Lee & Perles, L.L.P. et al v. Resolute Management, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Gary A. Lee, Richard M. Perles, Lee & Perles, L.L.P. Formerly Known as Lee, Futrell & Perles, L.L.P. and Lee & Perles LLP
Defendant: OneBeacon America Insurance Company, Lamorak Insurance Company, formerly known as and/or successor to OneBeacon America Insurance Company and Commercial Union Insurance Company, Resolute Management, Inc., Taylor Wellons, Politz & Duhe, PLC, Samuel M. Rosamond, III and Lamorak Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2019cv11774
Filed: July 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Nannette Jolivette Brown
Referring Judge: Ivan LR Lemelle
2 Judge: Janis van Meerveld
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 16, 2019 Filing 63 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Resolute Management, Inc. re #59 MOTION to Vacate #55 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim of Amended Complaint, #56 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , #53 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Supplement, #60 MOTION to Expedite Motion to Vacate Submission Dates and Deadlines . (Pelleteri, Maura)
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiffs' Motion to Expedite Motion to Vacate Pending Submission Dates and the Deadlines for Responding Thereto (Rec. Doc. #60 ) is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs' Expedited Motion to Vacate Pending Submission Dates and the Deadlines for Responding Thereto (Rec. Doc. #59 ) is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs shall have until September 24, 2019 to file any opposition to the Defendants' Motions to Dismiss. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 9/16/2019. (sa)
September 16, 2019 Filing 61 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Samuel M. Rosamond, III, Taylor Wellons, Politz & Duhe, PLC re #59 MOTION to Vacate #55 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim of Amended Complaint, #56 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , #53 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Supplement, #60 MOTION to Expedite Motion to Vacate Submission Dates and Deadlines . (Evans, Joelle)
September 16, 2019 Filing 60 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Expedite Motion to Vacate Submission Dates and Deadlines by Gary A. Lee, Lee & Perles LLP, Richard M. Perles. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Didriksen, Caleb)
September 16, 2019 Filing 59 MOTION to Vacate #55 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim of Amended Complaint, #56 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , #53 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Supplemental and Amended Petition, #19 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , #16 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, #18 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Motion to Vacate Submission Dates and Deadlines by Gary A. Lee, Lee & Perles LLP, Richard M. Perles. Motion(s) will be submitted on 10/9/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Notice of Submission)(Didriksen, Caleb)
September 11, 2019 Filing 58 REPLY to Response to Motion filed by Gary A. Lee, Lee & Perles LLP, Richard M. Perles re #20 MOTION to Remand to State Court . (ko)
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER granting #51 Motion for Leave to File Reply. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 9/11/19. (ko)
September 9, 2019 Filing 56 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Lamorak Insurance Company, OneBeacon America Insurance Company. Motion(s) will be submitted on 9/25/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Notice of Submission)(Barrasso, Judy) Modified text on 9/10/2019 (pp). Modified filers on 9/12/2019 (jls).
September 9, 2019 Filing 55 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim of Amended Complaint by Resolute Management, Inc.. Motion(s) will be submitted on 9/25/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Affidavit Thomas M. Ryan, #3 Notice of Submission)(Pelleteri, Maura)
September 9, 2019 Filing 54 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Samuel M. Rosamond, III, Taylor Wellons, Politz & Duhe, PLC re #20 MOTION to Remand to State Court . (Evans, Joelle)
September 9, 2019 Filing 53 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Supplemental and Amended Petition by Samuel M. Rosamond, III, Taylor Wellons, Politz & Duhe, PLC. Motion(s) will be submitted on 9/25/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Notice of Submission)(Evans, Joelle)
September 9, 2019 Filing 52 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #51 REPLY to Response to Motion. **1) Filing attorney selected incorrect event. Correct event is Motion for Leave to File Document. Clerk took corrective action by changing the event. **2) When converting documents to pdf, please be sure to remove any additional blank pages from your document. Clerk removed blank page 2 from the proposed order and blank page 11 from the proposed pleading. No further action necessary.** (jls)
September 6, 2019 Filing 51 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Reply re Motion to Remand to State Court, rec. doc. 20. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Leave to File Reply to Opposition to Motion to Remand, #2 Proposed Pleading - Plaintiffs' Reply to Opposition to Motion to Remand)(Didriksen, Caleb) (Attachment 1 replaced on 9/9/2019) (jls). (Attachment 2 replaced on 9/9/2019) (jls). Modified event/text on 9/9/2019 (jls).
