BO-MAC Contractors, Ltd. v. Daigle Towing Service, LLC et al
Plaintiff: BO-MAC Contractors, Ltd.
Defendant: Daigle Towing Service, LLC, Caillou Island Towing Co., Inc., M/V MISS LAURIE, Daigle Towing Service, L.L.C. and Miss Laurie MV
Case Number: 2:2019cv11792
Filed: July 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Carl Barbier
Referring Judge: Karen Wells Roby
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1333
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 4, 2019 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed; waiver sent to Daigle Towing Service, L.L.C. on 8/26/2019, answer due 10/25/2019. (Brooks, Philip)
July 23, 2019 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Carl Barbier and Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby. (cc)
July 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7766501) filed by BO-MAC Contractors, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney Philip S. Brooks, Jr added to party BO-MAC Contractors, Ltd.(pty:pla).(Brooks, Philip) Modified on 7/23/2019 (cg). SERVICE BY WAIVER and WITHHOLD IN REM SERVICE

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BO-MAC Contractors, Ltd. v. Daigle Towing Service, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daigle Towing Service, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caillou Island Towing Co., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M/V MISS LAURIE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daigle Towing Service, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Miss Laurie MV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BO-MAC Contractors, Ltd.
Represented By: Philip S. Brooks, Jr.
Represented By: Ronald Joseph Kitto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?