Schexnayder v. McCarty Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Denis Schexnayder Jr. and Denis Schexnayder, Jr.
Defendant: Certain Underwriters at Lloyds London, Travelers Insurance Company, Foster Wheeler LLC, Huntington Ingalls Incorporated, Crane Co., Owens Illinois Inc, McCarty Corporation, Lamorak Insurance Company, International Paper Company, Hopeman Brothers Inc, Eagle Inc., United States Fidelity & Guaranty Company, Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, CBS Corporation, Taylor Seidenbach, Inc., Warren Pumps LLC, Roberts John David, John David Roberts, Travelers Indemnity Company, Avondale Industries, Inc., J D Roberts, Crane Company and Warren Pumps, LLC
3Rd Party Plaintiff: Albert L Bossier, Jr
3Rd Party Defendant: Medical Center of Louisiana at New Orleans, Uniroyal Holding, Inc., Bayer CropScience, Inc., Charity Hospital of New Orleans and Manville Personal Injury Settlement Trust
Case Number: 2:2019cv11773
Filed: July 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Dana Douglas
Referring Judge: Jane Triche Milazzo
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 16, 2019 Filing 99 ANSWER to #7 Answer to Complaint - Notice of Removal,,, Third Party Complaint,,, Crossclaim,, of Albert L. Bossier, Jr. by Hopeman Brothers Inc(Doc. 7).(Moore, Blaine)
September 16, 2019 Filing 98 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal, Cross-Claims of Huntington Ingalls Incorporated by Hopeman Brothers Inc(Doc. 36).(Moore, Blaine)
September 16, 2019 Filing 97 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Hopeman Brothers Inc (Moore, Blaine)
September 16, 2019 Filing 96 ANSWER to #36 Answer to Complaint - Notice of Removal,,, Crossclaim,, of Huntington Ingalls Incorporated by Taylor Seidenbach, Inc.(Doc. 7).(Lightfoot, Christopher)
September 13, 2019 Filing 95 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #91 , #92 Answer to Complaint.**1. Document does not contain Section and/or Magistrate Judge. All future pleadings must reflect SectionH and Magistrate (3). **2.Document should have been linked to another document by checking the box 'Should the document you are filing link to another document' or by selecting a related document on other appropriate screen. Clerk took corrective action by linking document to document 1.** (am)
September 12, 2019 Filing 94 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by United States Fidelity & Guaranty Company identifying Corporate Parent Travelers Companies, Inc., Corporate Parent St. Paul Fire and Marine Insurance Company for United States Fidelity & Guaranty Company (Wilson, Kristopher) Modified text on 9/13/2019 (am).
September 12, 2019 Filing 93 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Travelers Indemnity Company identifying Corporate Parent Travelers Companies, Inc., Corporate Parent Travelers Insurance Group Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Travelers Property Casualty Corp. for Travelers Indemnity Company (Wilson, Kristopher) Modified text on 9/13/2019 (am).
September 12, 2019 Filing 92 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal, Original and First Amended Petitions by United States Fidelity & Guaranty Company.(Wilson, Kristopher)
September 12, 2019 Filing 91 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal and First Amended Petitions by Travelers Indemnity Company.(Wilson, Kristopher) Modified text on 9/13/2019 (am).
September 10, 2019 Filing 90 ANSWER to #36 Crossclaim Of Huntington Ingalls Incorporated by Uniroyal Holding, Inc., Uniroyal Holding, Inc. (Arthur, Mary) Modified text on 9/11/2019 (am).
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 89 TEXT ORDER (No PDF Document Attached) granting #87 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Notice of Removal, as to United States Fidelity & Guaranty Company answer due 9/12/2019. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo on 8/29/19. (ecm)
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 88 TEXT ORDER (No PDF Document Attached) granting #86 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Notice of Removal, as to Travelers Indemnity Company answer due 9/12/2019. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo on 8/29/19. (ecm)
August 28, 2019 Filing 87 EXPARTE/CONSENT First MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Notice of Removal, by United States Fidelity & Guaranty Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Wilson, Kristopher)
August 28, 2019 Filing 86 EXPARTE/CONSENT First MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Notice of Removal, by Travelers Indemnity Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Kristopher T. Wilson added to party Travelers Indemnity Company(pty:dft).(Wilson, Kristopher)
August 26, 2019 Filing 85 ANSWER to #7 Third-Party Demands of Albert L. Bossier, Jr. by Uniroyal Holding, Inc..Attorney Mary Reeves Arthur added to party Uniroyal Holding, Inc.(pty:3pd).(Arthur, Mary) Modified text on 8/27/2019 (am).