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER GRANTING #38 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Stephen L. Miles terminated. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 9/4/2019. (jls)
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER DENYING AS MOOT #43 Motion to Expedite. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 9/4/2019. (jls)
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER DENYING AS MOOT #42 Motion to Continue. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 9/4/2019. (jls)
September 4, 2019 Filing 47 Sur-Reply filed by Gary A. Lee, Lee & Perles LLP, Richard M. Perles re #16 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. (jls)
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER GRANTING #36 Motion for Leave to File Sur-Reply. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 9/4/2019. (jls)
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER granting #22 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply filed by Gary A. Lee, Lee & Perles LLP. ORDER Setting/Resetting submission on #16 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, #18 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , #19 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim . Motion(s) will be submitted on 9/25/2019. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown.(jrc) Modified text on 9/4/2019 (jls).
September 3, 2019 Filing 44 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Lamorak Insurance Company, Resolute Management, Inc. re #20 MOTION to Remand to State Court . (Barrasso, Judy)
September 3, 2019 Filing 43 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Expedite Motion to Continue Defendants' Motions to Dismiss by Gary A. Lee, Lee & Perles LLP, Richard M. Perles. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Didriksen, Caleb)
September 3, 2019 Filing 42 MOTION to Continue Defendants' Motions to Dismiss by Gary A. Lee, Lee & Perles LLP, Richard M. Perles. Motion(s) will be submitted on 9/25/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Notice of Submission)(Didriksen, Caleb)
September 3, 2019 Filing 41 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #37 MOTION to Withdraw Stephen L. Miles as Attorney . **Document has been marked as filed in error. Please see rec. doc. 38 for corrected filing.** (jls)
September 3, 2019 Filing 40 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #34 MOTION to Continue Defendants' Motion to Continue. **Document has been marked as filed in error. This is a duplicate filing of rec doc. 35.** (jls)
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER granting #30 Motion to Enroll as Counsel of Record for Attorney Shaun P McFall for Lamorak Insurance Company. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 8/30/19. (ko)
August 30, 2019 Filing 38 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Withdraw Stephen L. Miles as Attorney by Lamorak Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Barrasso, Judy) Modified text on 9/3/2019 (jls).
August 30, 2019 Filing 37 **FILED IN ERROR - See rec. doc. 38 for corrected filing** EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Withdraw Stephen L. Miles as Attorney by Lamorak Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Barrasso, Judy) Modified on 9/3/2019 (jls).
August 30, 2019 Filing 36 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply by Gary A. Lee, Lee & Perles LLP, Richard M. Perles. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Notice of Submission)(Didriksen, Caleb) Modified text/removed submission date on 9/3/2019 (jls).
August 30, 2019 Filing 35 **DEFICIENT** MOTION to Continue Defendants' Motion to Continue by Gary A. Lee, Lee & Perles LLP, Richard M. Perles. Motion(s) will be submitted on 9/25/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Notice of Submission)(Didriksen, Caleb) Modified on 9/3/2019 (jls).
August 30, 2019 Filing 34 **FILED IN ERROR - Duplicate of rec doc. 35** MOTION to Continue Defendants' Motion to Continue by Gary A. Lee, Lee & Perles LLP, Richard M. Perles. Motion(s) will be submitted on 9/25/2019. (Didriksen, Caleb) Modified on 9/3/2019 (jls).
August 28, 2019 Filing 33 REPLY to Response to Motion filed by Samuel M. Rosamond, III, Taylor Wellons, Politz & Duhe, PLC re #16 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(ko)
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER granting #28 Motion for Leave to File Reply. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 8/28/19. (ko)
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDERED that the Plaintiffs' #22 Ex Parte Motion for Extension of Time to Respond is set for hearing without oral argument on 8/30/2019. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 8/30/2019.(jls)
August 27, 2019 Filing 30 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Enroll as Counsel of Record Shaun P. McFall by Lamorak Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Barrasso, Judy) Modified text on 8/27/2019 (jls).
