Warr v. Stone et al
Plaintiff: Tylando Pierre Warr
Defendant: Hornady Transportation, LLC, Roy Lee Stone and Hudson Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2019cv11710
Filed: July 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Sarah S Vance
Referring Judge: Joseph C Wilkinson
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 7/9/2020 02:30 PM before Judge Sarah S. Vance. Jury Trial (3 to 4 days) set for 7/20/2020 08:30 AM before Judge Sarah S. Vance. All discovery must be completed by 6/9/2020.. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance on 8/22/19. (Attachments: #1 Pretrial Notice Form)(jjs)
July 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 8/22/2019 11:00 AM before case manager by telephone. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance on 7/26/19.(jjs)
July 24, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal with Jury Demand by Hornady Transportation, LLC, Hudson Insurance Company, Roy Lee Stone.(Schroeter, David)
July 16, 2019 Filing 7 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Sarah S. Vance and Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr. (ess)
July 16, 2019 Filing 6 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Hornady Transportation, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Hornady Truck Line, Inc., Corporate Parent Daseke Companies, Inc., Corporate Parent Daseke, Inc. for Hornady Transportation, LLC (Schroeter, David) Modified text on 7/17/2019 (clw).
July 16, 2019 Filing 5 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Hudson Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Odyssey Reinsurance Holdings Corp., Corporate Parent Fairfax Financial Holdings Limited, Corporate Parent Hudson Insurance Group for Hudson Insurance Company (Schroeter, David)
July 16, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Compliance by Hornady Transportation, LLC, Hudson Insurance Company, Roy Lee Stone re #1 Notice of Removal, List of Parties and Pleadings. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Schroeter, David) Modified text on 7/17/2019 (clw).
July 16, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE by Hornady Transportation, LLC, Hudson Insurance Company, Roy Lee Stone re #1 Notice of Removal, Notice to Plaintiff. (Schroeter, David) Modified text on 7/17/2019 (clw).
July 16, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE by Hornady Transportation, LLC, Hudson Insurance Company, Roy Lee Stone re #1 Notice of Removal, Notice to State Court. (Schroeter, David) Modified text on 7/17/2019 (clw).
July 16, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 24th Judicial District Court, case number 794867 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7755628) filed by Hudson Insurance Company, Hornady Transportation, LLC, Roy Lee Stone. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney David Mark Schroeter added to party Hornady Transportation, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney David Mark Schroeter added to party Hudson Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney David Mark Schroeter added to party Roy Lee Stone(pty:dft).(Schroeter, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Warr v. Stone et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tylando Pierre Warr
Represented By: Chad A Aguillard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hornady Transportation, LLC
Represented By: David Mark Schroeter
Represented By: M. Davis Ready
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roy Lee Stone
Represented By: David Mark Schroeter
Represented By: M. Davis Ready
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hudson Insurance Company
Represented By: David Mark Schroeter
Represented By: M. Davis Ready
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?