August 26, 2019 Filing 84 REPLY to Response to Motion filed by Denis Schexnayder, Jr re #33 MOTION to Remand . (ecm)
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 83 TEXT ORDER (No PDF Document Attached) granting #82 Motion for Leave to File Reply Memorandum. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo on 8/26/2019. (ecm)
August 23, 2019 Filing 82 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion to Remand by Denis Schexnayder, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Proposed Pleading)(Hoffman, Philip)
August 23, 2019 Filing 81 RESPONSE to Motion filed by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated re #33 MOTION to Remand . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit)(ko)
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER granting #67 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo on 8/23/19. (ko)
August 22, 2019 Filing 79 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Warren Pumps, LLC identifying Corporate Parent IMO Industries, Inc., Corporate Parent Colfax Corporation for Warren Pumps, LLC (Porteous, Thomas) Modified text/corporate parent on 8/22/2019 (am).
August 21, 2019 Filing 78 ANSWER to #7 Crossclaims and Third Party Complaint of Albert L. Bossier, Jr. by Warren Pumps, LLC, Warren Pumps, LLC.(Porteous, Thomas) Modified text on 8/21/2019 (am).
August 21, 2019 Filing 77 ANSWER to #36 Crossclaim Of Huntington Ingalls Incorporated by Warren Pumps, LLC.(Porteous, Thomas) Modified text on 8/21/2019 (am).
August 21, 2019 Filing 76 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #65 Notice of Appearance.**Document has been stricken. Notice of Appearance is not the proper form to request representation of a party. All attorneys listed on Motion for extension of time have been added as counsel of record.** (am)
August 21, 2019 Filing 75 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #63 Notice of Appearance.**Document has been stricken. Notice of Appearance is not the proper form to request representation of a party. All attorneys listed on Motion for extension of time have been added as counsel of record.** (am)
August 20, 2019 Filing 74 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Owens Illinois Inc (Penn, Elizabeth)
August 20, 2019 Filing 73 ANSWER to #7 Crossclaim with Jury Demand of Albert L. Bossier, Jr., by Owens Illinois Inc(Doc. 36).(Penn, Elizabeth) Modified text on 8/21/2019 (am).
August 20, 2019 Filing 72 ANSWER to #36 Crossclaim of Huntington Ingalls Incorporated by Owens Illinois Inc(Doc. 7).(Penn, Elizabeth) Modified text on 8/21/2019 (am).
August 20, 2019 Filing 71 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal, Answer toPlaintiff's Original and First Supplemental and Amended Petition for Damages by Owens Illinois Inc.(Penn, Elizabeth) Modified text on 8/21/2019 (am).
August 20, 2019 Filing 70 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by International Paper Company (Penn, Elizabeth)
August 20, 2019 Filing 69 ANSWER to #36 Crossclaim of Huntington Ingalls Incorporated by International Paper Company(Doc. 7).Attorney Elizabeth Riddell Penn added to party International Paper Company(pty:crd).(Penn, Elizabeth) Modified text on 8/21/2019 (am).
August 20, 2019 Filing 68 ANSWER to #7 Crossclaim of Albert L. Bossier, Jr., by International Paper Company(Doc. 36).Attorney Elizabeth Riddell Penn added to party International Paper Company(pty:crd).(Penn, Elizabeth) Modified text on 8/21/2019 (am).
August 20, 2019 Filing 67 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated, Huntington Ingalls Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Pleading, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit)(Melancon, David)
August 20, 2019 Filing 66 **DEFICIENT**EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Notice of Removal, by Travelers Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Wilson, Kristopher) Modified text on 8/21/2019 (am).
