Rainwater v. Pontchartrain Hotel, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Jason Rainwater
Defendant: Aparium Hotel Group, LLC, Pontchartrain Hotel, Inc., John Doe, ABC Insurance Company, Cody Bertone, Federal Insurance Company and Unidentified Party
Case Number: 2:2019cv11765
Filed: July 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Dana Douglas
Referring Judge: Susie Morgan
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 22, 2019 Filing 12 Memorandum in Support of Federal Diversity Jurisdiction by Aparium Hotel Group, LLC, Cody Bertone, Federal Insurance Company filed as directed by #9 Minute Entry. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Wright, William) Modified on 8/23/2019 to edit docket text (bwn).
August 12, 2019 Filing 11 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #10 Response/Reply. **Document was imaged as 8-1/2" x 14". All documents should be 8-1/2" x 11". Clerk has corrected the image.** (sbs)
August 9, 2019 Filing 10 Response State Court Second Supplemental and Amending Petition by Jason Rainwater to #9 Telephone Conference. (Marcotte, Cristen) (Main Document 10 replaced on 8/12/2019) (sbs). Modified text on 8/12/2019 (sbs).
August 8, 2019 Filing 9 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Susie Morgan: Telephone Status Conference held on 8/8/2019. The parties discussed the status of the case and the Notice of Removal. Plaintiff will file the Second Amended Complaint immediately. Plaintiff will send a letter to the Court's e-file address (efile-Morgan@laed.uscourts.gov) informing the Court whether Plaintiff plans to file a motion to remand by no later than August 15, 2019 at 5:00 p.m. If Plaintiff does intend to file a motion to remand, that motion must be filed by August 22, 2019 at 5:00 p.m. If Plaintiff does not intend to file a motion to remand, Defendants must file a memorandum addressing the basis of the Court's jurisdiction and the propriety of removal by August 22, 2019 at 5:00 p.m. (bwn)
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that a telephone status conference be held on Thursday, August 8, 2019, at 10:00 a.m. The Court will provide the parties with the call-in instructions necessary to participate in the conference via telephone. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan.(bwn)
August 5, 2019 Filing 7 Notice of Compliance with 28 U.S.C. 1447(b) Directive of Clerk of Court Regarding Notice of Removal by Aparium Hotel Group, LLC, Cody Bertone, Federal Insurance Company re #3 Order, #1 Notice of Removal,, 2 Initial Case Assignment. (Wright, William)
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Notice of Removal. The responsive pleadings for Aparium Hotel Group, LLC, Cody Bertone, and Federal Insurance Company are due on or before Friday, August 16, 2019. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan on 7/29/2019. (sbs)
July 29, 2019 Filing 5 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #4 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Notice of Removal. **Motion should have been linked to the Notice of Removal. Clerk took corrective action.** (sbs)
July 26, 2019 Filing 4 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings re #1 Notice of Removal by Aparium Hotel Group, LLC, Cody Bertone, Federal Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Order)(Wright, William) Modified text on 7/29/2019 (sbs).
July 22, 2019 Filing 3 Directive by the Clerk re #1 Notice of Removal filed by Aparium Hotel Group, LLC, Cody Bertone, Federal Insurance Company. (pp)
July 19, 2019 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Susie Morgan and Magistrate Judge Dana Douglas. (ess)
July 19, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Civil District Court for the Parish of Orleans, case number 2019-5747 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7761935) filed by Cody Bertone, Aparium Hotel Group, LLC, Federal Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney William Kirby Wright, IV added to party Aparium Hotel Group, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney William Kirby Wright, IV added to party Cody Bertone(pty:dft), Attorney William Kirby Wright, IV added to party Pontchartrain Hotel, Inc.(pty:dft).(Wright, William) Modified text on 7/22/2019 (pp).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rainwater v. Pontchartrain Hotel, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aparium Hotel Group, LLC
Represented By: William Kirby Wright, IV
Represented By: Christopher A. D'Amour
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pontchartrain Hotel, Inc.
Represented By: William Kirby Wright, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cody Bertone
Represented By: William Kirby Wright, IV
Represented By: Christopher A. D'Amour
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Insurance Company
Represented By: William Kirby Wright, IV
Represented By: Christopher A. D'Amour
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unidentified Party
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Rainwater
Represented By: John Bartholomew Kelly, III
Represented By: Kurt A. Offner
Represented By: Sarah Elizabeth Fontcuberta
Represented By: Cristen Marcotte
Represented By: Roderick Alvendia
Represented By: Jeanne K. Demarest
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?