Parfait v. Huntington Ingalls Incorporated et al
Plaintiff: Charles Merlin Parfait, Sr.
Defendant: CBS Corporation, McCarty Corporation, Zurich American Insurance Company, Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, Travelers Indemnity Company, Huntington Ingalls Incorporated, Eagle, Inc., J D Roberts, Taylor-Seidenbach, Inc., Lamorak Insurance Company, International Paper Company, Underwriters at Lloyd's London, Hopeman Brothers, Inc., Burmaster Land & Development Co., LLC and Travelers Casualty and Surety Company
3Rd Party Defendant: Uniroyal, Inc., Manville Personal Injury Trust and Puget Sound Commerce Center, Inc.
3Rd Party Plaintiff: Albert L. Bossier, Jr.
Cross Defendant: Claims Resolution Management Corporation
Case Number: 2:2019cv11958
Filed: July 31, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Martin LC Feldman
Referring Judge: Janis van Meerveld
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER AND REASONS - IT IS ORDERED that the plaintiff's Motion to Remand (Rec. Doc. #5 ) is GRANTED and the plaintiff's Motion for Rule 11 Sanctions and for costs and fees (Rec. Doc. #34 ) is DENIED. The case is hereby remanded to the Civil District Court for the Parish of Orleans. Signed by Judge Martin L.C. Feldman on 9/11/2019. (sa) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/11/2019: #1 Remand Letter to CDC) (sa).
September 4, 2019 Filing 48 Supplemental Memorandum filed by Albert L. Bossier, Jr., Huntington Ingalls Incorporated, Lamorak Insurance Company, in Opposition of #5 Emergency MOTION to Remand to State Court . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(ko)
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER granting #45 Motion for Leave to File Sur-Reply. Signed by Judge Martin L.C. Feldman on 9/4/19. (ko)
September 3, 2019 Filing 46 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Albert L. Bossier, Jr., Huntington Ingalls Incorporated, Lamorak Insurance Company re #34 MOTION for Sanctions . (Melancon, David)
September 3, 2019 Filing 45 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply Supporting Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand by Albert L. Bossier, Jr., Huntington Ingalls Incorporated, Lamorak Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Pleading, #3 Exhibit)(Melancon, David) Modified text on 9/4/2019 (clw).
August 29, 2019 Filing 44 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Puget Sound Commerce Center, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Vigor Industrial LLC, Corporate Parent Miles Marine, Inc. for Puget Sound Commerce Center, Inc. (Sirera, Sara)
August 29, 2019 Filing 43 ANSWER to Complaint Cross-Claims and Third Party Demands of Albert L. Bossier, Jr. filed by Puget Sound Commerce Center, Inc. (Sirera, Sara) Modified text on 8/30/2019 (sa).
August 27, 2019 Filing 42 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal, Cross-claim of Albert L. Bossier, Jr. by Zurich American Insurance Company(Successor by merger to Maryland Casualty Company).Attorney Stephannie Marie McKinney added to party Zurich American Insurance Company(pty:crd).(McKinney, Stephannie) Modified text/link on 8/28/2019 (pp).
August 27, 2019 Filing 41 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal, First Supplemental and Amended Petition for Damages by Zurich American Insurance Company.Attorney Stephannie Marie McKinney added to party Zurich American Insurance Company(pty:dft).(McKinney, Stephannie) Modified text/link on 8/28/2019 (pp).
August 23, 2019 Filing 40 ANSWER to #10 Answer to Complaint - Notice of Removal,, Crossclaim, First Supplemental and Amended Petition for Damages by Taylor-Seidenbach, Inc..(Lightfoot, Christopher)
August 23, 2019 Filing 39 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal,, Cross-Claim and Third-Party Demand of Albert L. Bossier, Jr. by Taylor-Seidenbach, Inc..(Lightfoot, Christopher)
August 23, 2019 Filing 38 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal,, Cross-Claim of Huntington Ingalls Incorporated by Taylor-Seidenbach, Inc..Attorney Christopher Kelly Lightfoot added to party Taylor-Seidenbach, Inc.(pty:crd).(Lightfoot, Christopher)
August 23, 2019 Filing 37 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Taylor-Seidenbach, Inc. (Lightfoot, Christopher)
August 23, 2019 Filing 36 ANSWER with Jury Demand to Cross-Claims of Huntington Ingalls, Inc. filed by by Zurich American Insurance Company. (Devenport, Marc) Modified text on 8/26/2019 (sa).