August 20, 2019 Filing 65 **STRICKEN**NOTICE of Appearance by Kristopher T. Wilson on behalf of Travelers Insurance Company. Attorney Kristopher T. Wilson added to party Travelers Insurance Company(pty:dft).(Wilson, Kristopher) Modified text on 8/21/2019 (am).
August 20, 2019 Filing 64 **DEFICIENT**EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Notice of Removal, by United States Fidelity & Guaranty Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Wilson, Kristopher) Modified text on 8/21/2019 (am).
August 20, 2019 Filing 63 **STRICKEN**NOTICE of Appearance by Kristopher T. Wilson on behalf of United States Fidelity & Guaranty Company. Attorney Kristopher T. Wilson added to party United States Fidelity & Guaranty Company(pty:dft).(Wilson, Kristopher) Modified text on 8/21/2019 (am).
August 15, 2019 Filing 62 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Crane Company (Romero, Jacqueline)
August 15, 2019 Filing 61 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal, with Jury Demand Original and First Supplemental Petition for Damages by Crane Company.Attorney Jacqueline Romero added to party Crane Company(pty:dft).(Romero, Jacqueline)
August 13, 2019 Filing 60 ANSWER to #36 Crossclaim, CROSSCLAIM against Eagle Inc. by Eagle Inc.(Kinler, Douglas) Modified text on 8/14/2019 (am).
August 13, 2019 Filing 59 ANSWER to #36 Crossclaim CROSSCLAIM against McCarty Corporation.(Kinler, Douglas) Modified text on 8/14/2019 (am).
August 13, 2019 Filing 58 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Eagle Inc. (Kinler, Douglas)
August 13, 2019 Filing 57 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by McCarty Corporation (Kinler, Douglas)
August 9, 2019 Filing 56 Summons Issued as to Bayer CropScience, Inc., CBS Corporation, Crane Company, Eagle Inc., Foster Wheeler LLC, Hopeman Brothers Inc, International Paper Company, Liberty Mutual Insurance Company(as alleged insurer of Wayne Manufacturing Corporation), Manville Personal Injury Settlement Trust, McCarty Corporation, Medical Center of Louisiana at New Orleans, Owens Illinois Inc, Taylor Seidenbach, Inc., Uniroyal Holding, Inc., United States Fidelity & Guaranty Company(as Insurer of Eagle Inc.), Warren Pumps, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons, #10 Summons, #11 Summons, #12 Summons, #13 Summons, #14 Summons, #15 Summons)(am)
August 8, 2019 Filing 55 ANSWER to #7 Crossclaim and Third Party Complaint, by Taylor Seidenbach, Inc.(Lightfoot, Christopher) Modified text on 8/9/2019 (am).
August 8, 2019 Filing 54 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal, by Taylor Seidenbach, Inc.(Lightfoot, Christopher) Modified text on 8/9/2019 (am).
August 8, 2019 Filing 53 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Taylor Seidenbach, Inc. (Lightfoot, Christopher)
August 8, 2019 Filing 52 Request of Summons Issued as to Warren Pumps, LLC filed by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated re #36 Answer to Complaint - Notice of Removal, Crossclaim. (Melancon, David) Modified text on 8/9/2019 (am).
August 8, 2019 Filing 51 Request of Summons Issued as to United States Fidelity & Guaranty Company(as Insurer of Eagle Inc.) filed by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated re #36 Answer to Complaint - Notice of Removal, Crossclaim. (Melancon, David) Modified text on 8/9/2019 (am).
August 8, 2019 Filing 50 Request of Summons Issued as to Uniroyal Holding, Inc. filed by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated re #36 Answer to Complaint - Notice of Removal, Crossclaim. (Melancon, David) Modified text on 8/9/2019 (am).
August 8, 2019 Filing 49 Request of Summons Issued as to Taylor Seidenbach, Inc. filed by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated re #36 Answer to Complaint - Notice of Removal, Crossclaim. (Melancon, David) Modified text on 8/9/2019 (am).
August 8, 2019 Filing 48 Request of Summons Issued as to Owens Illinois Inc filed by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated re #36 Answer to Complaint - Notice of Removal, Crossclaim. (Melancon, David) Modified text on 8/9/2019 (am).
