Dan Bunkering America Inc. v. Epic Arapaho, et al
Plaintiff: Dan Bunkering America Inc.
Defendant: Epic Companies, LLC, Epic Diving & Marine Services, LLC and Epic Arapaho
Intervenor: Fugro USA Marine, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv11897
Filed: July 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Dana Douglas
Referring Judge: Ivan LR Lemelle
2 Judge: Janis van Meerveld
3 Judge: Jane Triche Milazzo
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 46:31301
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that this matter is hereby STAYED AND ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSED pursuant to section 362(a) of the Bankruptcy Code pending resolution from Bankruptcy Court. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo on 09/11/2019.(am)
September 10, 2019 Filing 29 NOTICE OF SUGGESTION BANKRUPTCY by Epic Companies, LLC Attorney R. Scott Jenkins added to party Epic Companies, LLC(pty:dft).(Jenkins, R.) Modified text on 9/11/2019 (am).
September 3, 2019 Filing 28 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Lucas McGill of complaint served on Epic Companies, LLC on 08/22/2019. (Guy, Matthew)
September 3, 2019 Filing 27 SUMMONS Returned Executed; Epic Diving & Marine Services, LLC served on 8/23/2019, answer due 9/13/2019. (Guy, Matthew) Modified text on 9/4/2019 (am).
August 27, 2019 Filing 26 Return of Service of Vessel Arrest Warrant served on Epic Arapaho, Derrick Barge on 08/07/2019(am)
August 21, 2019 Filing 25 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Fugro USA Marine, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Fugre USA Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Fugro N.V., Corporate Parent Fugro Consultants International N.V. for Fugro USA Marine, Inc. (Kitto, Ronald)
August 13, 2019 Filing 24 Summons Issued as to Epic Companies, LLC, Epic Diving & Marine Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(am)
August 12, 2019 Filing 23 Summons Submitted for Issuance (Guy, Matthew)
August 12, 2019 Filing 22 Summons Submitted for Issuance (Guy, Matthew)
August 8, 2019 Filing 21 Intervenor COMPLAINT filed by Fugro USA Marine, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(ko)
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #15 Motion for Leave to File Complaint in Intervention. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo on 8/8/19. (ko)
August 8, 2019 Filing 19 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #15 MOTION for Leave to File Complaint in Intervention: Movant has subsequently provided a revised version of the proposed intervenor complaint which the clerk has substituted in as Rec. Doc. 15-2. A copy sent via NEF to all counsel of record. (ecm)
August 7, 2019 Filing 18 Return of Service of Vessel Arrest Warrant served on Epic Arapaho, Derrick Barge on 07/30/2019(am)
August 7, 2019 Filing 17 Ship Release Bond in the amount of $ 115,476.48 posted by Epic Arapaho (am) Modified on 8/7/2019 (am).
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER GRANTING #13 Motion for Leave to File Ship Release Bond, as set forth in document. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo on 08/07/2019. (am)
August 7, 2019 Filing 15 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Complaint in Intervention by Fugro USA Marine, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Pleading Complaint in Intervention, #3 Exhibit A)Attorney Ronald Joseph Kitto added to party Fugro USA Marine, Inc.(pty:intvp).(Kitto, Ronald) Modified text on 8/8/2019 (am). (Attachment 2 replaced on 8/8/2019) (ecm).
August 7, 2019 Filing 14 Verified Claim of Owner by Epic Arapaho. (Hurley, Grady) Modified text on 8/8/2019 (am).
August 7, 2019 Filing 13 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Bond by Epic Arapaho. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of No Opposition, #3 Ship Release Bond)Attorney Grady S. Hurley added to party Epic Arapaho(pty:dft).(Hurley, Grady)
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER GRANTING #10 Motion to Appoint/Substitute Custodian. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo on 07/30/2019. (3 cc: USM) (am)
July 30, 2019 Filing 11 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #10 MOTION to Appoint/Substitute Custodian. **Document contains incorrect Magistrate Judge. All future pleadings must reflect Magistrate Judge Dana M. Douglas (3).** (am)
July 29, 2019 Filing 10 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appoint/Substitute Custodian by Dan Bunkering America Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Affidavit)(Callihan, Lawton) Modified text on 7/30/2019 (am).
July 29, 2019 Filing 9 WARRANT of Arrest in rem issued. (3cc: USM) (ecm)
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #3 Motion to Permit Cargo and Repair Operations and Movement of Vessel. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo. (3cc: USM) (ecm)
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Issuance of Warrant in rem for the Arrest of the EPIC ARAPAHO (IMO No. 8757958), her engines, rigging, tackle, equipment, furnishings, and fixtures. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo. (3cc: USM) (ecm)
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE. Case transferred to Judge Jane Triche Milazzo and Magistrate Judge Dana Douglas. Judge Ivan L.R. Lemelle, Magistrate Judge Michael North no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Ivan L.R. Lemelle on 7/29/2019.(jls)
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld recused. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Michael North. Signed by Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld on July 29, 2019.(mp)
July 26, 2019 Filing 4 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Ivan L.R. Lemelle and Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld. (cc)
July 26, 2019 Filing 3 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Permit Cargo and Repair Operations and Movement of Vessel by Dan Bunkering (America) Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Callihan, Lawton) Modified text on 7/26/2019 (jls).
July 26, 2019 Filing 2 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Issuance of Warrant of Arrest in rem by Dan Bunkering (America) Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Callihan, Lawton) Modified on 7/26/2019 (jls).
July 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7775614) filed by Dan Bunkering (America) Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit)Attorney Lawton Cole Callihan added to party Dan Bunkering (America) Inc.(pty:pla).(Callihan, Lawton) Modified text on 7/26/2019 (jls).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dan Bunkering America Inc. v. Epic Arapaho, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Epic Companies, LLC
Represented By: R. Scott Jenkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Epic Diving & Marine Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Epic Arapaho
Represented By: Grady S. Hurley
Represented By: R. Scott Jenkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dan Bunkering America Inc.
Represented By: Lawton Cole Callihan
Represented By: Matthew C. Guy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Fugro USA Marine, Inc.
Represented By: Kenneth Joseph Gelpi, Jr.
Represented By: Ronald Joseph Kitto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?