Boudreaux v. Louisiana State Bar Association et al
Plaintiff: Randy Boudreaux
Defendant: Bernette J Johnson, Louisiana Supreme Court, Marcus R. Clark, John L Weimer, Unidentified Party, Scott J. Crichton, Louisiana State Bar Association, Jefferson D Hughes, III and James T Genovese
Case Number: 2:2019cv11962
Filed: August 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Lance M Africk
Referring Judge: Janis van Meerveld
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 28:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 13, 2019 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Marcus R. Clark, Scott J. Crichton, James T Genovese, Jefferson D Hughes, III, Bernette J Johnson, Louisiana State Bar Association, Louisiana Supreme Court, Unidentified Party, John L Weimer. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons)(mp)
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Timothy Sandefur. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk on 8/5/19. (Attachments: #1 Notice) (ko)
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #3 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Jacob Huebert. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk on 8/5/19. (Attachments: #1 Notice) (ko)
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney James Stuart Baehr terminated. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk on 8/5/19. (ko)
August 4, 2019 Filing 5 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Withdraw James S. C. Baehr as Attorney by Randy Boudreaux. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Ciolino, Dane)
August 1, 2019 Filing 4 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Timothy Sandefur (Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 053L-7783612) by Randy Boudreaux. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit B - Declaration of Timothy Sandefur, #3 Exhibit C - ECF Attorney Registration Form, #4 Proposed Order)(Ciolino, Dane)
August 1, 2019 Filing 3 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Jacob Huebert (Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 053L-7783422) by Randy Boudreaux. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit B - Declaration of Jacob Huebert, #3 Exhibit C - ECF Attorney Registration Form, #4 Proposed Order)(Ciolino, Dane)
August 1, 2019 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Lance M Africk and Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld. (cc)
August 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Randy Boudreaux (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7782194) filed by Randy Boudreaux. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons to Marcus R. Clark, #3 Summons to Scott J. Crichton, #4 Summons to James T. Genovese, #5 Summons to Jefferson D. Hughes, III, #6 Summons to John Doe, #7 Summons to Bernette J. Johnson, #8 Summons to Louisiana Supreme Court, #9 Summons to Louisiana State Bar Association, #10 Summons to John L. Weimer)Attorney Dane S. Ciolino added to party Randy Boudreaux(pty:pla).(Ciolino, Dane)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Boudreaux v. Louisiana State Bar Association et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bernette J Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Louisiana Supreme Court
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marcus R. Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John L Weimer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unidentified Party
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott J. Crichton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Louisiana State Bar Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jefferson D Hughes, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James T Genovese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randy Boudreaux
Represented By: Alex J. Peragine
Represented By: Dane S. Ciolino
Represented By: James Stuart Baehr
Represented By: Jacob Huebert
Represented By: Timothy Sandefur
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?