August 8, 2019 Filing 47 Request of Summons Issued as to McCarty Corporation filed by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated re #36 Answer to Complaint - Notice of Removal, Crossclaim. (Melancon, David) Modified text on 8/9/2019 (am).
August 8, 2019 Filing 46 Request of Summons Issued as to Liberty Mutual Insurance Company(as alleged insurer of Wayne Manufacturing Corporation) filed by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated re #36 Answer to Complaint - Notice of Removal, Crossclaim. (Melancon, David) Modified text on 8/9/2019 (am).
August 8, 2019 Filing 45 Request of Summons Issued as to Manville Personal Injury Settlement Trust filed by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated re #36 Answer to Complaint - Notice of Removal, Crossclaim. (Melancon, David) Modified text on 8/9/2019 (am).
August 8, 2019 Filing 44 Request of Summons Issued as to International Paper Company filed by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated re #36 Answer to Complaint - Notice of Removal, Crossclaim. (Melancon, David) Modified text on 8/9/2019 (am).
August 8, 2019 Filing 43 Request of Summons Issued as to Hopeman Brothers Inc filed by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated re #36 Answer to Complaint - Notice of Removal, Crossclaim. (Melancon, David) Modified text on 8/9/2019 (am).
August 8, 2019 Filing 42 Request of Summons Issued as to Foster Wheeler LLC filed by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated re #36 Answer to Complaint - Notice of Removal, Crossclaim. (Melancon, David) Modified text on 8/9/2019 (am).
August 8, 2019 Filing 41 Request of Summons Issued as to Eagle Inc. filed by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated re #36 Answer to Complaint - Notice of Removal, Crossclaim. (Melancon, David) Modified text on 8/9/2019 (am).
August 8, 2019 Filing 40 Request of Summons Issued as to Crane Company filed by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated re #36 Answer to Complaint - Notice of Removal, Crossclaim. (Melancon, David) Modified text on 8/9/2019 (am).
August 8, 2019 Filing 39 Request of Summons Issued as to Medical Center of Louisiana at New Orleans filed by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated re #36 Answer to Complaint - Notice of Removal, Crossclaim. (Melancon, David) Modified text on 8/9/2019 (am).
August 8, 2019 Filing 38 Request of Summons Issued as to CBS Corporation filed by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated re #36 Answer to Complaint - Notice of Removal, Crossclaim. (Melancon, David) Modified text on 8/9/2019 (am).
August 8, 2019 Filing 37 Request of Summons Issued as to Bayer CropScience, Inc. filed by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated re #36 Answer to Complaint - Notice of Removal, Crossclaim. (Melancon, David) Modified text on 8/9/2019 (am).
August 8, 2019 Filing 36 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal, CROSSCLAIM against Bayer CropScience, Inc., CBS Corporation, Crane Company, Eagle Inc., Foster Wheeler LLC, Hopeman Brothers Inc, International Paper Company, Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, Manville Personal Injury Settlement Trust, McCarty Corporation, Medical Center of Louisiana at New Orleans, Owens Illinois Inc, Taylor Seidenbach, Inc., Uniroyal Holding, Inc., United States Fidelity & Guaranty Company, Warren Pumps, LLC by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated.(Melancon, David) Modified text on 8/9/2019 (am).
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER GRANTING #34 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo on 08/06/2019. (am)
August 6, 2019 Filing 34 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for Memorandum in Support of Motion to Remand by Denis Schexnayder, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Order)(Hoffman, Philip)
August 5, 2019 Filing 33 MOTION to Remand by Denis Schexnayder, Jr. Motion(s) will be submitted on 8/28/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Notice of Submission, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit, #15 Exhibit, #16 Exhibit, #17 Exhibit, #18 Exhibit, #19 Exhibit, #20 Exhibit, #21 Exhibit, #22 Exhibit, #23 Exhibit, #24 Exhibit, #25 Exhibit, #26 Exhibit, #27 Exhibit, #28 Exhibit, #29 Exhibit, #30 Exhibit, #31 Exhibit, #32 Exhibit, #33 Exhibit, #34 Exhibit, #35 Exhibit, #36 Exhibit, #37 Exhibit)(Hoffman, Philip)
August 2, 2019 Filing 32 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by CBS Corporation identifying Corporate Parent National Amusements, Inc., identifying Corporate Parent GAMCO Investors, Inc. for CBS Corporation (Puente-Martin, Magali) Modified text/added corporate parent on 8/2/2019 (am).