August 26, 2019 Filing 29 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Richard M. Perles, Lee & Perles LLP, Gary A. Lee.(Didriksen, Caleb)
August 26, 2019 Filing 28 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Memorandum in Reply to Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss by Samuel M. Rosamond, III, Taylor Wellons, Politz & Duhe, PLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Proposed Order)(Evans, Joelle)
August 21, 2019 Filing 27 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Gary A. Lee, Lee & Perles LLP re #16 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit, #15 Exhibit)(Didriksen, Caleb)
August 21, 2019 Filing 26 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Resolute Management, Inc. re #22 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply . (Pelleteri, Maura)
August 21, 2019 Filing 25 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #22 MOTION for Extension of Deadlines . The title of the attached proposed order should not include the title of the motion but only reflect Order on the actual document. Attorney has provided corrected document. No further action required. (pp)
August 21, 2019 Filing 24 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Samuel M. Rosamond, III, Taylor Wellons, Politz & Duhe, PLC re #22 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply . (Schonekas, Kyle) Modified text on 8/22/2019 (jls).
August 21, 2019 Filing 23 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Lamorak Insurance Company re #22 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply . (Barrasso, Judy) Modified text on 8/22/2019 (jls).
August 21, 2019 Filing 22 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Gary A. Lee, Lee & Perles LLP. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Didriksen, Caleb) (Attachment 1 replaced on 8/21/2019) (pp). Modified text on 8/21/2019 (pp).
August 19, 2019 Filing 21 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #20 MOTION to Remand to State Court. **Name of attorney who electronically filed this document does not match name of signatory attorney on pleading. The user log-in and password serve as the required signature for purposes of Rule 11 of the FRCP. No further action is necessary.** (mm)
August 16, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Gary A. Lee, Lee & Perles LLP, Richard M. Perles. Motion(s) will be submitted on 9/11/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Notice of Submission, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit 9, #12 Exhibit 10, #13 Exhibit 11, #14 Exhibit 12, #15 Exhibit 13, #16 Exhibit 14, #17 Exhibit 15)(Didriksen, Caleb)
August 16, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Lamorak Insurance Company. Motion(s) will be submitted on 9/11/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Notice of Submission)(Miles, Stephen)
August 16, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Resolute Management, Inc. Motion(s) will be submitted on 9/11/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Notice of Submission, #3 Affidavit Thomas M. Ryan)(Pelleteri, Maura)
August 15, 2019 Filing 17 **DEFICIENT** EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Gary A. Lee, Lee & Perles LLP, Richard M. Perles. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Didriksen, Caleb) Modified on 8/16/2019 (jls).
August 12, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Samuel M. Rosamond, III, Taylor Wellons, Politz & Duhe, PLC. Motion(s) will be submitted on 8/28/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Notice of Submission)(Evans, Joelle) Modified event/text on 8/13/2019 (jls).
July 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Notice of Removal, as to Samuel M. Rosamond, III and Taylor Wellons, Politz & Duhe, PLC answer due 8/13/2019. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 7/26/2019. (blg)
July 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Notice of Removal, as to Lamorak Insurance Company, OneBeacon America Insurance Company answer due 8/16/2019. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 7/26/2019. (blg)
July 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Notice of Removal, as to Resolute Management, Inc. answer due 8/16/2019. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 7/26/2019. (blg)
July 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE: IT IS ORDERED that the captioned case be and is hereby transferred to Section G (1). Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown, for further proceedings. Judge Ivan L.R. Lemelle no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Ivan L.R. Lemelle on 7/25/2019.(jls) (NEF: Case Mgr Sect B, Case Mgr and Chambers Sect G)
July 24, 2019 Filing 11 Notice of Compliance by Lamorak Insurance Company, Resolute Management, Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal. (Miles, Stephen) Modified text on 7/25/2019 (clw).
