Haynes et al v. Synchrony Financial, et al
Plaintiff: Lindsay Willoz and Julie Haynes
Defendant: Synchrony Bank, Trans Union, LLC, Rooms To Go Louisiana Corp., Equifax Information Services LLC and Synchrony Financial
Case Number: 2:2019cv11811
Filed: July 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Greg Gerard Guidry
Referring Judge: Karen Wells Roby
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 18, 2019 Filing 20 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, Affirmative Defenses, and COUNTERCLAIM against Julie Haynes by Synchrony Bank. (Cunningham, Erika)
September 4, 2019 Filing 19 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #18 Statement of Corporate Disclosure. **Filing attorney did not enter Equifax Inc. as a corporate parent(s) at the prompt 'Search for a corporate parent or other affiliate'. Clerk took corrective action.** (mm)
September 3, 2019 Filing 18 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Equifax Information Services LLC identifying Corporate Parent Equifax Inc. for Equifax Information Services LLC. (Hentze, Madison) Modified text/added Corporate Parent on 9/4/2019 (mm).
September 3, 2019 Filing 17 ANSWER to #1 Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Equifax Information Services LLC. Attorney Madison Mary Hentze added to party Equifax Information Services LLC(pty:dft).(Hentze, Madison)
September 3, 2019 Filing 16 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Trans Union, LLC identifying Corporate Parent TransUnion Intermediate Holdings, Inc., TransUnion for Trans Union, LLC (Wilty, Reagan) Modified text on 9/4/2019 (mm).
September 3, 2019 Filing 15 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Trans Union, LLC. Attorney Reagan Reynolds Wilty added to party Trans Union, LLC(pty:dft).(Wilty, Reagan) Modified text on 9/4/2019 (mm).
August 30, 2019 Filing 14 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #12 MOTION for Extension of Time to Plead. **1. Filing attorney should have linked document to Document 1. Clerk properly linked document. 2. Caption reflects the incorrect spelling of the Plaintiff's name. All future pleadings must reflect the correct spelling, Julie Haynes.** (mm)
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint, as to Rooms To Go Louisiana Corp. answer due 9/24/2019. Signed by Judge Greg Gerard Guidry on 8/30/19. (ko)
August 29, 2019 Filing 12 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Plead re #1 Complaint by Rooms To Go Louisiana Corp. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Proposed Order) Attorney Hunter Jacob Schoen added to party Rooms To Go Louisiana Corp.(pty:dft).(Schoen, Hunter) Modified linkage on 8/30/2019 (mm).
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER denying #10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. Signed by Judge Greg Gerard Guidry on 8/29/19. (ko)
August 29, 2019 Filing 10 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Plead re #1 Complaint by Rooms To Go Louisiana Corp. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Attorney Gregory Fortier Rouchell added to party Rooms To Go Louisiana Corp.(pty:dft).(Rouchell, Gregory)
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint, as to Synchrony Bank answer due 9/24/2019. Signed by Judge Greg Gerard Guidry on 8/29/19. (ko)
August 29, 2019 Filing 8 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #7 MOTION to Amend/Correct. **Filing attorney selected incorrect event. Correct event is Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Clerk took corrective action.** (mm)
August 29, 2019 Filing 7 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Plead re #1 Complaint by Synchrony Bank. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Proposed Order)(Cunningham, Erika) Modified event/text on 8/29/2019 (mm).
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER denying #4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Signed by Judge Greg Gerard Guidry on 8/28/19. (ko)
August 28, 2019 Filing 5 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #4 MOTION for Extension of Time to Plead re #1 Complaint. **The case caption has an incorrect spelling of the Plaintiff's name. All future pleadings should reflect the correct spelling, Julie Haynes.** (mm)
August 27, 2019 Filing 4 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Plead re #1 Complaint by Synchrony Bank. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Attorney Erika Mullenbach Cunningham added to party Synchrony Financial(pty:dft).(Cunningham, Erika) Modified text on 8/28/2019 (mm).
July 25, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Equifax Information Services LLC, Rooms To Go Louisiana Corp., Synchrony Financial, Trans Union, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(pp)
July 24, 2019 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Greg Gerard Guidry and Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby. (cc)
July 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7770563) filed by Julie Haynes, Lindsay Willoz. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)Attorney Marc R. Michaud added to party Julie Haynes(pty:pla), Attorney Marc R. Michaud added to party Lindsay Willoz(pty:pla).(Michaud, Marc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Haynes et al v. Synchrony Financial, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Synchrony Bank
Represented By: Erika Mullenbach Cunningham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trans Union, LLC
Represented By: Reagan Reynolds Wilty
Represented By: George Davidson Fagan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rooms To Go Louisiana Corp.
Represented By: Hunter Jacob Schoen
Represented By: Gregory Fortier Rouchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services LLC
Represented By: Christopher Daniel Cazenave
Represented By: Madison Mary Hentze
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Synchrony Financial
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lindsay Willoz
Represented By: Marc R. Michaud
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julie Haynes
Represented By: Marc R. Michaud
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?