August 2, 2019 Filing 31 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal, 1st Supplemental and Amending Petition by CBS Corporation.Attorney Magali Ann Puente-Martin added to party CBS Corporation(pty:dft).(Puente-Martin, Magali) Modified text on 8/2/2019 (am).
August 2, 2019 Filing 30 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal, First Supplemental and Amending Petition by Foster Wheeler LLC.(Puente-Martin, Magali) Modified text on 8/2/2019 (am).
August 2, 2019 Filing 29 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Foster Wheeler LLC identifying Corporate Parent John Wood Group PLC for Foster Wheeler LLC (Puente-Martin, Magali)
August 2, 2019 Filing 28 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal, Answer to Pls Original Petition for Damages by Foster Wheeler LLC.Attorney Magali Ann Puente-Martin added to party Foster Wheeler LLC(pty:dft).(Puente-Martin, Magali)
August 2, 2019 Filing 27 Summons Issued as to Taylor Seidenbach, Inc. (am)
August 1, 2019 Filing 26 Summons Issued as to CBS Corporation, Crane Company, Eagle Inc., Hopeman Brothers Inc, International Paper Company, Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, McCarty Corporation, Owens Illinois Inc, United States Fidelity & Guaranty Company. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons)(am)
August 1, 2019 Filing 25 Summons Issued as to Bayer CropScience, Inc., Foster Wheeler LLC, Manville Personal Injury Settlement Trust, Medical Center of Louisiana at New Orleans, Uniroyal Holding, Inc., Warren Pumps, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons)(am)
August 1, 2019 Filing 24 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal, by Warren Pumps, LLC.Attorney Thomas A. Porteous added to party Warren Pumps, LLC(pty:dft).(Porteous, Thomas)
July 31, 2019 Filing 23 Request of Summons Issued as to United States Fidelity & Guaranty Company filed by Albert L Bossier, Jr re #7 Answer to Complaint - Notice of Removal, Crossclaim. (Melancon, David) Modified text on 8/1/2019 (am).
July 31, 2019 Filing 22 Request of Summons Issued as to Taylor Seidenbach, Inc. filed by Albert L Bossier, Jr re #7 Answer to Complaint - Notice of Removal, Crossclaim. (Melancon, David) Modified text on 8/1/2019 (am).
July 31, 2019 Filing 21 Request of Summons Issued as to Owens Illinois Inc filed by Albert L Bossier, Jr re #7 Answer to Complaint - Notice of Removal, Crossclaim. (Melancon, David) Modified text on 8/1/2019 (am).
July 31, 2019 Filing 20 Request of Summons Issued as to McCarty Corporation filed by Albert L Bossier, Jr re #7 Answer to Complaint - Notice of Removal, Crossclaim. (Melancon, David) Modified text on 8/1/2019 (am).
July 31, 2019 Filing 19 Request of Summons Issued as to Liberty Mutual Insurance Company filed by Albert L Bossier, Jr re #7 Answer to Complaint - Notice of Removal, Third Party Complaint, Crossclaim. (Melancon, David) Modified text on 8/1/2019 (am).
July 31, 2019 Filing 18 Request of Summons Issued as to International Paper Company filed by Albert L Bossier, Jr re #7 Answer to Complaint - Notice of Removal, Crossclaim. (Melancon, David) Modified text on 8/1/2019 (am).
July 31, 2019 Filing 17 Request of Summons Issued as to Hopeman Brothers Inc filed by Albert L Bossier, Jr re #7 Answer to Complaint - Notice of Removal, Crossclaim. (Melancon, David) Modified text on 8/1/2019 (am).
