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Faulkin v. Millennia Housing Management, Ltd. LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gabrielle Faulkin
Represented By: Emily A. Westermeier
Represented By: Garret S DeReus
Represented By: Andrew David Bizer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GMF-Preservation of Affordability Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Millennia Housing Management, Ltd. LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?