Blewster v. Garvey et al
Plaintiff: Winston Blewster
Defendant: Chubb Indemnity Insurance Company, Travelers Indemnity Company of Connecticut, Altria Group Distribution Company, Lease Plan USA, Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company, Brian Garvey and Lease Plan, USA
Case Number: 2:2019cv11914
Filed: July 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Karen Wells Roby
Referring Judge: Jay C Zainey
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Motion to Enroll as Counsel of Record for Attorneys John Mark Fezio, Jennifer R. Rust, David J. Saltaformaggio for Winston Blewster. Signed by Judge Jay C. Zainey on 9/11/19. (ko)
September 10, 2019 Filing 10 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Enroll as Co-Counsel of Record Richard P. Voorhies, III, John Mark Fezio, Jennifer R. Rust and David J. Saltaformaggio by Winston Blewster. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Attorney Richard P. Voorhies, III added to party Winston Blewster(pty:pla).(Voorhies, Richard) Modified text on 9/11/2019 (ajn).
August 13, 2019 Filing 9 Notice of Compliance by Altria Group Distribution Company, Chubb Indemnity Insurance Company, Lease Plan, USA to #3 Order (Attachments: #1 A)(Kelly, Shannon) Modified text on 8/14/2019 (ajn).
August 7, 2019 Filing 8 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #4 , #5 and #7 Statements of Corporate Disclosure. ***Filing attorney did not enter all corporate parent(s) at the prompt 'Search for a corporate parent or other affiliate'. Clerk took corrective action and added corporate parents to these filings.*** (ajn)
August 6, 2019 Filing 7 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Lease Plan, USA identifying Corporate Parent Lease Plan Corporation for Lease Plan, USA (Kelly, Shannon) Modified text on 8/6/2019 to add corporate parent (ajn).
August 6, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal, with Jury Demand by Altria Group Distribution Company, Chubb Indemnity Insurance Company and Lease Plan, USA.(Kelly, Shannon) Modified text on 8/6/2019 (ajn)
August 6, 2019 Filing 5 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Altria Group Distribution Company identifying Corporate Parent Altria Group, Inc., Corporate Parent Altria Enterprises II, LLC for Altria Group Distribution Company (Kelly, Shannon) Modified text on 8/6/2019 to add corporate parents (ajn).
August 6, 2019 Filing 4 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Chubb Indemnity Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Federal Insurance Company, Corporate Parent Chubb Corporation for Chubb Indemnity Insurance Company (Kelly, Shannon) Modified text on 8/6/2019 to correct corporate parents (ajn).
July 30, 2019 Filing 3 Directive by the Clerk re #1 Notice of Removal filed by Chubb Indemnity Insurance Company, Altria Group Distribution Company, Lease Plan USA. (pp)
July 30, 2019 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Jay C. Zainey and Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby. (cc)
July 29, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with jury demand from Civil District Court - Parish of Orleans, case number 2019-6376 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7777861) filed by Altria Group Distribution Company, Lease Plan USA, Chubb Indemnity Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G)Attorney Shannon Amber Kelly added to party Altria Group Distribution Company(pty:dft), Attorney Shannon Amber Kelly added to party Chubb Indemnity Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Shannon Amber Kelly added to party Lease Plan USA(pty:dft).(Kelly, Shannon)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Blewster v. Garvey et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chubb Indemnity Insurance Company
Represented By: Shannon Amber Kelly
Represented By: William A. Barousse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travelers Indemnity Company of Connecticut
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Altria Group Distribution Company
Represented By: Shannon Amber Kelly
Represented By: William A. Barousse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lease Plan USA
Represented By: Shannon Amber Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Garvey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lease Plan, USA
Represented By: Shannon Amber Kelly
Represented By: William A. Barousse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Winston Blewster
Represented By: David J. Saltaformaggio
Represented By: Richard P. Voorhies, III
Represented By: Jennifer R. Rust
Represented By: Clifford E. Cardone
Represented By: John Mark Fezio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?