July 31, 2019 Filing 16 Request of Summons Issued as to Eagle Inc. filed by Albert L Bossier, Jr re #7 Answer to Complaint - Notice of Removal, Crossclaim. (Melancon, David) Modified text on 8/1/2019 (am).
July 31, 2019 Filing 15 Request of Summons Issued as to Crane Company filed by Albert L Bossier, Jr re #7 Answer to Complaint - Notice of Removal, Crossclaim. (Melancon, David) Modified text on 8/1/2019 (am).
July 31, 2019 Filing 14 Request of Summons Issued as to CBS Corporation filed by Albert L Bossier, Jr re #7 Answer to Complaint - Notice of Removal, Crossclaim. (Melancon, David) Modified text on 8/1/2019 (am).
July 31, 2019 Filing 13 Request of Summons Issued as to Uniroyal Holding, Inc. filed by Albert L Bossier, Jr re #7 Answer to Complaint - Notice of Removal, Third Party Complaint, Crossclaim. (Melancon, David) Modified text on 8/1/2019 (am).
July 31, 2019 Filing 12 Request of Summons Issued as to Medical Center of Louisiana at New Orleans filed by Albert L Bossier, Jr re #7 Answer to Complaint - Notice of Removal, Third Party Complaint, Crossclaim. (Melancon, David) Modified text on 8/1/2019 (am).
July 31, 2019 Filing 11 Request of Summons Issued as to Manville Personal Injury Settlement Trust filed by Albert L Bossier, Jr re #7 Answer to Complaint - Notice of Removal, Third Party Complaint, Crossclaim. (Melancon, David) Modified text on 8/1/2019 (am).
July 31, 2019 Filing 10 Request of Summons Issued as to Bayer CropScience, Inc. filed by Albert L Bossier, Jr re #7 Answer to Complaint - Notice of Removal, Third Party Complaint, Crossclaim. (Melancon, David) Modified text on 8/1/2019 (am).
July 31, 2019 Filing 9 Request of Summons Issued as to Foster Wheeler LLC filed by Albert L Bossier, Jr re #7 Answer to Complaint - Notice of Removal, Third Party Complaint, Crossclaim. (Melancon, David) Modified text on 8/1/2019 (am).
July 31, 2019 Filing 8 Request of Summons Issued as to Warren Pumps, LLC filed by Albert L Bossier, Jr re #7 Answer to Complaint - Notice of Removal, Third Party Complaint, Crossclaim. (Melancon, David) Modified text on 8/1/2019 (am).
July 30, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal, with Jury Demand , THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Warren Pumps, LLC, Foster Wheeler LLC, Medical Center of Louisiana at New Orleans, Manville Personal Injury Settlement Trust, Bayer CropScience, Inc., Uniroyal, Inc., CROSSCLAIM with Jury Demand against CBS Corporation, Crane Company, Eagle Inc., Hopeman Brothers Inc, International Paper Company, Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, McCarty Corporation, Owens Illinois Inc, Taylor Seidenbach, Inc., United States Fidelity & Guaranty Company by Albert L Bossier, Jr.(Melancon, David)
July 26, 2019 Filing 6 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #5 Notice of Compliance.**Filing attorney incorrectly linked document to document 4. Clerk properly linked document to document 1.** (am)
July 25, 2019 Filing 5 Notice of Compliance by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated re #1 Notice of Removal. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Melancon, David) Modified text/linkage on 7/26/2019 (am).
July 22, 2019 Filing 4 Directive by the Clerk re #1 Notice of Removal filed by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated. (pp)
July 22, 2019 Filing 3 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Lamorak Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Trebuchet U.S. Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Bedivere Insurance Company, Corporate Parent Trebuchet Investments, Limited, Corporate Parent Armour Group Holdings, Limited for Lamorak Insurance Company (Rosamond, Samuel)
July 19, 2019 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Jane Triche Milazzo and Magistrate Judge Dana Douglas. (ess)
July 19, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Civil District Court, Orleans Parish, case number 2019-05444 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7762715) filed by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit)Attorney David Michael Melancon added to party Huntington Ingalls Incorporated(pty:dft).(Melancon, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Schexnayder v. McCarty Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Certain Underwriters at Lloyds London
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travelers Insurance Company
Represented By: Patricia Cowen Penton
Represented By: Kristopher T. Wilson
Represented By: Katherine Osborne Hannan,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Foster Wheeler LLC
Represented By: John Joseph Hainkel, III
Represented By: Lacey Taylor McCoy
Represented By: James H. Brown, Jr.
