Parker v. Callegari et al
Plaintiff: Danyell Parker
Defendant: Elizabeth Callegari and State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2019cv11679
Filed: July 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Carl Barbier
Referring Judge: Janis van Meerveld
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Motion to Remand. IT IS ORDERED, AJUDGED, AND DECREED that this matter is hereby Remanded to State District Court for all further proceedings and final disposition. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 7/26/2019. (cg) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/26/2019: #1 Remand Letter) (cg).
July 26, 2019 Filing 7 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Remand by Elizabeth Callegari, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Proposed Order)(Green, Charles)
July 16, 2019 Filing 6 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #2 Statement of Corporate Disclosure, #3 Answer to Complaint - Notice of Removal. Documents do not contain Section and/or Magistrate Judge. All future pleadings must reflect Section J and Magistrate (1).(clw)
July 16, 2019 Filing 5 DIRECTIVE by the Clerk re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, Elizabeth Callegari. (clw)
July 16, 2019 Filing 4 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Carl Barbier and Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld. (ess)
July 15, 2019 Filing 3 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal, with Jury Demand by Elizabeth Callegari, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company.(Green, Charles) Modified text on 7/16/2019 (clw).
July 15, 2019 Filing 2 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Green, Charles)
July 15, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with jury demand from Civil District Court for the Parish of Orleans, case number 2019-5763 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7753628) filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, Elizabeth Callegari. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Complaint, #3 Statement)Attorney Charles S. Green, Jr added to party Elizabeth Callegari(pty:dft), Attorney Charles S. Green, Jr added to party State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company(pty:dft).(Green, Charles)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Parker v. Callegari et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elizabeth Callegari
Represented By: Charles S. Green, Jr.
Represented By: Christopher Gerald Otten
Represented By: Andrew Mark Maestri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Represented By: Charles S. Green, Jr.
Represented By: Christopher Gerald Otten
Represented By: Andrew Mark Maestri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Danyell Parker
Represented By: Michael Dennis Riley
Represented By: Kevin M. Riley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?