August 23, 2019 Filing 35 ANSWER with Jury Demand to Cross-Claims of Albert L. Bossier, Jr. filed by Zurich American Insurance Company. (Devenport, Marc) Modified text on 8/26/2019 (sa).
August 21, 2019 Filing 34 MOTION for Sanctions by Charles Merlin Parfait, Sr. Motion(s) will be submitted on 9/11/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Notice of Submission)(Swarr, Frank)
August 21, 2019 Filing 33 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal,, Answer to the Third-Party Demands of Albert L. Bossier, Jr. by Uniroyal, Inc..Attorney Mary Reeves Arthur added to party Uniroyal, Inc.(pty:3pd).(Arthur, Mary)
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that the hearing on the plaintiff's Motion to Remand (Rec. Doc. #5 ) is hereby CONTINUED to September 11, 2019, on the papers. Signed by Judge Martin L.C. Feldman on 8/21/2019.(sa)
August 20, 2019 Filing 31 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by CBS Corporation identifying Corporate Parent National Amusements, Inc. for CBS Corporation (Puente-Martin, Magali)
August 20, 2019 Filing 30 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal,, Answer to CC and 3PD of Huntington Ingalls Inc by CBS Corporation.(Puente-Martin, Magali)
August 20, 2019 Filing 29 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #27 Notice of Appearance, #28 Notice of Appearance. The deficiencies for these notices have been removed, and the attorneys, Seth Schmeeckle and C. Austin Holliday, have been added to party Travelers Indemnity Company as previously listed in the the Notice of Compliance filed at Doc. 9. (sa)
August 19, 2019 Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance by Carey Austin Holliday on behalf of Travelers Indemnity Company. Attorney Carey Austin Holliday added to party Travelers Indemnity Company(pty:dft).(Holliday, Carey) Modified on 8/20/2019 (clw). Modified on 8/20/2019 (sa).
August 19, 2019 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by Seth Andrew Schmeeckle on behalf of Travelers Indemnity Company. Attorney Seth Andrew Schmeeckle added to party Travelers Indemnity Company(pty:dft).(Schmeeckle, Seth) Modified on 8/20/2019 (clw). Modified on 8/20/2019 (sa).
August 19, 2019 Filing 26 REPLY to Response to Motion filed by Charles Merlin Parfait, Sr in Support of #5 Emergency MOTION to Remand to State Court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(sa)
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting #23 Motion for Leave to File Reply Memorandum. Signed by Judge Martin L.C. Feldman on 8/19/2019. (sa)
August 16, 2019 Filing 24 Summons Issued as to Claims Resolution Management Corporation. (sa)
August 16, 2019 Filing 23 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum in Support of Remand by Charles Merlin Parfait, Sr. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Memorandum in Support, #3 Proposed Pleading, #4 Exhibit)(Swarr, Frank) Modified text on 8/19/2019 (sa).
August 15, 2019 Filing 22 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by International Paper Company (Penn, Elizabeth)
August 15, 2019 Filing 21 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal,, Answer to Cross-Claims of Huntington Ingalls Incorporated by International Paper Company.Attorney Elizabeth Riddell Penn added to party International Paper Company(pty:dft).(Penn, Elizabeth)
August 15, 2019 Filing 20 Summons Submitted for Issuance (Ankersen, Brittney)
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer as to Puget Sound Commerce Center, Inc. answer deadline RESET for 8/29/2019. Signed by Judge Martin L.C. Feldman on 8/14/2019. (sa)
August 14, 2019 Filing 18 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Albert L. Bossier, Jr., Huntington Ingalls Incorporated, Lamorak Insurance Company re #5 Emergency MOTION to Remand to State Court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I)(sa)
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #16 Motion for Leave to File Opposition in Excess Pages. Signed by Judge Martin L.C. Feldman on 8/14/2019. (sa)
August 13, 2019 Filing 16 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages Opposition by Albert L. Bossier, Jr., Huntington Ingalls Incorporated, Lamorak Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Pleading, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit G, #10 Exhibit H, #11 Exhibit I)(Melancon, David) Modified text on 8/14/2019 (sa).