July 23, 2019 Filing 10 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer #1 Notice of Removal, by Samuel M. Rosamond, III, Taylor Wellons, Politz & Duhe, PLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Attorney Joelle Flannigan Evans added to party Samuel M. Rosamond, III(pty:dft), Attorney Joelle Flannigan Evans added to party Taylor Wellons, Politz & Duhe, PLC(pty:dft).(Evans, Joelle) Modified event/text on 7/24/2019 (jls).
July 23, 2019 Filing 9 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #8 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer. Document should have been linked to another document by checking the box 'Should the document you are filing link to another document' or by selecting a related document on other appropriate screen. Clerk took corrective action by linking document 8 to document 1. (clw)
July 22, 2019 Filing 8 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer #1 Notice of Removal by Lamorak Insurance Company, OneBeacon America Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Stephen L. Miles added to party OneBeacon America Insurance Company(pty:dft).(Miles, Stephen) Modified text/link on 7/23/2019 (clw).
July 22, 2019 Filing 7 DEFICIENT: EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 1 Notice of Removal, Petition/Complaint by Samuel M. Rosamond, III, Taylor Wellons, Politz & Duhe, PLC. Motion(s) referred to Janis van Meerveld. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Joelle Flannigan Evans added to party Samuel M. Rosamond, III(pty:dft), Attorney Joelle Flannigan Evans added to party Taylor Wellons, Politz & Duhe, PLC(pty:dft).(Gibbens, William) Modified text on 7/23/2019 (clw).
July 22, 2019 Filing 6 Directive by the Clerk re #1 Notice of Removal filed by Lamorak Insurance Company, Resolute Management, Inc. (pp)
July 22, 2019 Filing 5 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Notice of Removal,, by Resolute Management, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Maura Zivalich Pelleteri added to party Resolute Management, Inc.(pty:dft).(Pelleteri, Maura)
July 22, 2019 Filing 4 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Resolute Management, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Berkshire Hathaway Inc. for Resolute Management, Inc. (Pelleteri, Maura)
July 19, 2019 Filing 3 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Lamorak Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Bedivere Insurance Company for Lamorak Insurance Company, identifying Corporate Parent Lamorak Insurance Company for OneBeacon America Insurance Company (Miles, Stephen) Modified text on 7/22/2019 (pp).
July 19, 2019 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Ivan L.R. Lemelle and Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld. (cc)
July 19, 2019 Filing fee received from Miles, Stephen L. : receipt 053L-7762803$ 400.00 (cc)
July 19, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Civil District Court Orleans Parish, case number 2019-6608 (Fee previously paid) filed by Lamorak Insurance Company, Resolute Management, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Notice of Removal to Adverse Party)Attorney Stephen L. Miles added to party Lamorak Insurance Company, formerly known as and/or successor to OneBeacon America Insurance Company and Commercial Union Insurance Company(pty:dft).(Miles, Stephen) Modified text on 7/22/2019 (pp).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lee & Perles, L.L.P. et al v. Resolute Management, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary A. Lee
Represented By: Caleb H. Didriksen, III
Represented By: Erin B. Saucier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard M. Perles
Represented By: Caleb H. Didriksen, III
Represented By: Erin B. Saucier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lee & Perles, L.L.P. Formerly Known as Lee, Futrell & Perles, L.L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lee & Perles LLP
Represented By: Caleb H. Didriksen, III
Represented By: Erin B. Saucier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OneBeacon America Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lamorak Insurance Company, formerly known as and/or successor to OneBeacon America Insurance Company and Commercial Union Insurance Company
Represented By: Stephen L. Miles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Resolute Management, Inc.
Represented By: Maura Zivalich Pelleteri
Represented By: Amy S. Malish
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Taylor Wellons, Politz & Duhe, PLC
Represented By: Joelle Flannigan Evans
Represented By: Andrea V. Timpa
Represented By: Kyle D. Schonekas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samuel M. Rosamond, III
Represented By: Joelle Flannigan Evans
Represented By: Andrea V. Timpa
Represented By: Kyle D. Schonekas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lamorak Insurance Company
Represented By: Stephen L. Miles
Represented By: Judy Y. Barrasso
Represented By: Shaun P McFall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?