Swymn, et al v. DJI Technology Inc., et al
Plaintiff: Michael Swymn and Viking Animation & Consulting, L.L.C.
Defendant: SZ DJI TECHNOLOGY Co. LTD, DJI Technology Inc. and Shenzen Dajiang Baiwang Technology Co. Ltd.
Case Number: 2:2019cv11887
Filed: July 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Janis van Meerveld
Referring Judge: Sarah S Vance
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 18, 2019 Filing 22 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #18 Affidavit of Service, #20 Affidavit of Service, #19 Affidavit of Service. **Filing attorney selected incorrect event. Correct event is Summons Returned Executed. Clerk took corrective action.** (mm)
September 18, 2019 Filing 21 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #17 Certificate of Service. **Document was filed in error. It is a duplicate filing of record document 19.** (mm)
September 18, 2019 Filing 20 SUMMONS Returned Executed; SZ DJI Technology Co. LTD served on 9/6/2019, answer due 9/27/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit fedex signed delivery)(Williams, Ryan) Modified event/text/updated answer due date on 9/18/2019 (mm).
September 18, 2019 Filing 19 SUMMONS Returned Executed; DJI Technology Inc. served on 9/6/2019, answer due 9/27/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit fedex signed delivery)(Williams, Ryan) Modified event/text/updated answer due date on 9/18/2019 (mm).
September 18, 2019 Filing 18 SUMMONS Returned Executed; Shenzen Dajiang Baiwang Technology Co. Ltd. served on 9/6/2019, answer due 9/27/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit fedex signed delivery)(Williams, Ryan) Modified event/text/updated answer due date on 9/18/2019 (mm).
September 18, 2019 Filing 17 **FILED IN ERROR - DUPLICATE OF RECORD DOCUMENT 19** CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit fedex signed delivery)(Williams, Ryan) Modified text on 9/18/2019 (mm).
September 4, 2019 Filing 16 Summons Issued as to DJI Technology Inc., SZ DJI Technology Co. LTD, Shenzen Dajiang Baiwang Technology Co. Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(mm)
September 3, 2019 Filing 15 Summons Submitted for Issuance (Williams, Ryan)
September 3, 2019 Filing 14 Summons Submitted for Issuance (Williams, Ryan)
September 3, 2019 Filing 13 Summons Submitted for Issuance (Williams, Ryan)
August 14, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed; SZ DJI Technology Co. LTD served on 8/7/2019, answer due 8/28/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit fedex signed delivery)(Williams, Ryan) Modified text on 8/15/2019 (mm).
August 14, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed; Shenzen Dajiang Baiwang Technology Co. Ltd. served on 8/7/2019, answer due 8/28/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit fedex signed delivery)(Williams, Ryan) Modified text on 8/15/2019 (mm).
August 14, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed; DJI Technology Inc. served on 8/7/2019, answer due 8/28/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit fedex signed delivery)(Williams, Ryan) Modified text on 8/15/2019 (mm).
August 13, 2019 Filing 9 DEFICIENT: AFFIDAVIT of Service by Andrea Hidalgo of complaint/summons served on Shenzen Dajiang Baiwang Technology Co. Ltd. on 08/07/19. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit fedex signed delivery)(Williams, Ryan) Modified text on 8/14/2019 (mm).
August 13, 2019 Filing 8 DEFICIENT: AFFIDAVIT of Service by Andrea Hidalgo of complaint/summons served on SZ DJI Technology Co. Ltd. on 08/07/19. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit fedex signed delivery)(Williams, Ryan) Modified text on 8/14/2019 (mm).
August 13, 2019 Filing 7 DEFICIENT: AFFIDAVIT of Service by Andrea Hidalgo of complaint/summons served on DJI Technology Inc on 08/07/19. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit fedex signed delivery)(Williams, Ryan) Modified text on 8/14/2019 (mm).
July 30, 2019 Filing 6 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #4 Request for Summons Issued. **Page 2 of summons not provided. For future filings, page 2 should be attached to page 1 of summons. Clerk has attached 2nd page of summons. Please use both pages when filing returns of service. No further action necessary.** (mm)
July 30, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Shenzen Dajiang Baiwang Technology Co. Ltd. (mm)
July 30, 2019 Filing 4 Request of Summons Issued as to Shenzen Dajiang Baiwang Technology Co. Ltd. filed by All Plaintiffs re #1 Complaint. (Williams, Ryan)
July 26, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to DJI Technology Inc., SZ DJI TECHNOLOGY Co. LTD. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(pp)
July 26, 2019 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Sarah S. Vance and Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld. (cc)
July 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against DJI Technology Inc., SZ DJI TECHNOLOGY Co. LTD, Shenzen Dajiang Baiwang Technology Co. Ltd. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7774745) filed by Viking Animation & Consulting, L.L.C., Michael Swymn (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Affidavit verification, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit)Attorney Ryan J. Williams added to party Viking Animation & Consulting, L.L.C.(pty:pla).(Williams, Ryan) Modified text on 7/26/2019 (pp).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Swymn, et al v. DJI Technology Inc., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SZ DJI TECHNOLOGY Co. LTD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DJI Technology Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shenzen Dajiang Baiwang Technology Co. Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Swymn
Represented By: Ryan J. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Viking Animation & Consulting, L.L.C.
Represented By: Ryan J. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?