August 13, 2019 Filing 15 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #10 Answer to Complaint - Notice of Removal, Crossclaim. ** 1. Summons were prepared on incorrect form, Third Party. Please prepare summons on current form and resubmit by using the event Summons Submitted for Issuance. 2. Filing attorney did not properly format the pdf of Summons. The pdf should not have the purple boxes nor the 3 red buttons at the bottom. When using a FORM, fill in the applicable fields then click the red PRINT button at the bottom to print the document to pdf format.** (pp)
August 12, 2019 Filing 14 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal,, Huntington Ingalls Incorporated's Cross-Claim by Liberty Mutual Insurance Company.(Ankersen, Brittney)
August 12, 2019 Filing 13 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal,, Albert L. Bossier, Jr.'s Cross-Claim by Liberty Mutual Insurance Company.Attorney Brittney Bullock Ankersen added to party Liberty Mutual Insurance Company(pty:crd).(Ankersen, Brittney)
August 12, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal,, Huntington Ingalls Incorporated's Cross-Claim by Hopeman Brothers, Inc.(Ankersen, Brittney) Modified text on 8/13/2019 (pp).
August 12, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal,, Cross-Claims of Albert L. Bossier, Jr. by Hopeman Brothers, Inc..Attorney Brittney Bullock Ankersen added to party Hopeman Brothers, Inc.(pty:crd).(Ankersen, Brittney)
August 12, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal, Plaintiff's First Supplemental and Amended Petition for Damages and, CROSSCLAIM against Claims Resolution Management Corporation, by Hopeman Brothers, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Ankersen, Brittney) Modified text on 8/13/2019 (sa). (Attachment 1 flattened & replaced on 8/13/2019) (sa). (Attachment 1 replaced on 8/13/2019) (pp).
August 12, 2019 Filing 9 Notice of Compliance by Albert L. Bossier, Jr., Huntington Ingalls Incorporated, Lamorak Insurance Company re #1 Notice of Removal. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Melancon, David) Modified text/link on 8/13/2019 (pp).
August 9, 2019 Filing 8 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer Third-Party Demand by Puget Sound Commerce Center, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Sara Grace Sirera added to party Puget Sound Commerce Center, Inc.(pty:3pd).(Sirera, Sara)
August 8, 2019 Filing 7 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Hopeman Brothers, Inc. (Ankersen, Brittney)
August 8, 2019 Filing 6 *DEFICIENT* NOTICE of Appearance by Brittney Bullock Ankersen on behalf of Hopeman Brothers, Inc.. Attorney Brittney Bullock Ankersen added to party Hopeman Brothers, Inc.(pty:dft).(Ankersen, Brittney) Modified on 8/9/2019 (sa).
