Manzanarez et al v. Liberty Mutual Fire Ins. Co. et al
Plaintiff: Leonel Manzanarez and Larry Manzanarez
Defendant: John Lenard Grube, Idealease Services, Inc., JLB Contractors, LLC and Liberty Mutual Fire Ins. Co.
Case Number: 2:2019cv11724
Filed: July 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Lance M Africk
Referring Judge: Barry W Ashe
2 Judge: Dana Douglas
3 Judge: Michael North
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER & REASONS: IT IS ORDERED that the #5 Motion to Remand to State Court is GRANTED and the above-captioned matter is REMANDED to the Civil District Court for the Parish of Orleans, State of Louisiana. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk on August 26, 2019.(cc: Civil District Court for Orleans Parish (mp) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/26/2019: #1 Remand Letter) (mp).
August 21, 2019 Filing 7 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by John Lenard Grube, JLB Contractors, LLC, Liberty Mutual Fire Ins. Co. re #5 MOTION to Remand to State Court . (Elvir, Paul)
August 16, 2019 Filing 6 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #5 MOTION to Remand to State Court. Filing attorney selected incorrect submission date. Correct date is 9/11/2019. Clerk tookcorrective action. (mp)
August 15, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Larry Manzanarez, Leonel Manzanarez. Motion(s) will be submitted on 9/11/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit, #3 Notice of Submission, #4 Proposed Order)(Voorhies, Richard) Modified submission date on 8/16/2019 (mp).
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE - It has been brought to the Court's attention that the this matter is related to Civil Action No. 19-1387. IT IS ORDERED that this matter is hereby transferred to Section I (3) for further proceedings. Case transferred to Judge Lance M Africk and Magistrate Judge Dana Douglas. Judge Barry W Ashe, Magistrate Judge Michael North no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Barry W Ashe on 8/5/2019. (NEF: Section I, Mag. 3) (sa)
July 18, 2019 Filing 3 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by JLB Contractors, LLC, Liberty Mutual Fire Ins. Co. (Elvir, Paul)
July 17, 2019 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Barry W Ashe and Magistrate Judge Michael North. (ess)
July 17, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Civil District Court for the Parish of Orleans, case number 2018-10312 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7757693) filed by JLB Contractors, LLC, Liberty Mutual Fire Ins. Co., John Lenard Grube. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Notice of Removal, #3 Memorandum in Support, #4 Proposed Pleading, #5 Proposed Pleading, #6 Proposed Pleading, #7 Proposed Pleading, #8 Complaint, #9 State Court Pleadings, #10 State Court Pleadings, #11 State Court Pleadings, #12 State Court Pleadings, #13 State Court Pleadings, #14 Exhibit, #15 Exhibit, #16 Exhibit, #17 Exhibit, #18 Exhibit, #19 Exhibit, #20 State Court Pleadings, #21 State Court Pleadings, #22 Exhibit, #23 Exhibit, #24 Exhibit, #25 State Court Pleadings)Attorney Paul Michael Elvir, Jr added to party John Lenard Grube(pty:dft), Attorney Paul Michael Elvir, Jr added to party JLB Contractors, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Paul Michael Elvir, Jr added to party Liberty Mutual Fire Ins. Co.(pty:dft).(Elvir, Paul)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Manzanarez et al v. Liberty Mutual Fire Ins. Co. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Lenard Grube
Represented By: Paul Michael Elvir, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Idealease Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JLB Contractors, LLC
Represented By: Paul Michael Elvir, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Mutual Fire Ins. Co.
Represented By: Paul Michael Elvir, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leonel Manzanarez
Represented By: Richard P. Voorhies, III
Represented By: Jennifer R. Rust
Represented By: John Mark Fezio
Represented By: Cesar Joseph Vazquez
Represented By: James Francis Flinn
Represented By: Roger Anthony Javier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry Manzanarez
Represented By: Richard P. Voorhies, III
Represented By: Jennifer R. Rust
Represented By: John Mark Fezio
Represented By: Cesar Joseph Vazquez
Represented By: James Francis Flinn
Represented By: Roger Anthony Javier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?