Represented By: Kelsey A. Eagan
Represented By: Angela M. Bowlin
Represented By: Magali Ann Puente-Martin
Represented By: Kelly L. Long
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Huntington Ingalls Incorporated
Represented By: David Michael Melancon
Represented By: Alexander R Saunders
Represented By: Michael Scott Minyard
Represented By: Timothy Farrow Daniels
Represented By: Alison A. Spindler
Represented By: Edward Winter Trapolin
Represented By: Gustave A. Fritchie, III
Represented By: Christopher Thomas Whelen
Represented By: Michael Kevin Powell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crane Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Owens Illinois Inc
Represented By: Walter G. Watkins, III
Represented By: Mary Reeves Arthur
Represented By: Elizabeth Riddell Penn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McCarty Corporation
Represented By: Louis Oliver Oubre
Represented By: Susan Beth Kohn
Represented By: James R. Guidry
Represented By: Douglas Kinler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lamorak Insurance Company
Represented By: Samuel Milton Rosamond, III
Represented By: Adam Devlin deMahy
Represented By: Elizabeth Riddell Penn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: International Paper Company
Represented By: Walter G. Watkins, III
Represented By: Mary Reeves Arthur
Represented By: Thomas Peyton Smith
Represented By: Jason K. Elam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hopeman Brothers Inc
Represented By: Kaye N. Courington
Represented By: Jeffrey Matthew Burg
Represented By: Blaine Augusta Moore
Represented By: Mathilde Villere Semmes
Represented By: Troy Nathan Bell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eagle Inc.
Represented By: Louis Oliver Oubre
Represented By: Susan Beth Kohn
Represented By: James R. Guidry
Represented By: Douglas Kinler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Fidelity & Guaranty Company
Represented By: Patricia Cowen Penton
Represented By: Kristopher T. Wilson
Represented By: Katherine Osborne Hannan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Mutual Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBS Corporation
Represented By: John Joseph Hainkel, III
Represented By: Lacey Taylor McCoy
Represented By: James H. Brown, Jr.
Represented By: Kelsey A. Eagan
Represented By: Angela M. Bowlin
Represented By: Magali Ann Puente-Martin
Represented By: Kelly L. Long
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Taylor Seidenbach, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher Kelly Lightfoot
Represented By: Edward J. Lassus, Jr.
Represented By: Richard J. Garvey, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warren Pumps LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roberts John David
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John David Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travelers Indemnity Company
Represented By: Patricia Cowen Penton
Represented By: Kristopher T. Wilson
Represented By: Katherine Osborne Hannan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Avondale Industries, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J D Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crane Company
Represented By: Donna M. Young
Represented By: Lawrence G. Pugh, III
Represented By: Shelley L. Thompson
Represented By: Jacqueline Romero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warren Pumps, LLC
Represented By: Thomas A. Porteous
Represented By: Joseph Henry Hart, IV
Represented By: Daniel E. Oser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Denis Schexnayder Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Denis Schexnayder, Jr.
Represented By: Frank J. Swarr
Represented By: Mickey P. Landry
Represented By: Matthew C. Clark
Represented By: Philip C Hoffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: Albert L Bossier, Jr
Represented By: David Michael Melancon
Represented By: Alexander R Saunders
Represented By: Michael Scott Minyard
Represented By: Timothy Farrow Daniels
Represented By: Alison A. Spindler
Represented By: Edward Winter Trapolin
Represented By: Gustave A. Fritchie, III
Represented By: Christopher Thomas Whelen
Represented By: Michael Kevin Powell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Medical Center of Louisiana at New Orleans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Uniroyal Holding, Inc.
Represented By: Amy Louise Maccherone
Represented By: Mary Reeves Arthur
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Bayer CropScience, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Charity Hospital of New Orleans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Manville Personal Injury Settlement Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?