Verdin v. Dean Equipment, Inc.
Plaintiff: Calvin Verdin
Defendant: Dean Equipment, Inc. and Dean Equipment Inc
Case Number: 2:2019cv11662
Filed: July 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Janis van Meerveld
Referring Judge: Jay C Zainey
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 46:30104
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 6, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Hearing. Scheduling Conference reset from 9/9/19 to 9/19/2019 2:00 PM before case manager by telephone. By Clerk. (jrc)
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Motion to Continue. Scheduling Conference reset for 9/9/2019 10:30 AM before case manager by telephone. By Clerk. (jrc)
August 29, 2019 Filing 9 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Continue Scheduling Conference by Dean Equipment Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Legrand, Georges)
August 23, 2019 Filing 8 ***DEFICIENT*** EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Continue Scheduling Conference by Dean Equipment Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Legrand, Georges) Modified on 8/26/2019 (ajn).
August 22, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Hearing. Scheduling Conference set for 9/5/2019 11:00 AM before case manager by telephone. By Clerk. (jrc)
August 22, 2019 Filing 6 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Dean Equipment Inc (Legrand, Georges)
August 22, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Dean Equipment Inc.Attorney Georges M. Legrand added to party Dean Equipment Inc(pty:dft).(Legrand, Georges)
July 15, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE REGARDING LOCAL CIVIL RULE 54.7. (ajn)
July 15, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Dean Equipment, Inc. (ajn)
July 15, 2019 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Jay C. Zainey and Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld. (cc)
July 15, 2019 Filing 1 SEAMAN COMPLAINT with jury demand against Dean Equipment, Inc. (Prepayment of fee not required pursuant to 28 USC 1916) filed by Calvin Verdin. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)Attorney Charles Arlen Braud, II added to party Calvin Verdin (pty:pla).(Braud, Charles) Modified text on 7/15/2019 (ajn).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Verdin v. Dean Equipment, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dean Equipment, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dean Equipment Inc
Represented By: Georges M. Legrand
Represented By: Michael Thomas Neuner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Calvin Verdin
Represented By: Charles Arlen Braud, II
Represented By: Steven Dewayne Jackson, Jr.
Represented By: Michelle O. Gallagher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?