August 1, 2019 Filing 5 Emergency MOTION to Remand to State Court by Charles Merlin Parfait, Sr. Motion(s) will be submitted on 8/21/2019. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Submission, #2 Memorandum in Support, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F)Attorney Frank J. Swarr added to party Charles Merlin Parfait, Sr(pty:pla).(Swarr, Frank)
August 1, 2019 Filing 4 Directive by the Clerk re #1 Notice of Removal filed by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated, Albert L. Bossier, Jr., Lamorak Insurance Company (pp)
August 1, 2019 Filing 3 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Lamorak Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Trebuchet U.S. Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Bedivere Insurance Company, Corporate Parent Trebuchet Investments, Limited, Corporate Parent Armour Group Holdings, Limited for Lamorak Insurance Company (Rosamond, Samuel)
July 31, 2019 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Martin L.C. Feldman and Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld. (cc)
July 31, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with jury demand from Civil District Court for the Parish of Orleans, case number 2019-3539 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7781768) filed by Albert L. Bossier, Jr., Huntington Ingalls Incorporated, Lamorak Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney David Michael Melancon added to party Albert L. Bossier, Jr.(pty:3pp), Attorney David Michael Melancon added to party Albert L. Bossier, Jr.(pty:dft), Attorney David Michael Melancon added to party Albert L. Bossier, Jr.(pty:crc).(Melancon, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Parfait v. Huntington Ingalls Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Merlin Parfait, Sr.
Represented By: Frank J. Swarr
Represented By: Mickey P. Landry
Represented By: Matthew C. Clark
Represented By: Philip C Hoffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBS Corporation
Represented By: John Joseph Hainkel, III
Represented By: Angela M. Bowlin
Represented By: James H. Brown, Jr.
Represented By: Magali Ann Puente-Martin
Represented By: Kelly L. Long
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McCarty Corporation
Represented By: Janice M. Culotta
Represented By: Louis Oliver Oubre
Represented By: April Ann McQuillar
Represented By: James R. Guidry
Represented By: Susan Beth Kohn
Represented By: Douglas Kinler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zurich American Insurance Company
Represented By: Lee M. LeBouef
Represented By: Stephannie Marie England
Represented By: Edward T. Hayes
Represented By: Marc E. Devenport
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Brittney Bullock Ankersen
Represented By: Jeffrey Matthew Burg
Represented By: Kaye N. Courington
Represented By: Blaine Augusta Moore
Represented By: Mathilde Villere Semmes
Represented By: Troy Nathan Bell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travelers Indemnity Company
Represented By: Seth Andrew Schmeeckle
Represented By: Carey Austin Holliday
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Huntington Ingalls Incorporated
Represented By: Laura M. Gillen
Represented By: Erin Helen Boyd
Represented By: Jasmine Najee Brown
Represented By: Brian C. Bossier
Represented By: Christopher Thomas Grace, III
Represented By: Edwin A. Ellinghausen, III
Represented By: Patrick Kevin Shockey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eagle, Inc.
Represented By: Louis Oliver Oubre
Represented By: James R. Guidry
Represented By: Susan Beth Kohn
Represented By: Douglas Kinler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J D Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Taylor-Seidenbach, Inc.
Represented By: Richard J. Garvey, Jr.
Represented By: Christopher Kelly Lightfoot
Represented By: Edward J. Lassus, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lamorak Insurance Company
Represented By: Samuel Milton Rosamond, III
Represented By: Adam Devlin deMahy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: International Paper Company
Represented By: Elizabeth Riddell Penn
Represented By: Daniel S Roberts
Represented By: Mary Reeves Arthur
Represented By: Walter G. Watkins, III
Represented By: Thomas Peyton Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Underwriters at Lloyd's London
Represented By: James R. Logan, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hopeman Brothers, Inc.
Represented By: Brittney Bullock Ankersen
Represented By: Jeffrey Matthew Burg
Represented By: Kaye N. Courington
Represented By: Blaine Augusta Moore
Represented By: Mathilde Villere Semmes
Represented By: Troy Nathan Bell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Burmaster Land & Development Co., LLC
Represented By: Brett F. Willie
Represented By: Kevin John Webb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travelers Casualty and Surety Company
Represented By: Kristopher T. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Uniroyal, Inc.
Represented By: Amy Louise Maccherone
Represented By: Mary Reeves Arthur
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Manville Personal Injury Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Puget Sound Commerce Center, Inc.
Represented By: Charles B. Wilmore
Represented By: Philip Dore
Represented By: Sara Grace Sirera
Represented By: Scott C. Seiler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: Albert L. Bossier, Jr.
Represented By: David Michael Melancon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Claims Resolution Management Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?